Borden v. County of Costilla, Colorado et
Plaintiff: Ronald L Borden
Defendant: State of Colorado, United Parcel Service, County of Costilla, Colorado and Capital One Financial Corporation
Case Number: 1:2020cv02905
Filed: September 24, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: R Brooke Jackson
Referring Judge: Kathleen M Tafoya
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 16, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 29 MINUTE ORDER re: #16 Letter filed by County of Costilla, Colorado, #20 Letter filed by United Parcel Service, #25 Letter filed by Capital One Financial Corporation and #28 Letter filed by State of Colorado. The Court has reviewed the several defendants' letters, submitted in compliance with the Court's practice standards. ECF Nos. 16, 20, 25, 28. The Court notes that the plaintiff apparently hung up on, or refused to discuss the case with, defense counsel who were attempted to confer in compliance with the Court's practice standards. The Court further notes that it appears that at lease several, if not all, of the defendants have valid defenses, and that plaintiff probably should reconsider his claims against them. In the circumstances the Court deems each of the four letters to be a motion to dismiss pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6). The plaintiff is granted until December 7, 2020 to respond to the motions to dismiss. The defendants are granted until December 21, 2020 to reply. By Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 11/16/2020. Text Only Entry (rbjsec.)
November 12, 2020 Filing 28 LETTER re: #1 Complaint, Bases for Motion to Dismiss by Defendant State of Colorado. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Attachment)(Morrill, LeeAnn)
November 12, 2020 Filing 27 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by LeeAnn Morrill on behalf of State of ColoradoAttorney LeeAnn Morrill added to party State of Colorado(pty:dft) (Morrill, LeeAnn)
November 12, 2020 Filing 26 CERTIFICATE of Mailing/Service DEFENDANT UNITED PARCEL SERVICE, INC.S AMENDED CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Defendant United Parcel Service. (Llewellyn, Scott)
November 12, 2020 Filing 25 LETTER RE: Capital Ones Request and Basis for F.R.C.P. 12(b)(6) Motion to Dismiss by Defendant Capital One Financial Corporation. (Crotty, Rebecca)
November 12, 2020 Filing 24 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. (Crotty, Rebecca)
November 12, 2020 Filing 23 RESPONSE to #12 MOTION for Reconsideration of Injunctive Relief filed by Defendant County of Costilla, Colorado. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Let to Judge Jackson)(Stewart, Betsy)
November 11, 2020 Filing 22 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance of Sarah E. Barr by Scott F. Llewellyn on behalf of United Parcel Service (Llewellyn, Scott)
November 11, 2020 Filing 21 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. (Llewellyn, Scott)
November 11, 2020 Filing 20 LETTER UPS Pre-Mot. To Dismiss Letter to Court by Defendant United Parcel Service. (Llewellyn, Scott)
November 11, 2020 Filing 19 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Scott F. Llewellyn on behalf of United Parcel ServiceAttorney Scott F. Llewellyn added to party United Parcel Service(pty:dft) (Llewellyn, Scott)
November 9, 2020 Filing 18 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Rebecca Lynn Crotty on behalf of Capital One Financial CorporationAttorney Rebecca Lynn Crotty added to party Capital One Financial Corporation(pty:dft) (Crotty, Rebecca)
November 9, 2020 Filing 17 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Edward P. Timmins on behalf of Capital One Financial CorporationAttorney Edward P. Timmins added to party Capital One Financial Corporation(pty:dft) (Timmins, Edward)
November 6, 2020 Filing 16 LETTER to Judge Jackson re Basis for Motion to Dismiss by Defendant County of Costilla, Colorado. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Stewart, Betsy)
October 28, 2020 Filing 15 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Betsy L. Stewart on behalf of County of Costilla, ColoradoAttorney Betsy L. Stewart added to party County of Costilla, Colorado(pty:dft) (Stewart, Betsy)
October 28, 2020 Filing 14 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Thomas S. Rice on behalf of County of Costilla, ColoradoAttorney Thomas S. Rice added to party County of Costilla, Colorado(pty:dft) (Rice, Thomas)
October 23, 2020 Filing 13 MEMORANDUM regarding #12 MOTION to Reconsider Injunctive Relief filed by Ronald L Borden. Motion #12 is referred to Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya, by Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 10/23/2020. Text Only Entry (rbjsec. )
October 22, 2020 Filing 12 MOTION to Reconsider Injunctive Relief by Plaintiff Ronald L Borden. (rvill, )
October 8, 2020 Filing 11 TENDERED Documents by Plaintiff Ronald L Borden (rvill, )
October 8, 2020 Filing 10 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c). (jtorr, )
October 8, 2020 Filing 9 SUMMONS issued in Paper Format by Clerk. (jtorr, )
October 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER denying without prejudice #2 Pretrial Motion for Injunctive Relief by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 10/8/2020.(jgonz, )
September 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER denying #3 Motion for Procedural Relief. Plaintiff must serve the defendants in accordance with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4. By Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 9/28/2020. Text Only Entry(kmtlc1 )
September 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya, as indicated.Motions #2 and #3 referred to Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya by Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 9/28/20. (jdyne, )
September 24, 2020 Filing 5 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c). (cpomm, ) The summons submitted has incorrect caption and not issued. Please file completed summons for issuance using the event Summons Request.
September 24, 2020 Filing 4 Case assigned to Judge R. Brooke Jackson and drawn to Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya. Text Only Entry (cpomm, )
September 24, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION for Procedural Relief by Plaintiff Ronald L Borden. (cpomm, )
September 24, 2020 Filing 2 Pretrial MOTION for Injunctive Relief. by Plaintiff Ronald L Borden. (cpomm, )
September 24, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Capital One Financial Corporation, County of Costilla, Colorado, State of Colorado, United Parcel Service Filing Fee: $400Receipt Number:COX096530, filed by Ronald L Borden. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Continuation of Main Document, #3 Envelope, #4 Summons)(cpomm, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Borden v. County of Costilla, Colorado et
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronald L Borden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of Colorado
Represented By: LeeAnn Morrill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Parcel Service
Represented By: Scott F. Llewellyn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: County of Costilla, Colorado
Represented By: Thomas S. Rice
Represented By: Betsy L. Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Capital One Financial Corporation
Represented By: Edward P. Timmins
Represented By: Rebecca Lynn Crotty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?