Martin v. Denver Public Schools et al
Plaintiff: Brandi Martin
Defendant: Denver Public Schools, Jane Roe, Thomas Pelkey, John Roe, Ernest Makowsky, Denver Public Schools a Colorado public entity formerly known as School District No. 1 in the City and County of Denver doing business as Denver Public Schools, School District No., Thomas (I) Pelkey and Ernest (I) Makowsky
Case Number: 1:2020cv02829
Filed: September 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: N Reid Neureiter
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 27, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 27, 2020 Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Brandi Martin. Thomas Pelkey waiver sent on 10/26/2020, answer due 12/28/2020; Thomas (I) Pelkey waiver sent on 10/26/2020, answer due 12/28/2020. (Crichton, Charles)
October 27, 2020 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Brandi Martin. Denver Public Schools waiver sent on 10/26/2020, answer due 12/28/2020. (Crichton, Charles)
October 26, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance of Daniel P. Spivey by Daniel P. Spivey on behalf of Denver Public Schools, Thomas Pelkey, Thomas (I) PelkeyAttorney Daniel P. Spivey added to party Denver Public Schools(pty:dft), Attorney Daniel P. Spivey added to party Thomas Pelkey(pty:dft), Attorney Daniel P. Spivey added to party Thomas (I) Pelkey(pty:dft) (Spivey, Daniel)
October 26, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance of Michael Brent Case by Michael Brent Case on behalf of Denver Public Schools, Thomas Pelkey, Thomas (I) PelkeyAttorney Michael Brent Case added to party Denver Public Schools(pty:dft), Attorney Michael Brent Case added to party Thomas Pelkey(pty:dft), Attorney Michael Brent Case added to party Thomas (I) Pelkey(pty:dft) (Case, Michael)
September 22, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Stephen C. Kaufman on behalf of All Plaintiffs Attorney Stephen C. Kaufman added to party Brandi Martin(pty:pla) (Kaufman, Stephen)
September 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING/PLANNING CONFERENCE AND SETTING DEADLINE FOR FILING OF CONSENT/NON-CONSENT FORM by Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter on 22 September 2020. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that on or before November 26, 2020, the parties shall complete and file the Consent/Non-Consent Form. Proposed Scheduling Order due 12/3/2020. Scheduling Conference set for 12/10/2020 02:30 PM in Courtroom C203 before Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter. (cmadr, )
September 18, 2020 Filing 3 SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (cpomm, )
September 17, 2020 Filing 2 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter. Text Only Entry (cpomm, )
September 17, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400,Receipt Number 1082-7494101)Attorney Charles Griffith Crichton added to party Brandi Martin(pty:pla), filed by Brandi Martin. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Crichton, Charles)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Martin v. Denver Public Schools et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brandi Martin
Represented By: Charles Griffith Crichton
Represented By: Stephen C. Kaufman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Denver Public Schools
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Roe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas Pelkey
Represented By: Daniel P. Spivey
Represented By: Michael Brent Case
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Roe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ernest Makowsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Denver Public Schools a Colorado public entity formerly known as School District No. 1 in the City and County of Denver doing business as Denver Public Schools
Represented By: Daniel P. Spivey
Represented By: Michael Brent Case
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: School District No.
Represented By: Daniel P. Spivey
Represented By: Michael Brent Case
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas (I) Pelkey
Represented By: Daniel P. Spivey
Represented By: Michael Brent Case
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ernest (I) Makowsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?