Judicial Watch, Inc. et al v. Griswold et al
Plaintiff: Elizabeth Miller, Mark Sutfin, Lorri Hovey and Judicial Watch, Inc.
Defendant: Judicial Watch, Secretary of State Jena Griswold, Colorado, State of, State of Colorado and Jena Griswold
Intervenor Defendant: Voto Latino and Vote.org
Case Number: 1:2020cv02992
Filed: October 5, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Philip A Brimmer
Referring Judge: Kathleen M Tafoya
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Voting
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 3, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 33 MINUTE ORDER granting #30 Contested Motion to Extend Deadline to File Response to Motion to Intervene. Plaintiffs' deadline to respond to the #17 Motion to Intervene is extended to December 31, 2020. By Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 12/03/20. Text Only Entry(kmtlc2)
December 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER by Chief Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 12/03/2020 re: #29 Motion to Dismiss is STRICKEN for failure to comply with D.C.COLO.LCivR 10.1(e) ("All pleadings and documents shall be double spaced."). Defendants may file a complying motion by Monday, December 7, 2020. Text Only Entry(pabsec2)
December 3, 2020 Filing 31 MEMORANDUM regarding #30 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #17 MOTION to Intervene filed by Lorri Hovey, Elizabeth Miller, Judicial Watch, Inc., Mark Sutfin. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya, by Chief Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 12/03/2020. Text Only Entry (pabsec2)
December 3, 2020 Filing 30 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #17 MOTION to Intervene by Plaintiffs Lorri Hovey, Judicial Watch, Inc., Elizabeth Miller, Mark Sutfin. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Zakhem, John)
December 3, 2020 Filing 29 STRICKEN MOTION to Dismiss by Defendants Jena Griswold, State of Colorado. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Baumann, Peter) Modified on 12/3/2020 (pabsec2, ).
December 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 28 MINUTE ORDER: In light of this court's #27 Order, the #25 Motion to Extend Deadline to File Proposed Scheduling Order is DENIED as moot. By Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 12/03/20. Text Only Entry(kmtlc2)
December 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER granting #24 Unopposed Motion to Stay Discovery and Disclosures. The December 7, 2020 deadline to submit a proposed scheduling order is VACATED. Discovery in this matter is STAYED pending a ruling on the Motion to Dismiss. The parties shall file a joint status report within ten days of a ruling on the motion to dismiss, if any portion of the case remains, to advise whether the Scheduling Conference should be reset, by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 12/3/2020.(jgonz, )
December 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 26 MEMORANDUM regarding #25 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Proposed Scheduling Order filed by Jena Griswold, State of Colorado, #24 Unopposed MOTION to Stay Discovery and Disclosures filed by Jena Griswold, State of Colorado. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya, by Chief Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 12/02/2020. Text Only Entry (pabsec2)
December 1, 2020 Filing 25 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Proposed Scheduling Order by Defendants Jena Griswold, State of Colorado. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Baumann, Peter)
December 1, 2020 Filing 24 Unopposed MOTION to Stay Discovery and Disclosures by Defendants Jena Griswold, State of Colorado. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Exhibit A to Motion to Stay Discovery and Disclosures, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B to Motion to Stay Discovery and Disclosures, #3 Proposed Order (PDF Only) [Proposed] Order on Defendants' Unopposed Motion to Stay Discovery and Disclosures)(Baumann, Peter)
November 24, 2020 Filing 23 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Gillian Christine Kuhlmann on behalf of Vote.org, Voto LatinoAttorney Gillian Christine Kuhlmann added to party Vote.org(pty:intvd), Attorney Gillian Christine Kuhlmann added to party Voto Latino(pty:intvd) (Kuhlmann, Gillian)
November 23, 2020 Filing 22 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Amanda R. Callais on behalf of Vote.org, Voto LatinoAttorney Amanda R. Callais added to party Vote.org(pty:intvd), Attorney Amanda R. Callais added to party Voto Latino(pty:intvd) (Callais, Amanda)
November 19, 2020 Filing 21 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Marc E. Elias on behalf of Vote.org, Voto LatinoAttorney Marc E. Elias added to party Vote.org(pty:intvd), Attorney Marc E. Elias added to party Voto Latino(pty:intvd) (Elias, Marc)
November 19, 2020 Filing 20 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Matthew Prairie Gordon on behalf of Vote.org, Voto LatinoAttorney Matthew Prairie Gordon added to party Vote.org(pty:intvd), Attorney Matthew Prairie Gordon added to party Voto Latino(pty:intvd) (Gordon, Matthew)
November 19, 2020 Filing 19 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Thomas J. Tobin on behalf of Vote.org, Voto LatinoAttorney Thomas J. Tobin added to party Vote.org(pty:intvd), Attorney Thomas J. Tobin added to party Voto Latino(pty:intvd) (Tobin, Thomas)
November 17, 2020 Filing 18 MEMORANDUM regarding #17 MOTION to Intervene filed by Vote.org, Voto Latino. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya, by Chief Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 11/17/2020. Text Only Entry (pabsec2)
November 17, 2020 Filing 17 MOTION to Intervene by Intervenor Defendants Voto Latino, Vote.org. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Danny Friedman, #2 Affidavit Declaration of Andrea Hailey, #3 Exhibit 1)(Dunn, Lindsey)
November 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya for non-dispositive matters. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 72(a) and (b), this case is referred to the assigned United States Magistrate Judge to (1) convene a scheduling conference under Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b) and enter a scheduling order meeting the requirements of D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.2, (2) conduct such status conferences and issue such orders necessary for compliance with the scheduling order, including amendments or modifications of the scheduling order upon a showing of good cause, (3) hear and determine pretrial matters, including discovery and other non-dispositive motions, and (4) conduct a pretrial conference and enter a pretrial order. Court sponsored alternative dispute resolution is governed by D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.6. On the recommendation or informal request of the magistrate judge or on the request of the parties by motion, this court may direct the parties to engage in an early neutral evaluation, a settlement conference, or another alternative dispute resolution proceeding, by Chief Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 11/10/2020. Text Only Entry (pabsec2)
November 10, 2020 Filing 15 MEMORANDUM RETURNING CASE, by Senior Judge Lewis T. Babcock. This case is randomly returned to Chief Judge Philip A. Brimmer for all further proceedings. All future pleadings should be designated as 20-cv-2992-PAB (angar, )
November 6, 2020 Filing 14 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to Answer or Respond to the Complaint by Defendants State of Colorado, Jena Griswold. All Defendants. (Baumann, Peter)
November 6, 2020 Filing 13 CASE REASSIGNED pursuant to #12 Consent/Non-Consent to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge. All parties do not consent. This case is randomly reassigned to Judge Lewis T. Babcock. All future pleadings should be designated as 20-cv-02992-LTB. (Text Only Entry) (jgonz, )
November 6, 2020 Filing 12 CONSENT to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge by Defendants Jena Griswold, State of Colorado All parties do not consent.. (Baumann, Peter)
November 5, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Peter G. Baumann on behalf of All Defendants Attorney Peter G. Baumann added to party Jena Griswold(pty:dft), Attorney Peter G. Baumann added to party State of Colorado(pty:dft) (Baumann, Peter)
November 5, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Grant T. Sullivan on behalf of All Defendants Attorney Grant T. Sullivan added to party Jena Griswold(pty:dft), Attorney Grant T. Sullivan added to party State of Colorado(pty:dft) (Sullivan, Grant)
October 16, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Eric Robert Holway on behalf of All Plaintiffs Attorney Eric Robert Holway added to party Lorri Hovey(pty:pla), Attorney Eric Robert Holway added to party Judicial Watch, Inc.(pty:pla), Attorney Eric Robert Holway added to party Elizabeth Miller(pty:pla), Attorney Eric Robert Holway added to party Mark Sutfin(pty:pla) (Holway, Eric)
October 16, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by John Stuart Zakhem on behalf of All Plaintiffs Attorney John Stuart Zakhem added to party Lorri Hovey(pty:pla), Attorney John Stuart Zakhem added to party Judicial Watch, Inc.(pty:pla), Attorney John Stuart Zakhem added to party Elizabeth Miller(pty:pla), Attorney John Stuart Zakhem added to party Mark Sutfin(pty:pla) (Zakhem, John)
October 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER Setting Initial Case Deadlines by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 10/7/2020. Consent Form due by 12/7/2020. Proposed Scheduling Order due 12/7/2020 (jgonz, )
October 6, 2020 Filing 6 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. (Nobile, T.)
October 6, 2020 Filing 5 SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (trvo, )
October 5, 2020 Filing 4 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya. Text Only Entry. (trvo, )
October 5, 2020 Filing 3 SUMMONS REQUEST as to State of Colorado re #1 Complaint, by Plaintiffs Lorri Hovey, Elizabeth Miller, Mark Sutfin. (Nobile, T.)
October 5, 2020 Filing 2 SUMMONS REQUEST as to Secretary of State Jena Griswold by Plaintiffs Lorri Hovey, Elizabeth Miller, Mark Sutfin. (Nobile, T.)
October 5, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Colorado, State of, Jena Griswold (Filing fee $ 400,Receipt Number 1082-7522095)Attorney T. Russell Nobile added to party Lorri Hovey(pty:pla), Attorney T. Russell Nobile added to party Elizabeth Miller(pty:pla), Attorney T. Russell Nobile added to party Mark Sutfin(pty:pla), filed by Lorri Hovey, Mark Sutfin, Elizabeth Miller. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Signed Civil Cover Sheet)(Nobile, T.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Judicial Watch, Inc. et al v. Griswold et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Judicial Watch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Secretary of State Jena Griswold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Colorado, State of
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of Colorado
Represented By: Grant T. Sullivan
Represented By: Peter G. Baumann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jena Griswold
Represented By: Grant T. Sullivan
Represented By: Peter G. Baumann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elizabeth Miller
Represented By: T. Russell Nobile
Represented By: Eric Robert Holway
Represented By: John Stuart Zakhem
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark Sutfin
Represented By: T. Russell Nobile
Represented By: Eric Robert Holway
Represented By: John Stuart Zakhem
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lorri Hovey
Represented By: T. Russell Nobile
Represented By: Eric Robert Holway
Represented By: John Stuart Zakhem
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Judicial Watch, Inc.
Represented By: Eric Robert Holway
Represented By: T. Russell Nobile
Represented By: John Stuart Zakhem
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor defendant: Voto Latino
Represented By: Gillian Christine Kuhlmann
Represented By: Amanda R. Callais
Represented By: Marc E. Elias
Represented By: Matthew Prairie Gordon
Represented By: Thomas J. Tobin
Represented By: Lindsey Erin Dunn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor defendant: Vote.org
Represented By: Gillian Christine Kuhlmann
Represented By: Amanda R. Callais
Represented By: Marc E. Elias
Represented By: Matthew Prairie Gordon
Represented By: Thomas J. Tobin
Represented By: Lindsey Erin Dunn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?