State of Colorado et al v. DeJoy et al
Plaintiff: State of Colorado and Jena Griswold
Defendant: United States Postal Service, Samarn S Reed, Chris J Yazzie and Louis DeJoy
Case Number: 1:2020cv02768
Filed: September 12, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
Presiding Judge: William J Martinez
Referring Judge: Scott T Varholak
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Voting
Cause of Action: 39 U.S.C. ยง 409
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 18, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 18, 2020 Filing 31 COURTROOM MINUTES for Preliminary Injunction Hearing held before Judge William J. Martinez on 9/18/2020. Court Reporter: Mary George. (afran)
September 17, 2020 Filing 32 Civil Case Terminated pursuant to #30 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal filed in this case on 9/18/2020. Text Only Entry (angar, )
September 17, 2020 Filing 30 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of Case by Plaintiffs Jena Griswold, State of Colorado (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Settlement Agreement)(Olson, Eric)
September 17, 2020 Filing 29 NOTICE of Supplemental Authorities re: #26 Reply to Response to Motion by Plaintiffs Jena Griswold, State of Colorado (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Order Granting Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction in E.D. Wash.)(Olson, Eric)
September 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER: This matter is before the Court on e-mail communications from Defendants' counsel. Defendants make an unopposed request to submit testimony of three witnesses via VTC or telephone during the Preliminary Injunction Hearing set for tomorrow Friday, September 18, 2020 at 9:30 a.m. All parties have known since this past Saturday, September 12, 2020, that this hearing was scheduled to take place in person in Courtroom 801A. Nonetheless, in the interest of justice this request is GRANTED for good cause shown. However, the Court cautions all parties that it has encountered substantial technical difficulties this week during virtual hearings. ANY PARTY THAT DOES NOT HAVE THEIR WITNESS(ES) AVAILABLE TO TESTIFY IN PERSON TAKES THE RISK THAT THEIR WITNESS(ES) WILL NOT TESTIFY. SO ORDERED by Judge William J. Martinez on 9/17/2020. Text Only Entry (wjmlc2)
September 17, 2020 Filing 27 NOTICE of Report in Response to Order [ECF No. 11] by Defendants Louis DeJoy, Samarn S Reed, United States Postal Service, Chris J Yazzie (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration and Report)(Dickey, Lauren)
September 16, 2020 Filing 26 REPLY to Response to #8 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Plaintiffs Jena Griswold, State of Colorado. (Morrill, LeeAnn)
September 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER granting Defendants' Unopposed Motion by Defendants for Leave to Submit Brief with Extra Page, or, in the Alternative, to Correct Inadvertent Filing Error #24 . Defendants' Motion is GRANTED for good cause shown. Defendants are granted leave to file their Response to Motion for Preliminary Injunction not to exceed 16 pages, exclusive of attorney signature blocks and certificate of service. It is FURTHER ORDERED that Defendants' Response to Motion for Preliminary Injunction #23 is ACCEPTED as filed. SO ORDERED by Judge William J. Martinez on 9/15/2020. Text Only Entry(wjmsec, )
September 15, 2020 Filing 24 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to Submit Brief with Extra Page, Or, In the Alternative, to Correct Inadvertent Filing Error by Defendants Louis DeJoy, Samarn S Reed, United States Postal Service, Chris J Yazzie. (Traskos, Kevin)
September 15, 2020 Filing 23 RESPONSE to #8 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order Construed as Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed by Defendants Louis DeJoy, Samarn S Reed, United States Postal Service, Chris J Yazzie. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Second Declaration of Christopher Karpenko)(Traskos, Kevin)
September 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER: This matter is before the Court on Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction. At the Evidentiary Hearing on said Motion, set for September 18, 2020 at 9:30 a.m., the Court will use the following procedures: Counsel will have no more than five minutes each for opening statements. Plaintiffs and Defendants will then put on their evidence, to be followed by Plaintiffs in the event they have true rebuttal evidence. Counsel for both sides shall have no more than ten minutes each for closing statements. The parties shall familiarize themselves with the undersigned's Revised Practice Standards with regard to evidentiary hearings, and with particular emphasis on WJM Revised Practice Standard V.F.1, which requires the parties to meet and confer regarding the proposed exhibits and, to the maximum extent possible, stipulate to the authenticity and admissibility thereof. The parties are also encouraged to consult the "Morning-of-Trial Deliverables" portion of the undersigned's Trial Preparation Conference & Pretrial Checklist, available #here. It is FURTHER ORDERED that pursuant to the applicable General Orders of the Court, attendance in the Courtroom will be limited to counsel and their staff, party representatives, and witnesses only, as previously communicated to counsel. Everyone appearing in person for this hearing must abide by the rules stated in General Order 2020-10 to gain entrance to the building. For public audio access to the hearing, please call 877-336-1828 and enter access code 9449909#. Very limited seating in the Courtroom for members of the press may be available. Accredited press members should contact Chambers at 303-335-2805 if interested in attending the hearing in person. SO ORDERED by Judge William J. Martinez on 9/15/2020. Text Only Entry (wjmsec, )
September 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER denying #12 Motion for Reconsideration by Judge William J. Martinez on 9/14/2020. (wjmlc2)
September 14, 2020 Filing 20 ERRATA re #19 Reply to Response to Motion, by Defendants Louis DeJoy, Samarn S Reed, United States Postal Service, Chris J Yazzie. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Supp. Graves Decl.)(Dickey, Lauren)
September 14, 2020 Filing 19 REPLY to Response to #12 Emergency MOTION for Reconsideration re #11 Order on Motion for TRO filed by Defendants Louis DeJoy, Samarn S Reed, United States Postal Service, Chris J Yazzie. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Glass Dec)(Traskos, Kevin)
September 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER: Counsel for the parties and all counsel who may later enter an appearance shall review and familiarize themselves with the undersigned's Revised Practice Standards (as most recently revised effective December 1, 2019 and as they may be amended from time to time), which may be downloaded #here. SO ORDERED by Judge William J. Martinez on 9/ 14/2020. Text Only Entry (wjmsec, )
September 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak. Magistrate Judge Varholak, or such other Magistrate Judge who may in the future be reassigned this case, is designated to conduct NDISPO proceedings pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and Fed.R.Civ.P. 72(a) and (b). Court sponsored alternative dispute resolution is governed by D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.6. On the recommendation or informal request of the Magistrate Judge or on the request of the parties by motion, the court may direct the parties to engage in an early neutral evaluation, a settlement conference, or another alternative dispute resolution proceeding. SO ORDERED by Judge William J. Martinez on 9/14/2020. Text Only Entry (wjmsec, )
September 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER: This matter is before the Court on Plaintiffs' Response to Defendants' Motion for Reconsideration #14 . Defendants are DIRECTED to file a Reply in support of their Motion for Reconsideration no later than today, September 14, 2020 at 1:00 p.m. SO ORDERED by Judge William J. Martinez on 9/14/2020. Text Only Entry (wjmsec, )
September 13, 2020 Filing 15 CERTIFICATE of Mailing/Service re #11 Order on Motion for TRO by Plaintiffs Jena Griswold, State of Colorado. (Olson, Eric)
September 13, 2020 Filing 14 RESPONSE to #12 Emergency MOTION for Reconsideration re #11 Order on Motion for TRO filed by Plaintiffs Jena Griswold, State of Colorado. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Declaration of Secretary Griswold)(Olson, Eric)
September 13, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Lauren Marie Dickey on behalf of Louis DeJoy, Samarn S Reed, United States Postal Service, Chris J YazzieAttorney Lauren Marie Dickey added to party Louis DeJoy(pty:dft), Attorney Lauren Marie Dickey added to party Samarn S Reed(pty:dft), Attorney Lauren Marie Dickey added to party United States Postal Service(pty:dft), Attorney Lauren Marie Dickey added to party Chris J Yazzie(pty:dft) (Dickey, Lauren)
September 13, 2020 Filing 12 Emergency MOTION for Reconsideration re #11 Order on Motion for TRO by Defendants Louis DeJoy, Samarn S Reed, United States Postal Service, Chris J Yazzie. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex 1 - Declaration of Christopher Karpenko, #2 Exhibit Ex 2 - Declaration of Gregory Graves)(Traskos, Kevin)
September 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #8 Motion for TRO by Judge William J. Martinez on 9/12/2020. (wjmlc2)
September 12, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE re #8 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order of Local Rule 65.1 Certification of Counsel by Plaintiffs Jena Griswold, State of Colorado (Buckley, Emily)
September 12, 2020 Filing 9 SUMMONS issued by Clerk, re: L.DeJoy. (Attachments: #(1) Summons re: USPS, #(2) Summons re: S.Reed, #(3) Summons re: C.Yazzie, #(4) Magistrate Judge Consent Form). (ebutl)
September 12, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by Plaintiffs Jena Griswold, State of Colorado. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Judd Choate, #2 Exhibit A to Declaration of Judd Choate, #3 Proposed Temporary Restraining Order)(Buckley, Emily)
September 12, 2020 Filing 7 Case assigned to Judge William J. Martinez and drawn to Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak. Text Only Entry. (agarc, )
September 12, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Information for Temporary Restraining Order by Plaintiffs Jena Griswold, State of Colorado (Buckley, Emily)
September 12, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Michael T. Kotlarczyk on behalf of Jena Griswold, State of ColoradoAttorney Michael T. Kotlarczyk added to party Jena Griswold(pty:pla), Attorney Michael T. Kotlarczyk added to party State of Colorado(pty:pla) (Kotlarczyk, Michael)
September 12, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Peter G. Baumann on behalf of All Plaintiffs Attorney Peter G. Baumann added to party Jena Griswold(pty:pla), Attorney Peter G. Baumann added to party State of Colorado(pty:pla) (Baumann, Peter)
September 12, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Emily B. Buckley on behalf of All Plaintiffs Attorney Emily B. Buckley added to party Jena Griswold(pty:pla), Attorney Emily B. Buckley added to party State of Colorado(pty:pla) (Buckley, Emily)
September 12, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Eric R. Olson on behalf of All Plaintiffs Attorney Eric R. Olson added to party Jena Griswold(pty:pla), Attorney Eric R. Olson added to party State of Colorado(pty:pla) (Olson, Eric)
September 12, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Louis DeJoy, Samarn S Reed, United States Postal Service, Chris J Yazzie (Filing fee $ 400,Receipt Number 1082-7484404)Attorney LeeAnn Morrill added to party State of Colorado(pty:pla), Attorney LeeAnn Morrill added to party Jena Griswold(pty:pla), filed by State of Colorado, Jena Griswold. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Louis DeJoy Summons, #3 Summons USPS Summons, #4 Summons Samarn S. Reed Summons, #5 Summons Chris J. Yazzie Summons)(Morrill, LeeAnn)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: State of Colorado et al v. DeJoy et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of Colorado
Represented By: Peter G. Baumann
Represented By: Eric R. Olson
Represented By: Michael T. Kotlarczyk
Represented By: Emily B. Buckley
Represented By: LeeAnn Morrill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jena Griswold
Represented By: Peter G. Baumann
Represented By: Eric R. Olson
Represented By: Michael T. Kotlarczyk
Represented By: Emily B. Buckley
Represented By: LeeAnn Morrill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Postal Service
Represented By: Lauren Marie Dickey
Represented By: Kevin Thomas Traskos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Samarn S Reed
Represented By: Lauren Marie Dickey
Represented By: Kevin Thomas Traskos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chris J Yazzie
Represented By: Lauren Marie Dickey
Represented By: Kevin Thomas Traskos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Louis DeJoy
Represented By: Lauren Marie Dickey
Represented By: Kevin Thomas Traskos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?