McGrew v. UBS Financial Services, Inc.
Plaintiff: Kelly McGrew
Defendant: UBS Financial Services, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2020cv02967
Filed: October 1, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Kathleen M Tafoya
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 29:621
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 4, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 4, 2020 Filing 12 Civil Case Administratively Closed pursuant to Order #11. Text Only Entry (jgonz, )
November 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #8 Motion for Administrative Closure of Case Pending Arbitration. This case is administratively closed pending completion of arbitration, pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 41.2. The case is subject to reopening upon the filing of a motion showing good cause. By Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 11/4/2020. Text Only Entry(kmtlc1)
November 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER OF REFERENCE. Pursuant to the consent of the parties to the jurisdiction of the magistrate judge #9 , this case is referred to Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya for all purposes pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c), by Chief Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 11/4/2020. Text Only Entry (pabsec2)
November 3, 2020 Filing 9 CONSENT to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge by Plaintiff Kelly McGrew All parties consent.. (Lewis, Paul)
November 2, 2020 Filing 8 Unopposed MOTION to Stay re #1 Complaint, Unopposed Motion for Administrative Closure of Case Pending Arbitration by Defendant UBS Financial Services, Inc.. (Keesal, Samuel)
October 20, 2020 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Kelly McGrew. UBS Financial Services, Inc. served on 10/14/2020, answer due 11/4/2020. (Lewis, Paul)
October 6, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Andrew Edward Swan on behalf of Kelly McGrewAttorney Andrew Edward Swan added to party Kelly McGrew(pty:pla) (Swan, Andrew)
October 6, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Michael Dickson Kuhn on behalf of Kelly McGrewAttorney Michael Dickson Kuhn added to party Kelly McGrew(pty:pla) (Kuhn, Michael)
October 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER Setting Initial Case Deadlines, by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 10/5/2020. Consent Form due by 11/30/2020. Proposed Scheduling Order due 11/30/2020 (jgonz, )
October 2, 2020 Filing 3 SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (jsalz, )
October 1, 2020 Filing 2 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya. Text Only Entry (jsalz, )
October 1, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT and Jury Demand against UBS Financial Services, Inc. (Filing fee $ 400,Receipt Number 1082-7517659)Attorney Paul Forrest Lewis added to party Kelly McGrew(pty:pla), filed by Kelly McGrew. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Lewis, Paul)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McGrew v. UBS Financial Services, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UBS Financial Services, Inc.
Represented By: Samuel A. Keesal, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kelly McGrew
Represented By: Paul Forrest Lewis
Represented By: Andrew Edward Swan
Represented By: Michael Dickson Kuhn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?