Curtin et al v. Ethicon, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Charles Curtin and Laura Curtin
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson and ETHICON INC.
Case Number: 1:2020cv03172
Filed: October 23, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: William J Martinez
Referring Judge: Scott T Varholak
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 4, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 17, 2020 Filing 60 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Micajah D. Boatright on behalf of Charles Curtin, Laura CurtinAttorney Micajah D. Boatright added to party Charles Curtin(pty:pla), Attorney Micajah D. Boatright added to party Laura Curtin(pty:pla) (Boatright, Micajah)
November 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 59 MINUTE ORDER This matter is set for a Telephonic Final Pretrial Conference on 1/12/2021 09:15 AM before Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak. The parties shall participate in the conference TELEPHONICALLY by calling 888.808.6929 at the scheduled time and utilizing access code: 2805116#. The Court notes that the parties may hear the conclusion of a prior hearing at the time they call in, and are instructed to simply wait until their case is called. The parties shall file a joint proposed pretrial order on or before 1/05/2021. SO ORDERED, by Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak on 11/13/2020. Text Only Entry (stvlc1, )
November 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER: Counsel for the parties and all counsel who may later enter an appearance shall review and familiarize themselves with the undersigned's Revised Practice Standards (as most recently revised effective December 1, 2019 and as they may be amended from time to time), which may be downloaded #here. SO ORDERED by Judge William J. Martinez on 11 /13/2020. Text Only Entry (wjmsec, )
November 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak. Magistrate Judge Varholak, or such other Magistrate Judge who may in the future be reassigned this case, is designated to conduct NDISPO proceedings pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and Fed.R.Civ.P. 72(a) and (b). Court sponsored alternative dispute resolution is governed by D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.6. On the recommendation or informal request of the Magistrate Judge or on the request of the parties by motion, the court may direct the parties to engage in an early neutral evaluation, a settlement conference, or another alternative dispute resolution proceeding. SO ORDERED by Judge William J. Martinez on 11/13/2020. Text Only Entry (wjmsec, )
November 10, 2020 Filing 56 CASE REASSIGNED pursuant to #55 . All parties do not consent. This case is randomly reassigned to Judge William J. Martinez. All future pleadings should be designated as 20-cv-03172-WJM. (Text Only Entry) (cmadr, )
November 10, 2020 Filing 55 CONSENT to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge by Defendants ETHICON INC., Johnson & Johnson All parties do not consent.. (O'Brien, Sarah)
October 30, 2020 Filing 54 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Noah M. Wexler on behalf of Charles Curtin, Laura CurtinAttorney Noah M. Wexler added to party Charles Curtin(pty:pla), Attorney Noah M. Wexler added to party Laura Curtin(pty:pla) (Wexler, Noah)
October 26, 2020 Filing 53 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Susan Marie Robinson on behalf of ETHICON INC., Johnson & JohnsonAttorney Susan Marie Robinson added to party ETHICON INC.(pty:dft), Attorney Susan Marie Robinson added to party Johnson & Johnson(pty:dft) (Robinson, Susan)
October 23, 2020 Filing 52 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Sarah Smyth O'Brien on behalf of ETHICON INC., Johnson & JohnsonAttorney Sarah Smyth O'Brien added to party ETHICON INC.(pty:dft), Attorney Sarah Smyth O'Brien added to party Johnson & Johnson(pty:dft) (O'Brien, Sarah)
October 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 51 MINUTE ORDER Pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 72.2(d), the parties shall complete and file the Election Concerning Consent/Non-Consent to United States Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction form, available from the Courts website at www.cod.uscourts.gov, on or before 11/13/2020. SO ORDERED, by Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak on 10/23/2020. Text Only Entry (stvlc1, )
October 23, 2020 Filing 50 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1, direct assignment of civil actions to full time magistrate judges. (jsalz, )
October 23, 2020 Filing 49 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak. Text Only Entry. (jsalz, )
October 23, 2020 Filing 48 FIRST AND FINAL NOTICE TO ALL ATTORNEY(S) AND UNREPRESENTED PARTIES IN REMOVED, TRANSFERRED, OR OTHER CASES. To receive any further notice in a case removed or transferred to this court, or special matters including discovery disputes, bankruptcy appeals, or withdrawals of reference, Multi-district litigation (MDL), etc., all attorneys and unrepresented parties must enter an appearance under D.C.COLO.LAttyR 5(a). An attorney must be an active member of this court's bar and be in good standing in accordance with D.C.COLO.LAttyR 3. A waiver of the fee for bar admission may apply in limited situations. (Text Only Entry) (jsalz, )
October 23, 2020 Filing 47 Case transferred in from District of West Virginia Southern; Case Number 2:14-cv-21674. File, transfer order and docket sheet received
October 15, 2020 Filing 46 CONTINUED JOINT DESIGNATION OF RECORD for MDL transfers re: 2:12-md-02327 - Ethicon, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit ECF #35 CONTINUED, MDL ECF (2205) Part 1 - Pls' Mot to Exclude Steven MacLean, #2 Exhibit MDL ECF (2205) Part 2 - Pls' Mot to Exclude Steven MacLean, #3 Exhibit MDL ECF (2205) Part 3 - Pls' Mot to Exclude Steven MacLean, #4 Exhibit MDL ECF (2206) - Pls' Mem in Support of Mot to Exclude Steven MacLean, #5 Exhibit MDL ECF (2287) Part 1 - Defs' Resp to Pls' Mot to Exclude Steven MacLean, #6 Exhibit MDL ECF (2287) Part 2 - Defs' Resp to Pls' Mot to Exclude Steven MacLean, #7 Exhibit MDL ECF (2297) - Pls' Reply in Support of Mot to Exclude Steven MacLean, #8 Exhibit MDL ECF (2552) Part 1 - Defs' Resp to Pls' Mot to Exclude Steven MacLean, #9 Exhibit MDL ECF (2552) Part 2 - Defs' Resp to Pls' Mot to Exclude Steven MacLean, #10 Exhibit MDL ECF (2552) Part 3 - Defs' Resp to Pls' Mot to Exclude Steven MacLean, #11 Exhibit MDL ECF (2825) - Pls' Mot to Exclude Steven MacLean, #12 Exhibit MDL ECF (2826) - Pls' Mem in Support of Mot to Exclude Steven MacLean, #13 Exhibit MDL ECF (2942) - Defs' Resp to Pls' Mot to Exclude Steven MacLean, #14 Exhibit MDL ECF (3053) - Pls' Reply in Support of Mot to Exclude Steven MacLean, #15 Exhibit MDL ECF (8496) - Notice of Adoption of Pls' Mot and Reply in Support of Mot to Exclude Steven MacLean, #16 Exhibit MDL ECF (8609) - Notice of Adoption of Defs' Resp to Pls' Mot to Exclude Steven MacLean)(Robinson, Susan) (Modified on 10/15/2020 to add party filers) (msa). [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 10/23/2020.]
October 15, 2020 Filing 45 CONTINUED JOINT DESIGNATION OF RECORD for MDL transfers re: 2:12-md-02327 - Ethicon, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit ECF #35 CONTINUED, MDL ECF (2025) - Pls' Mot to Exclude Joseph Carbone, #2 Exhibit MDL ECF (2027) - Pls' Memo in Support of Mot to Exclude Joseph Carbone, #3 Exhibit MDL ECF (2180) - Defs' Resp to Pls' Mot to Exclude Joseph Carbone, #4 Exhibit MDL ECF (2915) - Defs' Resp to Pls' Mot to Exclude Joseph Carbone, #5 Exhibit MDL ECF (3036) - Pls' Reply in Support of Mot to Exclude Joseph Carbone, #6 Exhibit MDL ECF (8477) - Notice of Adoption of Pls' Mot to Exclude Joseph Carbone, #7 Exhibit MDL ECF (8618) - Notice of Adoption of Defs' Resp to Pls' Mot to Exclude Joseph Carbone)(Robinson, Susan) (Modified on 10/15/2020 to add party filers) (msa). [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 10/23/2020.]
October 15, 2020 Filing 44 CONTINUED JOINT DESIGNATION OF RECORD for MDL transfers re: 2:12-md-02327 - Ethicon, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit ECF #35 CONTINUED, MDL ECF (2060) - Pls' Mot to Exclude Timothy Ulatowski, #2 Exhibit MDL ECF (2065) - Pls' Mem in Support of Mot to Exclude Timothy Ulatowski, #3 Exhibit MDL ECF (2134) - Defs' Resp to Pls' Mot to Exclude Timothy Ulatowski, #4 Exhibit MDL ECF (2232) - Pls' Reply in Support of Mot to Exclude Timothy Ulatowski, #5 Exhibit MDL ECF (7346) - Notice of Adoption of Pls' Mot to Exclude Tim Ulatowski, #6 Exhibit MDL ECF (2910) - Defs' Supp Resp and Notice of Adoption of Resp Regarding Timothy Ulatowski, #7 Exhibit MDL ECF (8529) - Notice of Adoption of Pls' Mot and Reply in Support of Mot to Exclude Timothy Ulatowski, #8 Exhibit MDL ECF (8623) - Notice of Adoption of Defs' Resp to Pls' Mot to Exclude Timothy Ulatowski)(Robinson, Susan) (Modified on 10/15/2020 to add party filers) (msa). [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 10/23/2020.]
October 15, 2020 Filing 43 CONTINUED JOINT DESIGNATION OF RECORD for MDL transfers re: 2:12-md-02327 - Ethicon, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit ECF #35 CONTINUED, MDL ECF (6887) - Pls' Mot to Exclude Catherine Matthews, #2 Exhibit MDL ECF (6897) - Pls' Mem in Support of Mot to Exclude Catherine Matthews, #3 Exhibit MDL ECF (7027) - Defs' Resp to Pls' Mot to Exclude Catherine Matthews, #4 Exhibit MDL ECF (8497) - Notice of Adoption of Pls' Mot to Exclude Catherine Matthews, #5 Exhibit MDL ECF (8629) - Notice of Adoption of Defs' Resp to Pls' Mot to Exclude Catherine Matthews)(Robinson, Susan) (Modified on 10/15/2020 to add party filers) (msa). [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 10/23/2020.]
October 15, 2020 Filing 42 CONTINUED JOINT DESIGNATION OF RECORD for MDL transfers re: 2:12-md-02327 - Ethicon, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit ECF #35 CONTINUED, MDL ECF (6882) - Pls' Mot to Exclude Dorothy Kammerer-Doak, #2 Exhibit MDL ECF (6885) - Pls' Mem in Support of Mot to Exclude Dorothy Kammerer-Doak, #3 Exhibit MDL ECF (7029) - Defs' Resp to Pls' Mot to Exclude Dorothy Kammerer-Doak, #4 Exhibit MDL ECF (8491) - Notice of Adoption of Pls' Mot to Exclude Dorothy Kammerer-Doak, #5 Exhibit MDL ECF (8647) - Notice of Adoption of Defs' Resp to Pls' Mot to Exclude Dorothy Kammerer-Doak)(Robinson, Susan) (Modified on 10/15/2020 to add party filers) (msa). [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 10/23/2020.]
October 15, 2020 Filing 41 CONTINUED JOINT DESIGNATION OF RECORD for MDL transfers re: 2:12-md-02327 - Ethicon, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit ECF #35 CONTINUED, MDL ECF (2047) Part 1 - Defs' Mot to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig, #2 Exhibit MDL ECF (2047) Part 2 - Defs' Mot to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig, #3 Exhibit MDL ECF (2049) - Defs' Mem in Support of Mot to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig, #4 Exhibit MDL ECF (2163) Part 1 - Pls' Resp to Defs' Mot to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig, #5 Exhibit MDL ECF (2163) Part 2 - Pls' Resp to Defs' Mot to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig, #6 Exhibit MDL ECF (2163) Part 3 - Pls' Resp to Defs' Mot to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig, #7 Exhibit MDL ECF (2241) - Defs' Reply in Support of Mot to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig, #8 Exhibit MDL ECF (2817) - Defs' Mot to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig, #9 Exhibit MDL ECF (2818) - Defs' Mem in Support of Mot to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig, #10 Exhibit MDL ECF (2931) - Pls' Resp to Defs' Mot to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig, #11 Exhibit MDL ECF (3024) - Defs' Reply in Support of Mot to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig, #12 Exhibit MDL ECF (5332) - Defs' Mot to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig, #13 Exhibit MDL ECF (5333) - Defs' Mem in Support of Mot to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig, #14 Exhibit MDL ECF (5482) - Pls' Resp to Defs' Mot to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig, #15 Exhibit MDL ECF (5548) - Defs' Reply in Support of Mot to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig, #16 Exhibit MDL ECF (8541) - Notice of Adoption of Defs' Mot and Reply in Support of Mot to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig, #17 Exhibit MDL ECF (8599) - Notice of Adoption of Pls' Resp to Defs' Mot to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig)(Robinson, Susan) (Modified on 10/15/2020 to add party filers) (msa). [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 10/23/2020.]
October 15, 2020 Filing 40 CONTINUED JOINT DESIGNATION OF RECORD for MDL transfers re: 2:12-md-02327 - Ethicon, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit ECF #35 CONTINUED, MDL ECF (2083) Part 1 - Defs' Mot to Exclude Anne Wilson, #2 Exhibit MDL ECF (2083) Part 2 - Defs' Mot to Exclude Anne Wilson, #3 Exhibit MDL ECF (2083) Part 3 - Defs' Mot to Exclude Anne Wilson, #4 Exhibit MDL ECF (2083) Part 4 - Defs' Mot to Exclude Anne Wilson, #5 Exhibit MDL ECF (2083) Part 5 - Defs' Mot to Exclude Anne Wilson, #6 Exhibit MDL ECF (2083) Part 6 - Defs' Mot to Exclude Anne Wilson, #7 Exhibit MDL ECF (2083) Part 7 - Defs' Mot to Exclude Anne Wilson, #8 Exhibit MDL ECF (2083) Part 8 - Defs' Mot to Exclude Anne Wilson, #9 Exhibit MDL ECF (2083) Part 9 - Defs' Mot to Exclude Anne Wilson, #10 Exhibit MDL ECF (2086) - Defs' Memo in Support of Mot to Exclude Anne Wilson, #11 Exhibit MDL ECF (2166) - Pls' Resp to Defs' Mot to Exclude Anne Wilson, #12 Exhibit MDL ECF (2242) - Defs' Reply in Support of Mot to Exclude Anne Wilson, #13 Exhibit MDL ECF (2830) Part 1 - Defs' Mot to Exclude Anne Wilson, #14 Exhibit MDL ECF (2830) Part 2 - Defs' Mot to Exclude Anne Wilson, #15 Exhibit MDL ECF (2830) Part 3 - Defs' Mot to Exclude Anne Wilson, #16 Exhibit MDL ECF (2830) Part 4 - Defs' Mot to Exclude Anne Wilson, #17 Exhibit MDL ECF (2830) Part 5 - Defs' Mot to Exclude Anne Wilson, #18 Exhibit MDL ECF (2830) Part 6 - Defs' Mot to Exclude Anne Wilson, #19 Exhibit MDL ECF (2830) Part 7 - Defs' Mot to Exclude Anne Wilson, #20 Exhibit MDL ECF (2830) Part 8 - Defs' Mot to Exclude Anne Wilson, #21 Exhibit MDL ECF (2830) Part 9 - Defs' Mot to Exclude Anne Wilson, #22 Exhibit MDL ECF (2831) - Defs' Mem in Support of Mot to Exclude Anne Wilson, #23 Exhibit MDL ECF (2943) - Pls' Resp to Defs' Mot to Exclude Anne Wilson, #24 Exhibit MDL ECF (3025) - Defs' Reply in Support of Mot to Exclude Anne Wilson, #25 Exhibit MDL ECF (8536) - Notice of Adoption of Defs' Mot and Reply in Support of Mot to Exclude Anne Wilson, #26 Exhibit MDL ECF (8605) - Notice of Adoption of Pls' Resp to Defs' Mot to Exclude Anne Wilson)(Robinson, Susan) (Modified on 10/15/2020 to add party filers) (msa). [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 10/23/2020.]
October 15, 2020 Filing 39 CONTINUED JOINT DESIGNATION OF RECORD for MDL transfers re: 2:12-md-02327 - Ethicon, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit ECF #35 CONTINUED, MDL ECF (2075) - Defs' Mot to Exclude Peggy Pence, #2 Exhibit MDL ECF (2078) - Defs' Mem in Support of Mot to Exclude Peggy Pence, #3 Exhibit MDL ECF (2172) - Pls' Resp to Defs' Mot to Exclude Peggy Pence, #4 Exhibit MDL ECF (2214) - Defs' Reply in Support of Mot to Exclude Peggy Pence, #5 Exhibit MDL ECF (2759) - Defs' Mot to Exclude Peggy Pence, #6 Exhibit MDL ECF (2760) - Defs' Mem in Support of Mot to Exclude Peggy Pence, #7 Exhibit MDL ECF (2949) - Pls' Resp to Defs' Mot to Exclude Peggy Pence, #8 Exhibit MDL ECF (3017) - Defs' Reply in Support of Mot to Exclude Peggy Pence, #9 Exhibit MDL ECF (8531) - Notice of Adoption of Defs' Mot and Reply in Support of Mot to Exclude Peggy Pence, #10 Exhibit MDL ECF (8596) - Notice of Adoption of Pls' Resp to Defs' Mot to Exclude Peggy Pence)(Robinson, Susan) (Modified on 10/15/2020 to add party filers) (msa). [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 10/23/2020.]
October 15, 2020 Filing 38 CONTINUED JOINT DESIGNATION OF RECORD for MDL transfers re: 2:12-md-02327 - Ethicon, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit ECF #35 CONTINUED, MDL ECF (2188) Part 1 - Pls' Resp to Defs' Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #2 Exhibit MDL ECF (2188) Part 2 - Pls' Resp to Defs' Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #3 Exhibit MDL ECF (2188) Part 3 - Pls' Resp to Defs' Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #4 Exhibit MDL ECF (2188) Part 4 - Pls' Resp to Defs' Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #5 Exhibit MDL ECF (2200) - Defs' Reply in Support of Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #6 Exhibit MDL ECF (3626) Part 1 - Defs' Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #7 Exhibit MDL ECF (3626) Part 2 - Defs' Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #8 Exhibit MDL ECF (3630) - Defs' Mem in Support of Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #9 Exhibit MDL ECF (3767) Part 1 - Pls' Resp to Defs' Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #10 Exhibit MDL ECF (3767) Part 2 - Pls' Resp to Defs' Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #11 Exhibit MDL ECF (3767) Part 3 - Pls' Resp to Defs' Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #12 Exhibit MDL ECF (3767) Part 4 - Pls' Resp to Defs' Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #13 Exhibit MDL ECF (3855) - Defs' Reply in Support of Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #14 Exhibit MDL ECF (8519) - Notice of Adoption of Defs' Mot and Reply in Support of Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #15 Exhibit MDL ECF (8588) - Notice of Adoption of Pls' Resp to Defs' Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge)(Robinson, Susan) (Modified on 10/15/2020 to add party filers) (msa). [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 10/23/2020.]
October 15, 2020 Filing 37 CONTINUED JOINT DESIGNATION OF RECORD for MDL transfers re: 2:12-md-02327 - Ethicon, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit ECF #35 CONTINUED, MDL ECF (1978) Part 1 - Defs' Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #2 Exhibit MDL ECF (1978) Part 2 - Defs' Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #3 Exhibit MDL ECF (1978) Part 3 - Defs' Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #4 Exhibit MDL ECF (1978) Part 4 - Defs' Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #5 Exhibit MDL ECF (1978) Part 5 - Defs' Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #6 Exhibit MDL ECF (1978) Part 6 - Defs' Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #7 Exhibit MDL ECF (1978) Part 7 - Defs' Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #8 Exhibit MDL ECF (1978) Part 8 - Defs' Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #9 Exhibit MDL ECF (1978) Part 9 - Defs' Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #10 Exhibit MDL ECF (1978) Part 10 - Defs' Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #11 Exhibit MDL ECF (1978) Part 11 - Defs' Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #12 Exhibit MDL ECF (1978) Part 12 - Defs' Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #13 Exhibit MDL ECF (1978) Part 13 - Defs' Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #14 Exhibit MDL ECF (1978) Part 14 - Defs' Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #15 Exhibit MDL ECF (1978) Part 15 - Defs' Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #16 Exhibit MDL ECF (1978) Part 16 - Defs' Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #17 Exhibit MDL ECF (1978) Part 17- Defs' Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #18 Exhibit MDL ECF (1978) Part 18 - Defs' Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #19 Exhibit MDL ECF (1978) Part 19 - Defs' Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #20 Exhibit MDL ECF (1978) Part 20 - Defs' Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #21 Exhibit MDL ECF (1982) - Defs' Mem in Support of Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge)(Robinson, Susan) (Modified on 10/15/2020 to add party filers) (msa). [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 10/23/2020.]
October 15, 2020 Filing 36 CONTINUED JOINT DESIGNATION OF RECORD for MDL transfers re: 2:12-md-02327 - Ethicon, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit ECF #35 CONTINUED, MDL ECF (2038) Part 1 - Defs' Mot to Exclude Jerry Blaivas, #2 Exhibit MDL ECF (2038) Part 2 - Defs' Mot to Exclude Jerry Blaivas, #3 Exhibit MDL ECF (2038) Part 3 - Defs' Mot to Exclude Jerry Blaivas, #4 Exhibit MDL ECF (2038) Part 4 - Defs' Mot to Exclude Jerry Blaivas, #5 Exhibit MDL ECF (2038) Part 5 - Defs' Mot to Exclude Jerry Blaivas, #6 Exhibit MDL ECF (2040) - Defs' Mem in Support of Mot to Exclude Jerry Blaivas, #7 Exhibit MDL ECF (2176) - Pls' Resp to Defs' Mot to Exclude Jerry Blaivas, #8 Exhibit MDL ECF (2213) - Defs' Reply in Support of Mot to Exclude Jerry Blaivas, #9 Exhibit MDL ECF (3588) - Defs' Mot to Exclude Jerry Blaivas, #10 Exhibit MDL ECF (3589) - Defs' Mem in Support of Mot to Exclude Jerry Blaivas, #11 Exhibit MDL ECF (3758) - Pls' Resp to Defs' Mot to Exclude Jerry Blaivas, #12 Exhibit MDL ECF (3840) - Defs' Reply in Support of Mot to Exclude Jerry Blaivas, #13 Exhibit MDL ECF (8539) - Notice of Adoption of Defs' Mot to Exclude Jerry Blaivas, #14 Exhibit MDL ECF (8581) - Notice of Adoption of Pls' Resp to Def's Mot to Exclude Jerry Blaivas)(Robinson, Susan) (Modified on 10/15/2020 to add party filers) (msa). [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 10/23/2020.]
October 15, 2020 Filing 35 JOINT DESIGNATION OF RECORD for MDL transfers re: 2:12-md-02327 - Ethicon, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit MDL ECF (238) - First Amended Master Long Form Complaint, #2 Exhibit MDL ECF (239) - Master Answer of Ethicon, Inc. to First Amended Master Complaint, #3 Exhibit MDL ECF (241) - Master Answer of Johnson & Johnson to First Amended Master Complaint, #4 Exhibit MDL ECF (262) - Short Form Complaint, #5 Exhibit MDL ECF (263) - Amended Short Form Complaint)(Robinson, Susan) (Modified on 10/15/2020 to add party filers) (msa). [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 10/23/2020.]
October 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER directing that the #33 Transfer Order is VACATED as to this case only. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 10/13/2020. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented party) (kew) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 10/23/2020.]
October 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 33 VACATED PURSUANT TO THE #34 ORDER ENTERED ON 10/13/2020: TRANSFER ORDER FOR CASES ON EXHIBIT A directing that on 10/27/2020 the cases identified on Exhibit A that are still pending shall be transferred to the United States District Courts identified on Exhibit A pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1404(a); on or before 10/26/2020 the parties are DIRECTED to confer and to file in each pending individual member case identified in Exhibit A, all documents from the main MDL that the parties jointly deem relevant to constitute an appropriate record for the receiving court to consider; the Clerk is DIRECTED to use the appropriate function in CM/ECF to extract each member case listed on Exhibit A that remains pending and transfer it to the corresponding United States District Court listed on Exhibit A; after transfer of each member case listed in Exhibit A that is not dismissed prior to the Transfer Date, the Clerk is DIRECTED to formally close the case and strike it from the docket of this court. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 10/13/2020. (cc: Clerk of the JPMDL; counsel of record; any unrepresented party) (REF: MDL 2327; Cases Listed on Exhibit A) (kew) (Modified on 10/13/2020 to note transfer order is vacated) (kew). [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 10/23/2020.]
October 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 32 TRANSFER ORDER FOR CASES ON EXHIBIT A directing that on 10/23/2020 the cases identified on Exhibit A that are still pending shall be transferred to the United States District Courts identified on Exhibit A pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1404(a); on or before 10/22/2020 the parties are DIRECTED to confer and to file in each pending individual member case identified in Exhibit A, all documents from the main MDL that the parties jointly deem relevant to constitute an appropriate record for the receiving court to consider; the Clerk is DIRECTED to use the appropriate function in CM/ECF to extract each member case listed on Exhibit A that remains pending and transfer it to the corresponding United States District Court listed on Exhibit A; after transfer of each member case listed in Exhibit A that is not dismissed prior to the Transfer Date, the Clerk is DIRECTED to formally close the case and strike it from the docket of this court. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 10/9/2020. (cc: Clerk of the JPMDL; counsel of record; any unrepresented party) (REF: MDL 2327; Cases Listed on Exhibit A) (kew) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 10/23/2020.]
August 29, 2019 Filing 31 MEMORANDUM by Charles Curtin, Laura Curtin in opposition to #28 MOTION by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson to Limit the Case-Specific Opinions and Testimony of Bruce Rosenzweig, M.D. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(Wexler, Noah) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 10/23/2020.]
August 28, 2019 Filing 30 MEMORANDUM by Charles Curtin, Laura Curtin in opposition to #26 MOTION by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson for Partial Summary Judgment (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Proposed Order)(Wexler, Noah) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 10/23/2020.]
August 13, 2019 Filing 29 MEMORANDUM OF LAW by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson in support of #28 MOTION by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson to Limit the Case-Specific Opinions and Testimony of Bruce Rosenzweig, M.D. (Robinson, Susan) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 10/23/2020.]
August 13, 2019 Filing 28 MOTION by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson to Limit the Case-Specific Opinions and Testimony of Bruce Rosenzweig, M.D. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - C)(Robinson, Susan) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 10/23/2020.]
August 9, 2019 Filing 27 MEMORANDUM by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson in Support of #26 MOTION by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson for Partial Summary Judgment (Robinson, Susan) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 10/23/2020.]
August 9, 2019 Filing 26 MOTION by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson for Partial Summary Judgment (Attachments: #1 Exhibits A-B)(Robinson, Susan) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 10/23/2020.]
August 7, 2019 Filing 25 OBJECTIONS by Charles Curtin, Laura Curtin to Subpoena Duces Tecum Attached to #21 NOTICE OF DEPOSITION by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson of Bruce Rosenzweig, M.D. on 8/7/2019 at 1:00 p.m. (Wexler, Noah) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 10/23/2020.]
August 1, 2019 Filing 24 AMENDED NOTICE OF VIDEO DEPOSITION by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson of Dr. James Simon on 8/30/19 at 1:00 p.m. MDT (Robinson, Susan) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 10/23/2020.]
July 26, 2019 Filing 23 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson for Defendants Designation and Disclosure of General and Case Specific Expert Witnesses. (Gage, William) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 10/23/2020.]
July 19, 2019 Filing 22 AMENDED NOTICE OF VIDEO DEPOSITION by Charles Curtin, Laura Curtin of Dr. Brian Flynn on July 25, 2019 at 1:00 pm Mountain (Bireley, John) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 10/23/2020.]
July 17, 2019 Filing 21 NOTICE OF DEPOSITION by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson of Bruce Rosenzweig, M.D. on 8/7/2019 at 1:00 p.m. (Gage, William) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 10/23/2020.]
June 24, 2019 Filing 20 AMENDED NOTICE OF VIDEO DEPOSITION by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson of Laura Curtin & Charles Curtin on 7/26/19 at 9:00 a.m. and 1:00 p.m. MDT (Robinson, Susan) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 10/23/2020.]
June 19, 2019 Filing 19 NOTICE OF VIDEO DEPOSITION by Charles Curtin, Laura Curtin of Dr. Brian Flynn on July 25, 2019 at 1:00 pm Central (Wexler, Noah) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 10/23/2020.]
June 19, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE OF VIDEO DEPOSITION by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson of Dr. James Simon on 7/29/19 at 9:00 a.m. MDT (Robinson, Susan) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 10/23/2020.]
June 13, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE AND COUNSEL CONTACT INFORMATION FORM by John Benjamin Bireley on behalf of Charles Curtin, Laura Curtin. (Bireley, John) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 10/23/2020.]
June 11, 2019 Filing 16 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Ethicon, Inc. for First Set of Interrogatories, Requests for Admission and Requests for Production to Plaintiff. (Robinson, Susan) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 10/23/2020.]
June 4, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE AND COUNSEL CONTACT INFORMATION FORM by Roland Christensen on behalf of Charles Curtin, Laura Curtin. (Christensen, Roland) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 10/23/2020.]
June 4, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE OF VIDEO DEPOSITION by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson of Laura & Charles Curtin on 6/21/19 at 9:00 a.m. and 1:00 p.m. CDT (Robinson, Susan) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 10/23/2020.]
February 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 PRETRIAL ORDER # 328 (Docket Control Order - Ethicon, Inc. Wave 11 Cases) The cases on Exhibit A are: 1. removed from the pending inactive docket; and 2. placed on the active docket. As to the cases on Exhibits A and B: 1. The cases are no longer eligible for return to the inactive docket nor may notices of settlement be filed to relieve the parties from scheduling deadlines; 2. To the extent other defendants, in addition to Ethicon, Inc. and Johnson & Johnson, are named in the cases on Exhibits A and B, the deadlines below also apply to them; 3. The Clerk will file this Docket Control Order in the main MDL and, as of the time of that filing in the main MDL, every case listed on Exhibits A and B (hereinafter referred to as "Wave 11 cases") becomes subject to the deadlines in this Docket Control Order.; and 4. The following deadlines immediately apply in all Ethicon Wave 11 cases with one important exception. If any of the cases on any exhibit were previously on a docket control order and dispositive and Daubert deadlines had passed before such cases became inactive, the parties may not file or refile dispositive or Daubert motions without first seeking leave of court for good cause shown. A. SCHEDULING DEADLINES.. The following deadlines shall apply in all Ethicon Wave 11 cases: Plaintiff Fact Sheets due 02/15/2019; Defendant Fact Sheets due 02/22/2019; Deadline for written discovery requests due 03/25/2019; Expert disclosures served by plaintiffs due 05/24/2019; Expert disclosure served by defendants due 06/24/2019; Expert disclosure served for rebuttal due 07/01/2019; Deposition deadline and close of discovery due 08/01/2019; Filing of dispositive motions due 08/14/2019; Response to dispositive motions due 08/28/2019; Reply to response to dispositive motions due 09/04/2019; Filing of Daubert motions due 08/14/2019; Responses to Daubert motions due 08/29/2019; Reply to response to Daubert motions due 09/05/2019. B. MOTION PRACTICE. 3. Confidential Documents. Any consolidated motion to seal is due on or before 6/27/2019, and any response is due by 7/11/2019. Any reply is due by 7/18/2019. The court expects full compliance with Local Rule of Civil Procedure 26.4(c). C. CASES READY FOR TRANSFER, REMAND OR TRIAL 1. Venue Recommendations. By no later than 7/8/2019, the parties shall meet and confer concerning the appropriate venue for each of the cases, and the parties are ORDERED to submit joint venue recommendations to the court by 7/15/2019. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 2/4/2019. (cc: Clerk of the JPMDL; attys; any unrepresented party) (REF: MDL 2327; Ethicon Wave 11 cases identified on Exhibits A and B) (mek) (ADI) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 10/23/2020.]
October 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting the Motions filed in MDL 2327 by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson to Substitute Susan M. Robinson as Counsel in lieu of David B. Thomas, and to Substitute William M. Gage as Counsel in lieu of Christy D. Jones; the Clerk is directed to terminate Christy D. Jones and to substitute William M. Gage as counsel of record, both on the main master docket and for each individual member case in MDL 2327 with which Christy D. Jones is associated, and to terminate David B. Thomas and to substitute Susan M. Robinson as counsel of record, both on the main master docket and for each individual member case in MDL 2327 with which David B. Thomas is associated. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 5/24/2018. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented party) (ts) (ADI) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 10/23/2020.]
August 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER The deadline to submit joint motions of dismissal is extended to 10/31/2018 for all cases in MDL 2327 currently on an inactive docket. All remaining provisions of Inactive Docket Orders entered in MDL 2327 and individual cases remain in effect. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 8/15/2018. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented party) (REF: MDL 2327; Cases on inactive docket) (lca) (ADI) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 10/23/2020.]
May 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER (CHANGE TO CHARACTERIZATION BY CLERK'S OFFICE OF CASES ON INACTIVE DOCKET) It is directed that in all cases with an inactive docket order which resulted in "Closed" and "MDL Ethicon Inactive" flags on the docket sheet, the Clerk is directed to update the docket by removing the "Closed" flag from the docket sheet and leaving the "MDL Ethicon Inactive" flag, for reasons set forth herein. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 4/26/2018. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented party) (REF: MDL 2327; Member Cases Flagged "Closed" and "MDL Ethicon Inactive") (brn) (ADI) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 10/23/2020.]
March 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER The deadline to submit joint motions of dismissal is extended to 8/31/2018 for all cases in MDL 2327 currently on an inactive docket. All remaining provisions of Inactive Docket Orders entered in MDL 2327 and individual cases remain in effect. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 3/16/2018. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented party) (REF: MDL 2327; Cases on inactive docket) (mek) (ADI) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 10/23/2020.]
December 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 8 INACTIVE DOCKET ORDER: The court has been advised that the plaintiff(s) and Ethicon, Inc. have reached a settlement with regard to Ethicon. All discovery deadlines are continued until further order of the court. The Clerk is directed to retire this case from the active docket. Plaintiff(s) and Ethicon may submit an agreed order of dismissal with prejudice on or before 3/31/2018; if settlements are not finalized and dismissal orders are not submitted by then the Court will have a hearing to determine the appropriate action pertaining to any remaining cases on the inactive docket. Counsel for plaintiffs and defendant(s) are directed to provide quarterly reports as to their progress in dismissing cases on the inactive docket. The court will reinstate the case to the active docket if one of the parties shows good cause for such reinstatement. This Order is related to the Proposed Inactive Docket Order filed at ECF No. 4890 in MDL Case No. 2327 Ethicon. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 12/7/2017. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (ts) (ADI) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 10/23/2020.]
July 19, 2017 Filing 7 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE AND COUNSEL CONTACT INFORMATION FORM by Kari L. Sutherland on behalf of Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson. (Sutherland, Kari) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 10/23/2020.]
June 2, 2017 Filing 6 PLAINTIFF PROFILE FORM filed by Charles Curtin, Laura Curtin. (Sparks, Mark) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 10/23/2020.]
February 10, 2015 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE AND COUNSEL CONTACT INFORMATION FORM by Christy D. Jones on behalf of Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson. (Jones, Christy) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 10/23/2020.]
February 3, 2015 Filing 4 FIRST AMENDED SHORT FORM COMPLAINT filed by Laura Curtin, Charles Curtin against Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson. (Mostyn, J.) (Modified on 2/3/2015 to add party filer) (skh). [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 10/23/2020.]
December 11, 2014 Filing 3 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE AND COUNSEL CONTACT INFORMATION FORM by David B. Thomas on behalf of Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson. (Thomas, David) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 10/23/2020.]
July 11, 2014 Filing 2 TRANSMITTED PRETRIAL ORDER # 127 (FIFTH AMENDED DOCKET CONTROL ORDER ON SECOND ROUND OF BELLWETHERS Huskey and Edwards) entered on 07/09/2014 in MDL 2327 to attorneys in member case. (kw) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 10/23/2020.]
July 9, 2014 Filing 1 SHORT FORM COMPLAINT. Filing Fee $400.00. Receipt # 0425-3320146. (Attachment: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (lca) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 10/23/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Curtin et al v. Ethicon, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson
Represented By: Sarah Smyth O'Brien
Represented By: Susan Marie Robinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ETHICON INC.
Represented By: Sarah Smyth O'Brien
Represented By: Susan Marie Robinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles Curtin
Represented By: Micajah D. Boatright
Represented By: Noah M. Wexler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Laura Curtin
Represented By: Micajah D. Boatright
Represented By: Noah M. Wexler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?