StreetMediaGroup, LLC et al v. Department of Transportation, State of Colorado
Plaintiff: StreetMediaGroup, LLC and Turnpike Media, LLC
Defendant: Department of Transportation, State of Colorado
Case Number: 1:2020cv03602
Filed: December 8, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: R Brooke Jackson
Referring Judge: Nina Y Wang
Nature of Suit: Constitutionality of State Statutes
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331 ss
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 6, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 28 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Defendant Department of Transportation, State of Colorado. (Frohardt, Andrew)
February 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 27 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Pawan Nelson on behalf of Department of Transportation, State of ColoradoAttorney Pawan Nelson added to party Department of Transportation, State of Colorado(pty:dft) (Nelson, Pawan)
February 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 26 Proposed Scheduling Order by Plaintiffs StreetMediaGroup, LLC, Turnpike Media, LLC. (Messenger, Todd)
January 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER granting #23 Motion for Order. Your proposed order will have to wait until Monday morning, as the motion and order filed too late on January 29 for us to get the order out, but the granting of the motion today should cover what you wanted to do on Monday. by Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 1/30/21. Text Only Entry(rbj)
January 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER AND PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION by Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 1/29/21. (jdyne, )
January 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 23 Joint MOTION for Order to on Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction by Defendant Department of Transportation, State of Colorado. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Frohardt, Andrew)
January 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 22 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Judge R. Brooke Jackson: Motion for Temporary Restraining Order Hearing held via video conference on 1/29/2021. Court Reporter: Sarah Mitchell. (jdyne, )
January 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 21 Exhibits in Support of #20 Reply in Support of Their #11 Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction by Plaintiffs StreetMediaGroup, LLC, Turnpike Media, LLC. (Messenger, Todd)
January 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 20 REPLY to #11 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction by Plaintiffs StreetMediaGroup, LLC, Turnpike Media, LLC. (Messenger, Todd)
January 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 RESPONSE to #11 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction filed by Defendant Department of Transportation, State of Colorado. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - N. Lacey Dep. Tr. Excerpts, #2 Exhibit B - G. Young Dep. Tr. Excerpts)(Sayas, Patrick)
January 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 MINUTE ORDER re: #11 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction. A full-day Hearing is set for 1/29/2021 at 9:00 AM before Judge R. Brooke Jackson. Due to the COVID-19 pandemic, the hearing will be held by video teleconference. The Court's staff will provide connection instructions to the parties by email prior to the hearing. By Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 1/15/2021. Text Only Entry (rbjsec. )
January 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Andrew Mark Frohardt on behalf of Department of Transportation, State of ColoradoAttorney Andrew Mark Frohardt added to party Department of Transportation, State of Colorado(pty:dft) (Frohardt, Andrew)
January 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Patrick L. Sayas on behalf of Department of Transportation, State of ColoradoAttorney Patrick L. Sayas added to party Department of Transportation, State of Colorado(pty:dft) (Sayas, Patrick)
January 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 MINUTE ORDER re: #11 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction. The Court is available for a full-day hearing on 1/26/2021; 1/27/2021; or 1/29/2021 all at 9:00 a.m. The Court requests that counsel confer and then notify Chambers at jackson_chambers@cod.uscourts.gov of which date you select. By Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 1/14/2021. Text Only Entry (rbjsec. )
January 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 MINUTE ORDER: In light of the reassignment of this case to this Court the Scheduling Conference set 2/11/2021 before Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang is vacated. Due to the COVID-19 pandemic, this Court will not hold a scheduling conference. The Court requests that counsel confer and attempt to agree on a schedule and submit a proposed scheduling order by 2/4/2021 pointing out any areas of disagreement. Please email the proposed order to Jackson_Chambers@cod.uscourts.gov in Word format and efile into CM/ECF. The Court will review the proposed order and make such rulings as are appropriate and will provide the parties with potential trial preparation conference and trial dates for you to choose from. By Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 1/13/2021. Text Only Entry (rbjsec. )
January 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 CASE REASSIGNED pursuant to #12 Minute Order. This case is randomly reassigned to Judge R. Brooke Jackson. All future pleadings should be designated as 20-cv-03602-RBJ. (Text Only Entry) (nmarb, )
January 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang on 1/13/21. Upon review of all the documents filed in this case, see [#1 through #11], the court concludes that this matter should be directly assigned to a District Judge pursuant toD.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1. IT IS ORDERED: The Clerk of the Court is DIRECTED to REDRAW this action to a District Judge for further proceedings. (nmarb, )
January 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction by Plaintiffs StreetMediaGroup, LLC, Turnpike Media, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Highlighted excerpts from transcript of the sworn deposition of Anthony Lovato, CDOT Outdoor Advertising Program Manager, taken January 6, 2020, in the case of StreetMediaGroup, LLC v. Department of Transportation, State of Colorado (State of Colorado Office of Administrative Courts Case No. HW 2019-0001) (Administrative Case), #2 Exhibit 2 - Highlighted excerpts from transcript of the sworn deposition of Neil Lacey, CDOTs Branch Manager for Project Development Services, taken November 10, 2020, in the Administrative Case, #3 Exhibit 3 - Affidavit of Gary Young, Chief Executive Officer of Plaintiff StreetMediaGroup, LLC, #4 Exhibit 4 - Photographs and Locations of Existing Signs that Do Not Have State Permits for the Display of Off-Premise Messages, #5 Exhibit 5 - Recorded Adams County, Colorado Conditional Use Approval Resolutions for Signs at 1280 West 64th Avenue; 48 East 56th Avenue; and 275 East 64th Avenue, #6 Exhibit 6 - Emails from Adams County Community and Economic Development Department Staff Regarding Pending Conditional Use Applications for Signs at 6612 York Street (RCU2020-00038); 7154 North Washington Street (RCU2020-00014); 333 76th Avenue (RCU2020-00011); 7080 York Street (RCU2020-00013); 6711 North Washington Street (RCU2020-00016); and 605 East 70th Avenue (RCU2020- 00012), #7 Exhibit 7 - Illustrative Examples of Messages Displayed by Plaintiffs, #8 Exhibit 8 - Notice of Noncompliance and Violation of State and Federal Outdoor Advertising Laws and Rules and Demand to Cease and Desist, dated January 19, 2016; and Final Notice and Demand to Cease and Desist Illegal Advertising on Signs at 7300 Broadway, Denver, CO 80221, dated January 29, 2016, #9 Exhibit 9 - Application Forms for 7300 Broadway Signs, 275 East 64th Avenue Sign, and 48 East 56th Avenue Sign, #10 Exhibit 10 - Denial Letters for 7300 Broadway Signs, 275 East 64th Avenue Sign, and 48 East 56th Avenue Sign, #11 Exhibit 11 - Excerpts from Adams County Development Standards and Regulations ( 2-02- 09-09 and 2-02-09-10), #12 Proposed Order (PDF Only) Granting Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction)(Messenger, Todd)
January 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Department of Transportation, State of Colorado, filed by StreetMediaGroup, LLC, Turnpike Media, LLC.(Messenger, Todd)
December 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING/PLANNING CONFERENCE AND SETTING DEADLINE FOR FILING OF CONSENT/NON-CONSENT FORM by Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang on 21 December 2020. Consent Form due by 1/28/2021. Proposed Scheduling Order due 2/4/2021. Scheduling Conference set for 2/11/2021 02:00 PM in Courtroom A 502 before Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang via telephone conference. All participants shall use the following dial-in information: 888-363-4749, Access Code: 5738976. (cmadr, )
December 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by StreetMediaGroup, LLC, Turnpike Media, LLC. Department of Transportation, State of Colorado waiver sent on 12/11/2020, answer due 2/9/2021. (Messenger, Todd)
December 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent Turnpike Media LLC, a Colorado limited liability company for Turnpike Media, LLC. (Helm, Andrew)
December 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent StreetMediaGroup, LLC, a Colorado limited liability company for StreetMediaGroup, LLC. (Helm, Andrew)
December 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Andrew John Helm on behalf of All Plaintiffs Attorney Andrew John Helm added to party StreetMediaGroup, LLC(pty:pla), Attorney Andrew John Helm added to party Turnpike Media, LLC(pty:pla) (Helm, Andrew)
December 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Colin Andrew Walker on behalf of StreetMediaGroup, LLC, Turnpike Media, LLCAttorney Colin Andrew Walker added to party StreetMediaGroup, LLC(pty:pla), Attorney Colin Andrew Walker added to party Turnpike Media, LLC(pty:pla) (Walker, Colin)
December 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (jtorr, )
December 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang. Text Only Entry. (jtorr, )
December 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Department of Transportation, State of Colorado (Filing fee $ 402,Receipt Number 1082-7622144)Attorney Todd G. Messenger added to party Turnpike Media, LLC, a Colorado limited liability company(pty:pla), Attorney Todd G. Messenger added to party StreetMediaGroup, LLC, a Colorado limited liability company(pty:pla), filed by StreetMediaGroup, LLC, a Colorado limited liability company, Turnpike Media, LLC, a Colorado limited liability company. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Messenger, Todd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: StreetMediaGroup, LLC et al v. Department of Transportation, State of Colorado
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: StreetMediaGroup, LLC
Represented By: Todd G. Messenger
Represented By: Colin Andrew Walker
Represented By: Andrew John Helm
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Turnpike Media, LLC
Represented By: Todd G. Messenger
Represented By: Colin Andrew Walker
Represented By: Andrew John Helm
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Department of Transportation, State of Colorado
Represented By: Pawan Nelson
Represented By: Andrew Mark Frohardt
Represented By: Patrick L. Sayas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?