Center for Biological Diversity et al v. U.S. Department of the Interior et al
Plaintiff: Western Watersheds Project and Center for Biological Diversity
Defendant: Vicki Christiansen, Bureau of Land Management, David Bernhardt, U.S. Fish and Wildlife Service, Aurelia Skipwith, U.S. Department of the Interior, Margaret Everson, U.S. Forest Service, National Park Service, William Perry Pendley, U.S. Fish and Wildlife and William Pendley
Case Number: 1:2020cv03580
Filed: December 7, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Robert E Blackburn
Nature of Suit: Environmental Matters
Cause of Action: 16:1540
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 28, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 28, 2021 Filing 13 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to Answer or Respond to the Complaint Pursuant to L.R. 6.1 by Defendants Aurelia Skipwith, National Park Service, Bureau of Land Management, Margaret Everson, William Pendley, David Bernhardt, Vicki Christiansen, U.S. Department of the Interior, U.S. Fish and Wildlife, U.S. Forest Service. All Defendants. (Caschette, Kamela)
December 28, 2020 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed upon all defendant(s) Aurelia Skipwith served on 12/14/2020, answer due 2/12/2021; Bureau of Land Management served on 12/14/2020, answer due 2/12/2021; Vicki Christiansen served on 12/14/2020, answer due 2/12/2021; David Bernhardt served on 12/14/2020, answer due 2/12/2021; Margaret Everson served on 12/14/2020, answer due 2/12/2021; National Park Service served on 12/14/2020, answer due 2/12/2021; William Pendley served on 12/14/2020, answer due 2/12/2021; U.S. Department of the Interior served on 12/14/2020, answer due 2/12/2021; U.S. Fish and Wildlife served on 12/14/2020, answer due 2/12/2021; U.S. Forest Service served on 12/14/2020, answer due 2/12/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Shannon, Ryan)
December 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER REGARDING INSTRUCTIONS FOR JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 12/19/2020. (athom, )
December 17, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Kamela Ann Caschette on behalf of All Defendants Attorney Kamela Ann Caschette added to party Aurelia Skipwith(pty:dft), Attorney Kamela Ann Caschette added to party Bureau of Land Management(pty:dft), Attorney Kamela Ann Caschette added to party Vicki Christiansen(pty:dft), Attorney Kamela Ann Caschette added to party David Bernhardt(pty:dft), Attorney Kamela Ann Caschette added to party Margaret Everson(pty:dft), Attorney Kamela Ann Caschette added to party National Park Service(pty:dft), Attorney Kamela Ann Caschette added to party William Pendley(pty:dft), Attorney Kamela Ann Caschette added to party U.S. Department of the Interior(pty:dft), Attorney Kamela Ann Caschette added to party U.S. Fish and Wildlife(pty:dft), Attorney Kamela Ann Caschette added to party U.S. Forest Service(pty:dft) (Caschette, Kamela)
December 9, 2020 Filing 9 SUMMONSES issued by Clerk. (athom, )
December 8, 2020 Filing 8 SUMMONS REQUEST as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR, DAVID BERNHARDT, U.S. FISH AND WILDLIFE SERVICE, AURELIA SKIPWITH, BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT, WILLIAM PENDLEY, U.S. FOREST SERVICE, VICKI CHRISTIANSEN, NATIONAL PARK SERVICE, and MARGARET EVERSON by Plaintiffs Center for Biological Diversity, Western Watersheds Project. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons, #7 Summons, #8 Summons, #9 Summons, #10 Summons, #11 Summons)(Shannon, Ryan)
December 8, 2020 Filing 7 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c). NO SUMMONS ISSUED. Summons submitted has incorrect caption and is not issued. Each summons caption must list every defendant. Please file completed summons for issuance using the event "Summons Request." (jtorr, )
December 8, 2020 Filing 6 Case assigned to Judge Robert E. Blackburn. Text Only Entry. (jtorr, )
December 8, 2020 Filing 5 ADVISORY NOTICE OF NONCOMPLIANCE WITH COURT RULES/PROCEDURES:re: #2 Corporate Disclosure Statement, #3 Notice of Entry of Appearance, #1 Complaint, filed by attorney Talasi B. Brooks. DO NOT REFILE THE DOCUMENTS. Action to take - counsel must submit a change of contact request through the Attorney Services Portal Account pursuant to D.C.COLO.LAttyR 5(c) and 3.5 of the Electronic Case Filing Procedures (Civil cases).(Text Only Entry) (jtorr, )
December 8, 2020 Filing 4 Administrative Notice: Duplicate filing fee received. Financial notified and a refund is pending. (Text Only Entry) (alave, )
December 7, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Talasi Banas Brooks on behalf of Western Watersheds ProjectAttorney Talasi Banas Brooks added to party Western Watersheds Project(pty:pla) (Brooks, Talasi)
December 7, 2020 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. (Shannon, Ryan)
December 7, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 402,Receipt Number 1082-7619469)Attorney Ryan Adair Shannon added to party Center for Biological Diversity(pty:pla), filed by Western Watersheds Project, Center for Biological Diversity. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons, #7 Summons, #8 Summons, #9 Summons, #10 Summons, #11 Summons, #12 Summons, #13 Summons, #14 Summons)(Shannon, Ryan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Center for Biological Diversity et al v. U.S. Department of the Interior et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vicki Christiansen
Represented By: Kamela Ann Caschette
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bureau of Land Management
Represented By: Kamela Ann Caschette
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Bernhardt
Represented By: Kamela Ann Caschette
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Fish and Wildlife Service
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aurelia Skipwith
Represented By: Kamela Ann Caschette
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Department of the Interior
Represented By: Kamela Ann Caschette
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Margaret Everson
Represented By: Kamela Ann Caschette
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Forest Service
Represented By: Kamela Ann Caschette
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Park Service
Represented By: Kamela Ann Caschette
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Perry Pendley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Fish and Wildlife
Represented By: Kamela Ann Caschette
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Pendley
Represented By: Kamela Ann Caschette
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Western Watersheds Project
Represented By: Talasi Banas Brooks
Represented By: Talasi B. Brooks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Center for Biological Diversity
Represented By: Ryan Adair Shannon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?