New Leaf Data Services, LLC v. PanXchange, Inc.
Plaintiff: New Leaf Data Services, LLC
Defendant: PanXchange, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2020cv02938
Filed: September 29, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: R Brooke Jackson
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1051
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 11, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 11, 2020 Filing 44 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Benjamin N. Luehrs on behalf of New Leaf Data Services, LLCAttorney Benjamin N. Luehrs added to party New Leaf Data Services, LLC(pty:pla) (Luehrs, Benjamin)
November 11, 2020 Filing 43 ANSWER/REPLY to #42 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim by New Leaf Data Services, LLC.(Ball, Stephen)
October 21, 2020 Filing 42 Defendant's ANSWER to #1 Complaint, Affirmative Defenses, COUNTERCLAIM against New Leaf Data Services, LLC by PanXchange, Inc..(Bruno, Harold)
October 13, 2020 Filing 41 NOTICE - Civil Cover Sheet by Plaintiff New Leaf Data Services, LLC (Ball, Stephen)
October 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 40 MINUTE ORDER re: #38 Stipulation for Extension of Time to Answer/Respond to Complaint filed by PanXchange, Inc. PanXchange shall have up to and including October 21, 2020 to file its answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint. By Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 10/1/2020. Text Only Entry (rbjsec. )
September 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER granting #37 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney MOTION TO SUBSTITUTE COUNSEL FOR PANXCHANGE, INC. AND WITHDRAW PRIOR COUNSEL. By Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 9/30/2020.(rbjsec.)
September 30, 2020 Filing 38 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to Answer or Respond to the Complaint by Defendant PanXchange, Inc.. PanXchange, Inc. answer due 9/30/2020. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Bruno, Harold)
September 30, 2020 Filing 37 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney MOTION TO SUBSTITUTE COUNSEL FOR PANXCHANGE, INC. AND WITHDRAW PRIOR COUNSEL by Defendant PanXchange, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Bruno, Harold)
September 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 36 MINUTE ORDER: Due to the COVID-19 pandemic the Court will not hold a Scheduling Conference. The Court requests that counsel confer and attempt to agree on a schedule and submit a proposed scheduling order no later than 45 days after the answer, motion to dismiss or other response to the complaint is filed pointing out any areas of disagreement. Please email the proposed order to Jackson_Chambers@cod.uscourts.gov in Word format and efile into CM/ECF. The Court will review the proposed order and make such rulings as are appropriate. The proposed scheduling order should be prepared as described in the local rules. A copy of instructions for the preparation of a scheduling order and a form scheduling order can be downloaded from the Courts website www.cod.uscourts.gov/CourtOperations/RulesProcedures/Forms.aspx. By Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 9/30/2020. Text Only Entry (rbjsec.)
September 29, 2020 Filing 35 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Stephen F.W. Ball, Jr on behalf of New Leaf Data Services, LLCAttorney Stephen F.W. Ball, Jr added to party New Leaf Data Services, LLC(pty:pla) (Ball, Stephen)
September 29, 2020 Filing 34 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c). (jsalz, )
September 29, 2020 Filing 33 Report re Patent/Trademark: Report on the filing of an action emailed (NEF) to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (jsalz, )
September 29, 2020 Filing 32 Case assigned to Judge R. Brooke Jackson and drawn to Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix. Text Only Entry. (jsalz, )
September 29, 2020 Filing 31 FIRST AND FINAL NOTICE TO ALL ATTORNEY(S) AND UNREPRESENTED PARTIES IN REMOVED, TRANSFERRED, OR OTHER CASES. To receive any further notice in a case removed or transferred to this court, or special matters including discovery disputes, bankruptcy appeals, or withdrawals of reference, Multi-district litigation (MDL), etc., all attorneys and unrepresented parties must enter an appearance under D.C.COLO.LAttyR 5(a). An attorney must be an active member of this court's bar and be in good standing in accordance with D.C.COLO.LAttyR 3. A waiver of the fee for bar admission may apply in limited situations. (Text Only Entry) (jsalz, )
September 29, 2020 Filing 30 Case transferred in from District of Connecticut; Case Number 3:20-cv-00204. File, transfer order and docket sheet received
September 17, 2020 JUDICIAL PROCEEDINGS SURVEY - FOR COUNSEL ONLY: The following link to the confidential survey requires you to log into CM/ECF for SECURITY purposes. Once in CM/ECF you will be prompted for the case number. Although you are receiving this survey through CM/ECF, it is hosted on an independent website called SurveyMonkey. Once in SurveyMonkey, the survey is located in a secure account. The survey is not docketed and it is not sent directly to the judge. To ensure anonymity, completed surveys are held up to 90 days before they are sent to the judge for review. We hope you will take this opportunity to participate, please click on this link: https://ecf.ctd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/Dispatch.pl?survey (Fanelle, N.) [Transferred from Connecticut on 9/29/2020.]
September 16, 2020 Filing 29 AO 120 Report on the Determination of an Action re: Patent or Trademark Form Completed. (Fanelle, N.) [Transferred from Connecticut on 9/29/2020.]
September 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER denying #22 Motion to Transfer to the District of Delaware; denying as moot #14 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1404(a), The Court ORDERS this action transferred to the United States District Court for the District of Colorado, for the reasons stated in the attached Memorandum of Decision. Signed by Judge Kari A. Dooley on 9/16/2020. (Cahill, Leslie) [Transferred from Connecticut on 9/29/2020.]
July 27, 2020 Filing 27 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Ball, Stephen) [Transferred from Connecticut on 9/29/2020.]
July 15, 2020 Filing 26 REPLY to Response to #22 MOTION to Transfer to Another District filed by New Leaf Data Services, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Stephen Ball, #2 Exhibit A)(Ball, Stephen) [Transferred from Connecticut on 9/29/2020.]
July 10, 2020 Filing 25 NOTICE of Appearance by Benjamin N. Luehrs on behalf of New Leaf Data Services, LLC (Luehrs, Benjamin) [Transferred from Connecticut on 9/29/2020.]
July 1, 2020 Filing 24 Memorandum in Opposition re #22 MOTION to Transfer to Another District filed by PanXchange, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Julie Lerner, #2 Affidavit Declaration of Jordan C. Strauss, #3 Exhibit A Kennedy LinkedIn Profile, #4 Exhibit B Koh LinkedIn Profile, #5 Exhibit C Holecek LinkedIn Profile, #6 Exhibit D Tewalt LinkedIn Profile, #7 Exhibit E New Leaf Hemp Benchmarks Team webpage, #8 Exhibit F Google Maps from CO to DE Courthouse, #9 Exhibit G Google Maps from CO to CO Courthouse, #10 Exhibit H Barrett LinkedIn Profile, #11 Exhibit I Cannabis Benchmarks About us webpage, #12 Exhibit J LinkedIn Page for Cannabis Benchmarks, #13 Exhibit K Rubin LinkedIn profile, #14 Exhibit L Shah LinkedIn profile, #15 Exhibit M Shah Biography on New Leaf website, #16 Exhibit N Laird LinkedIn profile)(Strauss, Jordan) [Transferred from Connecticut on 9/29/2020.]
June 24, 2020 Filing 23 REPLY to Response to #14 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by PanXchange, Inc.. (Strauss, Jordan) [Transferred from Connecticut on 9/29/2020.]
June 12, 2020 Filing 22 MOTION to Transfer to Another District by New Leaf Data Services, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Declaration of Stephen Ball, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Text of Proposed Order)(Ball, Stephen) [Transferred from Connecticut on 9/29/2020.]
June 12, 2020 Filing 21 Memorandum in Opposition re #14 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by New Leaf Data Services, LLC. (Ball, Stephen) [Transferred from Connecticut on 9/29/2020.]
May 12, 2020 Reset Deadline: Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 7/27/2020 (Gould, K.) [Transferred from Connecticut on 9/29/2020.]
May 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER granting on consent #19 Motion for Extension of Time. Plaintiff shall file its opposition to the motion to dismiss on or before June 12, 2020 and Defendant shall file its reply brief on or before July 10, 2020. The parties' joint Rule 26(f) Report shall be filed on or before July 27, 2020. The deadline for filing the joint Rule 26(f) Report shall not be further extended. In addition, counsel are reminded that pursuant to Local Rule 7(b)(3): "All motions for extension of time shall be filed at least three (3) days before the deadline sought to be extended, except in cases in which compelling circumstances warranting an extension arise during the three days before the deadline. Any motion for extension of time filed fewer than three days before the deadline sought to be extended shall, in addition to satisfying all other requirements of this Rule, set forth reasons why the motion was not filed at least three days before the deadline in question." Future failures to comply with Local Rule 7(b)(3) may result in the denial of non-compliant motions for extension of time without prejudice to refiling of a compliant motion. Signed by Judge Kari A. Dooley on 5/8/2020. (Cahill, Leslie) [Transferred from Connecticut on 9/29/2020.]
May 8, 2020 Filing 19 MOTION for Extension of Time until of 35 Days to Extend (Unopposed) Case Schedule by New Leaf Data Services, LLC. (Ball, Stephen) [Transferred from Connecticut on 9/29/2020.]
April 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting on consent #17 Motion for Extension of Time. Plaintiff shall file its opposition to the motion to dismiss on or before May 8, 2020, and Defendant shall file its reply brief on or before June 5, 2020. The parties' joint Rule 26(f) Report shall be filed on or before June 22, 2020. Signed by Judge Kari A. Dooley on 4/15/2020. (Cahill, Leslie) [Transferred from Connecticut on 9/29/2020.]
April 14, 2020 Filing 17 MOTION for Extension of Time (Unopposed) for the Briefing Schedule Regarding Defendant's Motion to Dismiss and to Hold Rule 26(f) Conference by New Leaf Data Services, LLC. (Ball, Stephen) [Transferred from Connecticut on 9/29/2020.]
March 31, 2020 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Jordan Christine Strauss on behalf of PanXchange, Inc. (Strauss, Jordan) [Transferred from Connecticut on 9/29/2020.]
March 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #13 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Jordan C. Strauss. Signed by Clerk on 3/30/2020. (Fanelle, N.) [Transferred from Connecticut on 9/29/2020.]
March 27, 2020 Filing 14 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by PanXchange, Inc..Responses due by 4/17/2020 (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Affidavit (Declaration of Julie Lerner)(Corea, Andy) [Transferred from Connecticut on 9/29/2020.]
March 27, 2020 Filing 13 MOTION for Attorney(s) Jordan C. Strauss to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-5773391) by PanXchange, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Corea, Andy) [Transferred from Connecticut on 9/29/2020.]
March 27, 2020 Filing 12 Corporate Disclosure Statement by PanXchange, Inc.. (Corea, Andy) [Transferred from Connecticut on 9/29/2020.]
March 27, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Andy I. Corea on behalf of PanXchange, Inc. (Corea, Andy) [Transferred from Connecticut on 9/29/2020.]
March 26, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Amanda K. Greenspon on behalf of PanXchange, Inc. (Greenspon, Amanda) [Transferred from Connecticut on 9/29/2020.]
March 18, 2020 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by New Leaf Data Services, LLC. PanXchange, Inc. served on 3/13/2020, answer due 4/3/2020. (Ball, Stephen) [Transferred from Connecticut on 9/29/2020.]
February 13, 2020 Filing 8 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *PanXchange, Inc.* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Stephen F.W. Ball, Jr.* *Whitmyer IP Group LLC* *600 Summer Street* *Stamford, Ct 06901*. (Fazekas, J.) [Transferred from Connecticut on 9/29/2020.]
February 13, 2020 Filing 7 AO 120 Report on the Filing of an Action re: Patent or Trademark Form Completed (Attachments: #1 Complaint & Exhibits) (Fazekas, J.) [Transferred from Connecticut on 9/29/2020.]
February 13, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #1 Complaint, filed by New Leaf Data Services, LLC, #5 Standing Protective Order, #4 Electronic Filing Order, #3 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #2 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by New Leaf Data Services, LLC Signed by Clerk on 02/13/2020.(Fazekas, J.) [Transferred from Connecticut on 9/29/2020.]
February 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Kari A. Dooley on 02/12/2020.(Fazekas, J.) [Transferred from Connecticut on 9/29/2020.]
February 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Kari A. Dooley on 02/12/2020.(Fazekas, J.) [Transferred from Connecticut on 9/29/2020.]
February 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 4/12/2020. Discovery due by 8/13/2020. Dispositive Motions due by 9/17/2020. Signed by Clerk on 02/12/2020.(Fazekas, J.) [Transferred from Connecticut on 9/29/2020.]
February 12, 2020 Judge Kari A. Dooley added. (Oliver, T.) [Transferred from Connecticut on 9/29/2020.]
February 12, 2020 Request for Clerk to issue summons as to PanXchange, Inc.. (Ball, Stephen) [Transferred from Connecticut on 9/29/2020.]
February 12, 2020 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by New Leaf Data Services, LLC. (Ball, Stephen) [Transferred from Connecticut on 9/29/2020.]
February 12, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Trademark Infringement against PanXchange, Inc. ( Filing fee $400 receipt number ACTDC-5692546.), filed by New Leaf Data Services, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Civil Cover Sheet)(Ball, Stephen) [Transferred from Connecticut on 9/29/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: New Leaf Data Services, LLC v. PanXchange, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PanXchange, Inc.
Represented By: Harold R. Bruno, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: New Leaf Data Services, LLC
Represented By: Stephen F.W. Ball, Jr.
Represented By: Benjamin N. Luehrs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?