CAMON v. TEKSYSTEMS INC. et al
Plaintiff: Eugene Camon
Defendant: TEKsystems Inc., Keith Bozeman, Erika Hines, Fiath Rottman Johnson, Jay Alvather, Frederick Berry and TEKsystems Global Services, LLC
Case Number: 1:2020cv02915
Filed: September 25, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000e
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 25, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 25, 2020 Filing 11 Civil Case Terminated. Case transferred from Eastern District of Pennsylvania in error. Text Only Entry. (jtorr, )
September 25, 2020 Filing 10 Case transferred in from District of Pennsylvania Eastern; Case Number 2:17-cv-03401. File, transfer order and docket sheet received
October 18, 2017 Filing 9 REQUEST FOR APPOINTMENT OF ATTORNEY by EUGENE CAMON. (rf, ) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 9/25/2020.]
October 18, 2017 Filing 8 COMPLAINT against JAY ALVATHER, FREDERICK BERRY, KEITH BOZEMAN, ERIKA HINES, FIATH ROTTMAN JOHNSON, TEKSYSTEMS GLOBAL SERVICES, LLC, TEKSYSTEMS INC., filed by EUGENE CAMON. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(rf, ) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 9/25/2020.]
October 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER THAT COURTS ORDER OF 10/13/17 IS VACATED. THE CLERK OF COURT SHALL REOPEN THIS CASE. LEAVE TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS IS GRANTED PURSUANT TO 28 U.S.C. 1915. THE CLERK OF COURT IS DIRECTED TO TRANSFER THE ABOVE CAPTIONED CASE TO THE UNITED STATES DISTRICT FOR THE DISTRICT OF COLORADO. THE CLERK OF COURT FOR THE EASTERN DISTRICT OF PENNSYLVANIA SHALL NOT ISSUE SUMMONSES AT THIS TIME. SIGNED BY HONORABLE WENDY BEETLESTONE ON 10/18/17. 10/18/17 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO PRO SE.(rf, ) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 9/25/2020.]
October 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER THAT PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT IS DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE FOR FAILURE TO COMPLY WITH THE COURTS ORDER DATED 8/7/17 (DOC. 2) CLERK OF COURT IS DIRECTED TO CLOSE CASE. SIGNED BY HONORABLE WENDY BEETLESTONE ON 10/11/17. 10/13/17 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO CAMON.(rf, ) Modified on 10/18/2017 (rf, ). *ORDER IS VACATED PER COURT ORDER OF 10/18/17, DOC. 7* [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 9/25/2020.]
October 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER THAT THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED FROM HONORABLE LEGROME D. DAVIS TO HONORABLE WENDY BEETLESTONE FOR ALL FURTHER PROCEEDINGS. SIGNED BY CLERK OF COURT KATE BARKMAN, CLERK OF COURT ON 10/4/17. 10/5/17 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO CAMON.(rf, ) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 9/25/2020.]
September 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER THAT PLAINTIFS MOTION ELECTRONIC FILING ACCESS (DOC. 3) IS DENIED AS OUTLINED HEREIN. SIGNED BY HONORABLE LEGROME D. DAVIS ON 8/28/17. 9/5/17 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO CAMON.(rf, ) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 9/25/2020.]
August 23, 2017 Filing 3 Request for ECF Access filed by EUGENE CAMON. (mbh, ) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 9/25/2020.]
August 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER THAT THE CLERK OF COURT SHALL RETURN PLAINTIFFS UNSIGNED COMPLAINT TO HIM AND SHALL RETAIN A COPY IN THE CIVIL ACTION FILE. IF PLAINTIFF SEEKS TO PROCEED WITH THIS CASE, HE SHALL SIGN THE COMPLAINT AND RETURN IT TO THE COURT WITHIN 30 DAYS OF THE DATE OF THIS ORDER. IF PLAINTIFF FAILS TO COMPLY WITH THIS ORDER, HIS CASE MAY BE DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE WITHOUT FURTHER NOTICE. SIGNED BY HONORABLE LEGROME D. DAVIS ON 8/7/17. 8/7/17 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO PRO PLAINTIFF. *ORIGINAL COMPLAINT RETURNED TO PRO SE PLAINTIFF FOR SIGNATURE*(rf, ) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/15/2017: #1 SIGNED COMPLAINT) (rf, ). [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 9/25/2020.]
July 31, 2017 Filing 1 APPLICATION TO PROCEED IN DISTRICT WITHOUT PREPAYING FEES OR COSTS by EUGENE CAMON. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Request for Appointment of Attorney)(rt) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 9/25/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: CAMON v. TEKSYSTEMS INC. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TEKsystems Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Keith Bozeman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Erika Hines
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fiath Rottman Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jay Alvather
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Frederick Berry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TEKsystems Global Services, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eugene Camon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?