Quint et al v. Vail Resorts Inc.
Plaintiff: Randy Dean Quint, Mark Molina and John Linn
Defendant: Vail Resorts Inc.
Case Number: 1:2020cv03569
Filed: December 3, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Daniel D Domenico
Referring Judge: Gordon P Gallagher
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 31, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 31, 2021 Filing 26 JOINDER Of Plaintiff Norman Bowles by Plaintiffs John Linn, Mark Molina, Randy Dean Quint. (Dietrich, Edward)
January 31, 2021 Filing 25 JOINDER Of Plaintiff Karen Shupe by Plaintiffs John Linn, Mark Molina, Randy Dean Quint. (Dietrich, Edward)
January 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER: Telephonic Scheduling Conference set for 3/17/2021 09:00 AM in Room 323 (Grand Junction) before Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher. Parties shall file proposed Scheduling Order one week prior. At the time of the hearing, parties shall call 888-363-4749, Access 3136546#. By Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on January 22, 2021. Text Only Entry (gpgsec, )
January 20, 2021 Filing 23 JOINDER Of Plaintiff Jill Adler by Plaintiffs John Linn, Mark Molina, Randy Dean Quint. (Dietrich, Edward)
January 15, 2021 Filing 22 NOTICE of Change of Address/Contact Information for Benjamin Galdston, attorney for Plaintiffs by Edward P. Dietrich (Dietrich, Edward)
January 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 21 MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang on 1/15/2021. Given 20 Order Reassigning Case, the March 9th Scheduling Conference before Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang is VACATED. Text Only Entry (nywlc2, )
January 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER: This matter has its factual nexus in Eagle County. According to the Court's Revised Jury Plan for Random Jury Selection, this case is therefore properly designated for Jury Division 3. Because the jury will be drawn from that Division, it is appropriate that the case be managed, for pretrial purposes, by Magistrate Judge Gallagher in Grand Junction. Accordingly, pursuant to D.C. Colo. L. Civ. R. 40.1(a), and as approved by the Chief Judge of the Court, the undersigned directs that the Clerk of the Court reassign this action to Magistrate Judge Gallagher as the referral judge. All further pleadings in this case shall reflect the case number of 20-cv-03569-DDD-GPG. SO ORDERED by Judge Daniel D. Domenico on 01/15/2021. Text Only Entry (athom, )
January 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER granting #16 Motion to Reset by Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang on 1/14/2021. The Telephonic Scheduling Conference is RESET for 3/9/2021 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang, with the Proposed Scheduling Order due 3/2/2021. The Parties shall use the dial-in information as previously ordered to participate in the conference. Text Only Entry(nywlc2, )
January 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER REFERRING MOTION: #16 Joint MOTION to Reset Scheduling Conference and Related Deadlines filed by Vail Resorts Inc. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang by Judge Daniel D. Domenico on 1/13/2021. Text Only Entry (dddlc3, )
January 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 72(a) and (b), this case is referred to the assigned United States Magistrate Judge to (1) convene a scheduling conference under Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b) and enter a scheduling order meeting the requirements of Local Civ. R. 16.2, (2) conduct such status conferences and issue such orders necessary for compliance with the scheduling order, including amendments or modifications of the scheduling order upon a showing of good cause, (3) hear and determine pretrial matters, including discovery and other non-dispositive motions, (4) conduct hearings, including evidentiary hearings, and submit proposed findings of fact and recommendations for rulings on dispositive motions, and (5) pursuant to Local Civ. R. 16.6 and at the discretion of the Magistrate Judge, convene such early neutral evaluation and/or settlement conferences and direct related procedures as may facilitate resolution of this case without the necessity of a motion or prior authorization of the undersigned. SO ORDERED by Judge Daniel D. Domenico on 1/13/2021. Text Only Entry (dddlc3, )
January 12, 2021 Filing 16 Joint MOTION to Reset Scheduling Conference and Related Deadlines by Defendant Vail Resorts Inc.. (Muhleisen, Michelle)
January 11, 2021 Filing 15 CASE REASSIGNED pursuant to #14 Consent to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge. All parties do not consent. This case is randomly reassigned to Judge Daniel D. Domenico. All future pleadings should be designated as 20-cv-03569-DDD. (Text Only Entry) (nmarb, )
January 8, 2021 Filing 14 CONSENT to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge by Defendant Vail Resorts Inc. All parties do not consent.. (Muhleisen, Michelle)
January 7, 2021 Filing 13 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. (Muhleisen, Michelle)
January 6, 2021 Filing 12 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Randy Dean Quint, Mark Molina, John Linn. Vail Resorts Inc. waiver sent on 12/28/2020, answer due 2/26/2021. (Dietrich, Edward)
January 6, 2021 Filing 11 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Jonathan O. Harris on behalf of Vail Resorts Inc.Attorney Jonathan O. Harris added to party Vail Resorts Inc.(pty:dft) (Harris, Jonathan)
January 5, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Michelle Brand Muhleisen on behalf of Vail Resorts Inc.Attorney Michelle Brand Muhleisen added to party Vail Resorts Inc.(pty:dft) (Muhleisen, Michelle)
December 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING/PLANNING CONFERENCE AND SETTING DEADLINE FOR FILING OF CONSENT/NONCONSENT FORM by Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang on 24 December 2020. Consent Form due by 1/11/2021. Proposed Scheduling Order due 1/18/2021 Scheduling Conference set for 1/25/2021 10:30 AM in Courtroom A 502 before Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang via telephone conference. All participants shall use the following dial-in information: 888-363-4749, Access Code: 5738976. (cmadr, )
December 21, 2020 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs. Vail Resorts Inc. served on 12/9/2020, answer due 12/30/2020. (Dietrich, Edward)
December 12, 2020 Filing 7 JOINDER Of Plaintiff Roberta Boyd by Plaintiffs John Linn, Mark Molina, Randy Dean Quint. (Dietrich, Edward)
December 12, 2020 Filing 6 JOINDER Of Plaintiff Gregor Neal by Plaintiffs John Linn, Mark Molina, Randy Dean Quint. (Dietrich, Edward)
December 12, 2020 Filing 5 JOINDER Of Plaintiff Tiffany Neal by Plaintiffs John Linn, Mark Molina, Randy Dean Quint. (Dietrich, Edward)
December 4, 2020 Filing 4 SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (jsalz, )
December 4, 2020 Filing 2 ADVISORY NOTICE TO ATTORNEY AND COURT: BENJAMIN GALDSTON attempted to enter his appearance in this case by affixing his "s/" signature to the complaint. A search of the court's attorney roll does not indicate counsel is a member of the bar of this court. Pursuant to D.C.COLO.LAttyR 5(a)(5) his purported appearance will not be recognized at this time. (Text Only Entry) (mfred)
December 3, 2020 Filing 3 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang. Text Only Entry. (jsalz, )
December 3, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Vail Resorts Inc. (Filing fee $ 402,Receipt Number 1082-7615946)Attorney Edward P. Dietrich added to party Randy Dean Quint(pty:pla), Attorney Edward P. Dietrich added to party John Linn(pty:pla), Attorney Edward P. Dietrich added to party Mark Molina(pty:pla), filed by Randy Dean Quint, John Linn, Mark Molina. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Dietrich, Edward) Modified on 12/4/2020 to correct text (angar, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Quint et al v. Vail Resorts Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Randy Dean Quint
Represented By: Edward P. Dietrich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark Molina
Represented By: Edward P. Dietrich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Linn
Represented By: Edward P. Dietrich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vail Resorts Inc.
Represented By: Jonathan O. Harris
Represented By: Michelle Brand Muhleisen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?