Colorado Public Employees' Retirement Association v. PERA, LLC
Plaintiff: Colorado Public Employees' Retirement Association
Defendant: PERA, LLC
Case Number: 1:2020cv02900
Filed: September 24, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: R Brooke Jackson
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1332nr
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 16, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 MINUTE ORDER re: 16 Case Reassigned. In light of the reassignment of this case to this Court the 12/11/2020 Scheduling Conference set before Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter is vacated. Due to the COVID-19 pandemic, this Court will not hold a scheduling conference. The Court requests that counsel confer and attempt to agree on a schedule and submit a proposed scheduling order by 12/4/2020 pointing out any areas of disagreement. Please email the proposed order to Jackson_Chambers@cod.uscourts.gov in Word format and efile into CM/ECF. The Court will review the proposed order and make such rulings as are appropriate and will provide the parties with potential trial preparation conference and trial dates for you to choose from. By Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 11/16/2020. Text Only Entry (rbjsec,)
November 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 MINUTE ORDER: This case has been reassigned to this Chambers. I inform the parties that as a former Colorado state district judge (in the First Judicial District) I was enrolled in PERA, and now as a retired state court judge, I continue to maintain a PERA retirement account and to receive PERA benefits. Although I do not believe that those things would affect my ability to be impartial, I invite the parties to come forward now if they believe that there would be the appearance of partiality that would cause me to consider recusal. By Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 11/16/2020. Text Only Entry (rbjsec. )
November 13, 2020 Filing 16 CASE REASSIGNED pursuant to #15 . All parties do not consent. This case is randomly reassigned to Judge R. Brooke Jackson. All future pleadings should be designated as 20-cv-02900-RBJ. (Text Only Entry) (cmadr, )
November 13, 2020 Filing 15 CONSENT to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge by Plaintiff Colorado Public Employees' Retirement Association All parties do not consent.. (Durling, Caleb)
November 9, 2020 Filing 14 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Edgar Oswaldo Barraza on behalf of Colorado Public Employees' Retirement AssociationAttorney Edgar Oswaldo Barraza added to party Colorado Public Employees' Retirement Association(pty:pla) (Barraza, Edgar)
September 30, 2020 Filing 13 ADVISORY NOTICE OF NONCOMPLIANCE WITH COURT RULES/PROCEDURES:re: #10 Notice of Entry of Appearance filed by attorney Marcus Levi Mintz. Attorney has used an incorrect signature format in violation of D.C.COLO.LCivR 5.1(a) and 4.3(a) of the Electronic Case Filing Procedures (Civil cases). DO NOT REFILE THE DOCUMENT. In the future, the filer must affix an electronic s/signature and s/followed by a typed, not an inked, signature to all future documents.(Text Only Entry) (cmadr, )
September 30, 2020 Filing 12 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent Grow Capital, Inc. for PERA, LLC. (Gregory, Lauren)
September 30, 2020 Filing 11 ANSWER to Complaint by PERA, LLC.(Gregory, Lauren)
September 29, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Marcus Levi Mintz on behalf of PERA, LLCAttorney Marcus Levi Mintz added to party PERA, LLC(pty:dft) (Mintz, Marcus)
September 28, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Lauren Martha Gregory on behalf of PERA, LLC (Gregory, Lauren)
September 28, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE re 2 Administrative Notice, Filing Exhibits of State Court by Defendant PERA, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Summons, #2 Exhibit Complaint)(Gregory, Lauren)
September 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING/PLANNING CONFERENCE AND SETTING DEADLINE FOR FILING OF CONSENT/NON-CONSENT FORM by Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter on 28 September 2020. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that on or before November 25, 2020, the parties shall complete and file the Consent/Non-Consent Form (see Dkt. #5 ).Proposed Scheduling Order due 12/4/2020. Scheduling Conference set for 12/11/2020 10:30 AM in Courtroom C203 before Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter. The Scheduling Conference will be conducted via telephone. The parties are directed to call the conference line as a participant at (888) 398-2342, Access Code 5755390# at the scheduled time. (cmadr, )
September 28, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Caleb Durling on behalf of All Plaintiffs Attorney Caleb Durling added to party Colorado Public Employees' Retirement Association(pty:pla) (Durling, Caleb)
September 24, 2020 Filing 5 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1, direct assignment of civil actions to full time magistrate judges. (cpomm, )
September 24, 2020 Filing 4 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter. Text Only Entry (cpomm, )
September 24, 2020 Filing 3 FIRST AND FINAL NOTICE TO ALL ATTORNEY(S) AND UNREPRESENTED PARTIES IN REMOVED, TRANSFERRED, OR OTHER CASES. To receive any further notice in a case removed or transferred to this court, or special matters including discovery disputes, bankruptcy appeals, or withdrawals of reference, Multi-district litigation (MDL), etc., all attorneys and unrepresented parties must enter an appearance under D.C.COLO.LAttyR 5(a). An attorney must be an active member of this court's bar and be in good standing in accordance with D.C.COLO.LAttyR 3. A waiver of the fee for bar admission may apply in limited situations. (Text Only Entry) (cpomm, )
September 24, 2020 Filing 2 Administrative Notice: Notice to filer of non-compliance with Notice of Removal case opening procedures. It is the responsibility of the attorney or pro se party removing the case to follow Local Rule D.C.COLO.LCivR 81.1, and 28 U.S.C. 1446(a). Each of the state court documents shall be individual PDFs. See Appendix B Notice of Removal, in the User Guide - Attorney Case Opening Procedures document. (Text Only Entry) (cpomm, )
September 24, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by PERA, LLC from District Court, Denver County, Colorado, Case Number 2020cv33058. (Filing fee $ 400, Receipt Number 1082-7505861), filed by PERA, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 to Notice of Removal, #2 Exhibit 2 to Notice of Removal, #3 Exhibit 3 to Notice of Removal, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Gregory, Lauren)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Colorado Public Employees' Retirement Association v. PERA, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Colorado Public Employees' Retirement Association
Represented By: Caleb Durling
Represented By: Edgar Oswaldo Barraza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PERA, LLC
Represented By: Lauren Martha Gregory
Represented By: Marcus Levi Mintz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?