Location Based Services, LLC v. Pamela's Products, Inc.
Plaintiff: Location Based Services, LLC
Defendant: Pamela's Products, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2020cv03104
Filed: October 15, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: N Reid Neureiter
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1126
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 4, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Minute ORDER by Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter on 4 December 2020. It is HEREBY ORDERED that the Motion to Extend Deadlines (Dkt. #7 ) is GRANTED for good cause shown. The deadline for Defendant to respond to the Complaint is extended to January 7, 2021. Typically, in this district, an answer need not be filed before a Scheduling/Planning Conference can occur. Nevertheless, as it does not appear that Defendant has retained counsel, the Scheduling/Planning Conference set on December 14, 2020 at 11:00 a.m. is VACATED and RESET on February 2, 2021 at 10:00 a.m. The Scheduling Conference will be conducted via telephone. The parties are directed to call the conference line as a participant at (888) 398-2342, Access Code 5755390# at the scheduled time. The deadline for filing the Consent/Non-Consent Form (Dkt. #5-1) is extended to January 19, 2021. PLEASE READ ATTACHED MINUTE ORDER. Consent Form due by 1/19/2021. Proposed Scheduling Order due1/26/2021 Scheduling Conference set for 2/2/2021 10:00 AM in Courtroom C203 before Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter. by Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter on 4 December 2020.(cmadr, )
December 4, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond re #6 Order,, #1 Complaint, and Continuance of Scheduling/Planning Conference by Plaintiff Location Based Services, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Curfman, Andrew)
November 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING/PLANNING CONFERENCE AND SETTING DEADLINE FOR FILING OF CONSENT/NON-CONSENT FORM by Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter on 2 November 2020. Consent Form due by 11/30/2020. Proposed Scheduling Order due 12/7/2020. Scheduling Conference set for 12/14/2020 11:00 AM in Courtroom C203 before Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter. The Scheduling Conference will be conducted via telephone. The parties are directed to call the conference line as a participant at (888) 398-2342, Access Code 5755390# at the scheduled time. (cmadr, )
October 16, 2020 Filing 5 SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (jsalz, )
October 16, 2020 Filing 4 Report re Patent/Trademark: Report on the filing of an action emailed (NEF) to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (jsalz, )
October 15, 2020 Filing 3 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter. Text Only Entry (jsalz, )
October 15, 2020 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent Patent Asset Management, LLC for Location Based Services, LLC. (Curfman, Andrew)
October 15, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Pamela's Products, Inc. (Filing fee $ 400,Receipt Number 1082-7541605)Attorney Andrew S. Curfman added to party Location Based Services, LLC(pty:pla), filed by Location Based Services, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-US9702713, #2 Exhibit B-Claim Chart, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Summons)(Curfman, Andrew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Location Based Services, LLC v. Pamela's Products, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pamela's Products, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Location Based Services, LLC
Represented By: Andrew S. Curfman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?