Kinsman Construction, Inc. et al v. Verizon Wireless Services, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Kinsman Construction, Inc. and James Kinsman
Defendant: Commnet Cellular, Inc., Valor Intelligent Processing, LLC, Verizon Wireless Services, LLC, Commnet Cellular, Inc. a Colorado corporation doing business as Verizon Wireless and Verizon Wireless Service, LLC
Case Number: 1:2020cv02841
Filed: September 18, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: William J Martinez
Referring Judge: Scott T Varholak
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1681
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 13, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 20 MINUTE ORDER Pursuant to 18 Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge, a Scheduling Conference is set for 1/14/2021 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak. The parties shall participate in the conference by calling 888.808.6929 at the scheduled time and utilizing access code: 2805116#. The Court notes that the parties may hear the conclusion of a prior hearing at the time they call in, and are instructed to simply wait until their case is called. Proposed Scheduling Order due 1/7/2021. SO ORDERED, by Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak on 11/13/2020. Text Only Entry (stvlc2, )
November 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER: Counsel for the parties and all counsel who may later enter an appearance shall review and familiarize themselves with the undersigned's Revised Practice Standards (as most recently revised effective December 1, 2019 and as they may be amended from time to time), which may be downloaded #here. SO ORDERED by Judge William J. Martinez on 11 /13/2020. Text Only Entry (wjmsec, )
November 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak. Magistrate Judge Varholak, or such other Magistrate Judge who may in the future be reassigned this case, is designated to conduct NDISPO proceedings pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and Fed.R.Civ.P. 72(a) and (b). Court sponsored alternative dispute resolution is governed by D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.6. On the recommendation or informal request of the Magistrate Judge or on the request of the parties by motion, the court may direct the parties to engage in an early neutral evaluation, a settlement conference, or another alternative dispute resolution proceeding. SO ORDERED by Judge William J. Martinez on 11/13/2020. Text Only Entry (wjmsec, )
November 9, 2020 Filing 17 MEMORANDUM RETURNING CASE, by Senior Judge Lewis T. Babcock. This case is randomly returned to Judge William J. Martinez for all further proceedings. All future pleadings should be designated as 20-cv-2841-WJM (angar, )
November 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 MINUTE ORDER In light of 15 Case Reassignment and because no affidavit of service has yet been filed with regard to Defendant Commnet Cellular, Inc., the Scheduling Conference set for 11/16/2020 09:15 AM, and related deadlines, are VACATED to be reset if this matter is referred to this Court. SO ORDERED, by Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak on 11/09/2020. Text Only Entry (stvlc1, )
November 6, 2020 Filing 15 CASE REASSIGNED pursuant to #14 Consent/Non-Consent to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge. All parties do not consent. This case is randomly reassigned to Judge Lewis T. Babcock. All future pleadings should be designated as 20-cv-02841-LTB. (Text Only Entry) (jgonz, )
November 5, 2020 Filing 14 CONSENT to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge by Plaintiffs James Kinsman, Kinsman Construction, Inc. All parties do not consent.. (Winkler, Dart)
October 19, 2020 Filing 13 ANSWER to #3 Complaint by Valor Intelligent Processing, LLC.(Emery, Alison)
October 16, 2020 Filing 12 ANSWER to #3 Complaint by Verizon Wireless Service, LLC.(Williams, Daniel)
September 27, 2020 Filing 11 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. (Emery, Alison)
September 27, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Alison Nicole Emery on behalf of Valor Intelligent Processing, LLCAttorney Alison Nicole Emery added to party Valor Intelligent Processing, LLC(pty:dft) (Emery, Alison)
September 25, 2020 Filing 9 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to Answer or Respond to the Complaint by Defendant Verizon Wireless Service, LLC. Verizon Wireless Service, LLC answer due 10/16/2020. (Williams, Daniel)
September 22, 2020 Filing 8 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent Verizon Communications Inc., Other Affiliate Verizon Communications Inc., Other Affiliate MCI Communications Services, Inc., Other Affiliate Bell Atlantic Mobile Systems LLC, Other Affiliate Verizon Americas Inc., Other Affiliate Cellco Partnership d/b/a Verizon Wireless, Other Affiliate GTE Wireless Services LLC, Other Affiliate Verizon Ventures LLC, Other Affiliate NYNEX LLC, Other Affiliate GTE Wireless of the Midwest Incorporated, Other Affiliate GTE LLC for Verizon Wireless Service, LLC. (Williams, Daniel)
September 22, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Dart Morgan Winkler on behalf of James Kinsman, Kinsman Construction, Inc.Attorney Dart Morgan Winkler added to party James Kinsman(pty:pla), Attorney Dart Morgan Winkler added to party Kinsman Construction, Inc.(pty:pla) (Winkler, Dart)
September 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER SETTING DEADLINE FOR FILING ELECTION CONCERNING CONSENT/NON-CONSENT TO MAGISTRATE JURISDICTION FORM AND SETTING TELEPHONIC SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak on 21 September 2020. Consent Form due by 11/5/2020. Proposed Scheduling Order due 11/12/2020. Scheduling Conference set for 11/16/2020 09:15 AM in Courtroom A 402 before Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak. (cmadr, )
September 18, 2020 Filing 5 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1, direct assignment of civil actions to full time magistrate judges. (alave, )
September 18, 2020 Filing 4 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak. Text Only Entry. (alave, )
September 18, 2020 Filing 3 COMPLAINT AND JURY DEMAND against Commnet Cellular, Inc., Valor Intelligent Processing, LLC, Verizon Wireless Service, LLC, filed by Kinsman Construction, Inc., James Kinsman.(alave, )
September 18, 2020 Filing 2 FIRST AND FINAL NOTICE TO ALL ATTORNEY(S) AND UNREPRESENTED PARTIES IN REMOVED, TRANSFERRED, OR OTHER CASES. To receive any further notice in a case removed or transferred to this court, or special matters including discovery disputes, bankruptcy appeals, or withdrawals of reference, Multi-district litigation (MDL), etc., all attorneys and unrepresented parties must enter an appearance under D.C.COLO.LAttyR 5(a). An attorney must be an active member of this court's bar and be in good standing in accordance with D.C.COLO.LAttyR 3. A waiver of the fee for bar admission may apply in limited situations. (Text Only Entry) (alave, )
September 18, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Verizon Wireless Services, LLC from Jefferson District Court, Case Number 2020CV31040. (Filing fee $ 400, Receipt Number 1082-7496330), filed by Verizon Wireless Services, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)(Williams, Daniel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kinsman Construction, Inc. et al v. Verizon Wireless Services, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commnet Cellular, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Valor Intelligent Processing, LLC
Represented By: Alison Nicole Emery
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Verizon Wireless Services, LLC
Represented By: Daniel J. Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commnet Cellular, Inc. a Colorado corporation doing business as Verizon Wireless
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Verizon Wireless Service, LLC
Represented By: Daniel J. Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kinsman Construction, Inc.
Represented By: Dart Morgan Winkler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Kinsman
Represented By: Dart Morgan Winkler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?