Chanta et al v. Homesite Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Mariano Chanta and Angela Chanta
Defendant: Homesite Insurance Company
Case Number: 1:2020cv03262
Filed: November 2, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Daniel D Domenico
Referring Judge: Kristen L Mix
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 21, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 21 SCHEDULING ORDER: by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 12/21/20. (lgale, )
December 21, 2020 Filing 20 MINUTE ENTRY for Telephonic Scheduling Conference held before Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 12/21/2020. Discovery due by 7/1/2021. Dispositive Motions due by 8/1/2021. FTR: KLM Courtroom A401. (Attachments: #1 Discovery Procedures and Requirements of Practice) (lgale, )
December 14, 2020 Filing 19 Proposed Scheduling Order by Defendant Homesite Insurance Company. (Wiese, Melissa)
December 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 72(a) and (b), this case is referred to the assigned United States Magistrate Judge to (1) convene a scheduling conference under Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b) and enter a scheduling order meeting the requirements of Local Civ. R. 16.2, (2) conduct such status conferences and issue such orders necessary for compliance with the scheduling order, including amendments or modifications of the scheduling order upon a showing of good cause, (3) hear and determine pretrial matters, including discovery and other non-dispositive motions, (4) conduct hearings, including evidentiary hearings, and submit proposed findings of fact and recommendations for rulings on dispositive motions, and (5) pursuant to Local Civ. R. 16.6 and at the discretion of the Magistrate Judge, convene such early neutral evaluation and/or settlement conferences and direct related procedures as may facilitate resolution of this case without the necessity of a motion or prior authorization of the undersigned. SO ORDERED by Judge Daniel D. Domenico on 12/14/2020. Text Only Entry (dddlc1, )
December 8, 2020 Filing 17 CASE REASSIGNED pursuant to #15 Consent to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge. All parties do not consent. This case is randomly reassigned to Judge Daniel D. Domenico. All future pleadings should be designated as 20-cv-03262-DDD. (Text Only Entry) (nmarb, )
December 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 12/8/20 re: #15 Consent to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge, filed by Angela Chanta, Mariano Chanta. At least one party in this civil action does not consent to have a United States Magistrate Judge conduct all proceedings. Accordingly, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that this case shall be assigned to a District Judge under D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1(c)(8) and D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1(a). (nmarb, )
December 7, 2020 Filing 15 CONSENT to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge by Plaintiffs Angela Chanta, Mariano Chanta, Counter Defendants Angela Chanta, Mariano Chanta All parties do not consent.. (Klein, Hunter)
December 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 MINUTE ORDER. In accordance with efforts to minimize the spread of COVID-19, all counsel or parties who wish to participate in, or members of the public who wish to listen into, the Scheduling Conference set for December 21, 2020, at 11:00 a.m. shall do so by TELEPHONE by calling the Court at 888-363-4749, Access Code: 2115325#, at the time of the hearing. by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 12/4/2020. Text Only Entry (klmlc2, )
November 23, 2020 Filing 13 ANSWER/REPLY to #9 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim by Angela Chanta, Mariano Chanta.(Klein, Hunter)
November 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 11/5/20 Setting Scheduling/Planning Conference. Proposed Scheduling Order due by 12/14/2020. Scheduling/Planning Conference set for 12/21/2020 11:00 AM in Courtroom A 401 before Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix. (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1, #2 Attachment 2) (nmarb, )
November 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 MINUTE ORDER. Pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1(c)(4), the deadline to file the Consent/Non-Consent to United States Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction form [#5] is December 7, 2020. by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 11/5/2020. Text Only Entry (klmlc2, )
November 3, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Melissa Ann Wiese on behalf of Homesite Insurance CompanyAttorney Melissa Ann Wiese added to party Homesite Insurance Company(pty:dft) (Wiese, Melissa)
November 3, 2020 Filing 9 ANSWER to #4 Complaint and Jury Demand, COUNTERCLAIM against Angela Chanta, Mariano Chanta by Homesite Insurance Company.(Chaney, Lelia)
November 3, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Sofia Maria Straus on behalf of All Plaintiffs Attorney Sofia Maria Straus added to party Angela Chanta(pty:pla), Attorney Sofia Maria Straus added to party Mariano Chanta(pty:pla) (Straus, Sofia)
November 3, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Robert D. Green on behalf of All Plaintiffs Attorney Robert D. Green added to party Angela Chanta(pty:pla), Attorney Robert D. Green added to party Mariano Chanta(pty:pla) (Green, Robert)
November 3, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Hunter M. Klein on behalf of All Plaintiffs Attorney Hunter M. Klein added to party Angela Chanta(pty:pla), Attorney Hunter M. Klein added to party Mariano Chanta(pty:pla) (Klein, Hunter)
November 2, 2020 Filing 5 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1, direct assignment of civil actions to full time magistrate judges. (trvo, )
November 2, 2020 Filing 4 Original COMPLAINT and Jury Demand against Homesite Insurance Company, filed by Angela Chanta, Mariano Chanta.(trvo, )
November 2, 2020 Filing 3 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix. Text Only Entry. (trvo, )
November 2, 2020 Filing 2 FIRST AND FINAL NOTICE TO ALL ATTORNEY(S) AND UNREPRESENTED PARTIES IN REMOVED, TRANSFERRED, OR OTHER CASES. To receive any further notice in a case removed or transferred to this court, or special matters including discovery disputes, bankruptcy appeals, or withdrawals of reference, Multi-district litigation (MDL), etc., all attorneys and unrepresented parties must enter an appearance under D.C.COLO.LAttyR 5(a). An attorney must be an active member of this court's bar and be in good standing in accordance with D.C.COLO.LAttyR 3. A waiver of the fee for bar admission may apply in limited situations. (Text Only Entry) (trvo, )
November 2, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Homesite Insurance Company from District Court, Arapahoe County, Colorado, Case Number 2020CV31930. (Filing fee $ 400, Receipt Number 1082-7569595), filed by Homesite Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Appendix A-1, #2 Appendix A-2, #3 Appendix A-3, #4 Appendix A-4, #5 Appendix A-5, #6 Appendix A-6, #7 Civil Cover Sheet)(Chaney, Lelia)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Chanta et al v. Homesite Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mariano Chanta
Represented By: Robert D. Green
Represented By: Sofia Maria Straus
Represented By: Hunter M. Klein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Angela Chanta
Represented By: Robert D. Green
Represented By: Sofia Maria Straus
Represented By: Hunter M. Klein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Homesite Insurance Company
Represented By: Lelia Kathleen Chaney
Represented By: Melissa Ann Wiese
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?