Bussom v. Watford et al
Plaintiff: Andrew Bussom
Defendant: David W. Honeyfield, Michael D. Watford, Jerald J. Stratton, Jr., Garland R. Shaw and C. Bradley Johnson
Petitioner: Bala Settu, Sankar Karuppasamy, Yoav Givon, Harold Weber, Mahdi Riyad Issa, Scott Heiner and Geoffrey Polychronis
Case Number: 1:2020cv02820
Filed: September 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Kristen L Mix
Nature of Suit: Securities, Commodities, Exchange
Cause of Action: 15:78
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 29, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 MINUTE ORDER denying #7 Motion of Harold Weber for Consolidationof the Related Actions, Appointment as Lead Plaintiff, and Approval of Selection ofCounsel ; denying #9 Proposed Lead Plaintiff Sankar Kuruppasamys Motion for Consolidation of Related Actions, Appointment as Lead Plaintiff, and Approval of Lead Plaintiffs Selection of Lead Counsel ; denying #10 Motion of the Ultra Petroleum Investor Group for Consolidation of the Actions, Appointment as Lead Plaintiff, and Approval of Selection of Counsel. The issues raised in the Motions will be determined through resolution of the identical motions filed in20-cv-02652-CMA-STV. By Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 11/3/2020.(jgonz, )
November 2, 2020 Filing 11 DECLARATION of Jeffrey A. Berens regarding MOTION to Consolidate Cases , Appoint Lead Plaintiff, and Approve Selection of Counsel #10 by Movants Yoav Givon, Scott Heiner, Geoffrey Polychronis, Mahdi Riyad Issa, Bala Settu. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (PSLRA Certifications), #2 Exhibit B (Loss Chart), #3 Exhibit C (PSLRA Notice), #4 Exhibit D (Joint Declaration), #5 Exhibit E (L&K Resume), #6 Exhibit F (BE&S Resume), #7 Exhibit G (BL Resume))(Berens, Jeffrey)
November 2, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION to Consolidate Cases , Appoint Lead Plaintiff, and Approve Selection of Counsel by Movants Scott Heiner, Bala Settu, Geoffrey Polychronis, Mahdi Riyad Issa, Yoav Givon. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Berens, Jeffrey)
November 2, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION to Consolidate Cases , for Appointment as Lead Plaintiff, MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Movant Sankar Karuppasamy. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1- PSLRA Notice, #2 Exhibit 2- Certification, #3 Exhibit 3- Estimate of losses, #4 Exhibit 4- Declaration of Sankar Kuruppasamy, #5 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Myers, Danielle)
November 2, 2020 Filing 8 DECLARATION of Laurence Hasson regarding MOTION to Appoint Counsel and Appoint Lead Plaintiff MOTION to Consolidate Cases 1:20-cv-02820 and 1:20-cv-02652 #7 by Movant Harold Weber. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (Notice), #2 Exhibit B (Certification), #3 Exhibit C (Loss Chart), #4 Exhibit D (Declaration), #5 Exhibit E (Firm Resume))(Hasson, Laurence)
November 2, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION to Appoint Counsel and Appoint Lead Plaintiff, MOTION to Consolidate Cases 1:20-cv-02820 and 1:20-cv-02652 by Movant Harold Weber. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Hasson, Laurence)
September 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 9/24/20 Setting Scheduling/Planning Conference. Proposed Scheduling Order due by 1/12/2021. Scheduling/Planning Conference set for 1/19/2021 10:00 AM in Courtroom A 401 before Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix. (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1, #2 Attachment 2) (nmarb, )
September 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 MINUTE ORDER. Pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1(c)(4), the deadline to file the Consent/Non-Consent to United States Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction form [#3-1] is January 5, 2021. by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 9/24/2020. Text Only Entry (klmlc2, )
September 18, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Joseph Alexander Hood, II on behalf of Andrew BussomAttorney Joseph Alexander Hood, II added to party Andrew Bussom(pty:pla) (Hood, Joseph)
September 17, 2020 Filing 3 SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (cpomm, )
September 17, 2020 Filing 2 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix. Text Only Entry (cpomm, )
September 17, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against David W. Honeyfield, C. Bradley Johnson, Garland R. Shaw, Jerald J. Stratton, Jr., Michael D. Watford (Filing fee $ 400,Receipt Number 1082-7492837)Attorney Jeremy Alan Lieberman added to party Andrew Bussom(pty:pla), filed by Andrew Bussom. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Michael D. Watford, #3 Summons Garland R. Shaw, #4 Summons C. Bradley Johnson, #5 Summons David W. Honeyfield, #6 Summons Jerald J. Stratton, Jr.)(Lieberman, Jeremy)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bussom v. Watford et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David W. Honeyfield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael D. Watford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jerald J. Stratton, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Garland R. Shaw
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C. Bradley Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andrew Bussom
Represented By: Jeremy Alan Lieberman
Represented By: Joseph Alexander Hood, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Bala Settu
Represented By: Jeffrey Allen Berens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Sankar Karuppasamy
Represented By: Danielle S. Myers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Yoav Givon
Represented By: Jeffrey Allen Berens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Harold Weber
Represented By: Laurence Jesse Hasson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Mahdi Riyad Issa
Represented By: Jeffrey Allen Berens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Scott Heiner
Represented By: Jeffrey Allen Berens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Geoffrey Polychronis
Represented By: Jeffrey Allen Berens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?