Masciotra v. Vertafore, Inc.
Plaintiff: Conner Masciotra
Defendant: Vertafore, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2020cv03603
Filed: December 8, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: William J Martinez
Referring Judge: Nina Y Wang
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 18 U.S.C. ยง 2721
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 30, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang on 2/3/21 GRANTING #21 Motion to Stay. This matter is hereby STAYED pending the disposition of the Motion to Transfer by Judge Martinez; and the Scheduling Conference set for February 24, 2021 is VACATED. Within three (3) business days of any ruling on the Motion to Transfer, the Parties shall jointly contact chambers at Wang_Chambers@cod.uscourts.gov to set this matter for a Scheduling Conference if necessary.(nmarb, )
February 2, 2021 Filing 29 BRIEF in Opposition to #20 MOTION to Transfer Case : Motion to Transfer Pursuant to the First-Filed Rule and 28 U.S.C. 1404(A) filed by Plaintiff Conner Masciotra. (Levis, Christian)
February 2, 2021 Filing 28 REPLY to Response to #21 MOTION to Stay Proceedings Pending Resolution of Motion to Transfer Venue [Doc # 20] filed by Defendant Vertafore, Inc.. (Mace, Damond)
January 26, 2021 Filing 27 BRIEF in Opposition to #21 MOTION to Stay Proceedings Pending Resolution of Motion to Transfer Venue [Doc # 20] filed by Plaintiff Conner Masciotra. (Levis, Christian)
January 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER granting #24 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond by Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang on 1/19/2021. Defendant Vertafore, Inc. shall answer or otherwise respond to the Amended Complaint on or before 2/22/2021. Counsel are reminded that all requests for an extension of time must comply with D.C.COLO.LCivR 6.1(c) as well as WJM Civ. Practice Standard II.D.2.b., as future noncompliance may result in this court striking the filing without substantive consideration. Text Only Entry(nywlc2, )
January 19, 2021 Filing 25 MEMORANDUM regarding #24 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's First Amended Class Action Complaint filed by Vertafore, Inc.. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang by Judge William J. Martinez on 1/19/2021. Text Only Entry (wjmsec, )
January 18, 2021 Filing 24 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's First Amended Class Action Complaint by Defendant Vertafore, Inc.. (Mace, Damond)
January 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 23 MINUTE ORDER re: #21 MOTION to Stay Proceedings Pending Resolution of Motion to Transfer Venue [Doc # 20] filed by Vertafore, Inc. Plaintiff shall his Response to the Motion to Stay on or before 1/26/2021, and Defendant shall file its Reply, if any, by 2/2/2021 or within seven (7) days of the filing of Plaintiff's Response, whichever is earlier. By Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang on 1/14/2021. Text Only Entry (nywlc2, )
January 14, 2021 Filing 22 MEMORANDUM regarding #21 MOTION to Stay Proceedings Pending Resolution of Motion to Transfer Venue [Doc # 20] filed by Vertafore, Inc.. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang by Judge William J. Martinez on 1/14/2021. Text Only Entry (wjmsec, )
January 12, 2021 Filing 21 MOTION to Stay Proceedings Pending Resolution of Motion to Transfer Venue [Doc # 20] by Defendant Vertafore, Inc.. (Mace, Damond)
January 12, 2021 Filing 20 MOTION to Transfer Case : Motion to Transfer Pursuant to the First-Filed Rule and 28 U.S.C. 1404(A) by Defendant Vertafore, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A -- Allen Complaint, #2 Exhibit B -- Judicial Caseload Profile Excerpt)(Mace, Damond)
December 30, 2020 Filing 19 NOTICE of Filing Amended Pleading re #18 Amended Complaint by Plaintiff Conner Masciotra (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Levis, Christian)
December 30, 2020 Filing 18 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Vertafore, Inc., filed by Conner Masciotra.(Levis, Christian)
December 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER SETTING RULE 16(b) SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang on 24 December 2020. IT IS ORDERED that a Scheduling Conference is set February 24, 2021 at 10:00 a.m., via telephone conference. All participants shall use the following dial-in information: 888-363-4749, Access Code: 5738976#. Proposed Scheduling Order due 2/17/2021. (cmadr, )
December 21, 2020 Filing 17 ADVISORY NOTICE OF NONCOMPLIANCE WITH COURT RULES/PROCEDURES:re: #13 Notice of Entry of Appearance, #14 Notice of Entry of Appearance filed by attorney Kristin L. Bryan and Marissa L. Black. DO NOT REFILE THE DOCUMENT. Action to take - counsel must submit a change of contact request through the Attorney Services Portal Account pursuant to D.C.COLO.LAttyR 5(c) and 3.5 of the Electronic Case Filing Procedures (Civil cases).(Text Only Entry) (angar, )
December 21, 2020 Filing 15 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to Answer or Respond to the Complaint Up to and Including January 20, 2021 by Defendant Vertafore, Inc... (Mace, Damond)
December 21, 2020 Filing 14 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Marissa L. Black on behalf of Vertafore, Inc.Attorney Marissa L. Black added to party Vertafore, Inc.(pty:dft) (Black, Marissa)
December 21, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Kristin L. Bryan on behalf of Vertafore, Inc.Attorney Kristin L. Bryan added to party Vertafore, Inc.(pty:dft) (Bryan, Kristin)
December 21, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Sven C. Collins on behalf of Vertafore, Inc.Attorney Sven C. Collins added to party Vertafore, Inc.(pty:dft) (Collins, Sven)
December 21, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Rafael M. Langer-Osuna on behalf of Vertafore, Inc.Attorney Rafael M. Langer-Osuna added to party Vertafore, Inc.(pty:dft) (Langer-Osuna, Rafael)
December 21, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Damond R. Mace on behalf of Vertafore, Inc.Attorney Damond R. Mace added to party Vertafore, Inc.(pty:dft) (Mace, Damond)
December 15, 2020 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Conner Masciotra. Vertafore, Inc. served on 12/9/2020, answer due 12/30/2020. (Christina, Anthony)
December 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER: Counsel for the parties and all counsel who may later enter an appearance shall review and familiarize themselves with the undersigned's Revised Practice Standards (as most recently revised effective December 1, 2019 and as they may be amended from time to time), which may be downloaded #here. SO ORDERED by Judge William J. Martinez on 12 /2/2020. Text Only Entry (wjmsec, )
December 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang. Magistrate Judge Wang, or such other Magistrate Judge who may in the future be reassigned to this case, is designated to conduct NDISPO proceedings pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and Fed.R.Civ.P. 72(a) and (b). ALSO ORDERED that unless service has otherwise been completed or arranged, Plaintiffs counsel is directed to effect service of the summons and complaint pursuant to Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure no later than 30 days from the date of this Referral Order, in order for the initial scheduling conference to be held promptly. Court sponsored alternative dispute resolution is governed by D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.6. On the recommendation or informal request of the Magistrate Judge or on the request of the parties by motion, the court may direct the parties to engage in an early neutral evaluation, a settlement conference, or another alternative dispute resolution proceeding. SO ORDERED by Judge William J. Martinez on 12/11/2020. Text Only Entry (wjmsec, )
December 9, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Christian P. Levis on behalf of Conner MasciotraAttorney Christian P. Levis added to party Conner Masciotra(pty:pla) (Levis, Christian)
December 9, 2020 Filing 5 SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (trvo, )
December 8, 2020 Filing 4 Case assigned to Judge William J. Martinez and drawn to Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang. Text Only Entry. (trvo, )
December 8, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Anthony M. Christina on behalf of Conner MasciotraAttorney Anthony M. Christina added to party Conner Masciotra(pty:pla) (Christina, Anthony)
December 8, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE OF CASE ASSOCIATION D.C.COLO.LCivR 3.2, NOTICE OF RELATED CASE by Amanda Grace Fiorilla on behalf of Conner Masciotra (Fiorilla, Amanda)
December 8, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Vertafore, Inc. (Filing fee $ 402,Receipt Number 1082-7622460)Attorney Amanda Grace Fiorilla added to party Conner Masciotra(pty:pla), filed by Conner Masciotra. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Fiorilla, Amanda)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Masciotra v. Vertafore, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Conner Masciotra
Represented By: Amanda Grace Fiorilla
Represented By: Anthony M. Christina
Represented By: Christian P. Levis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vertafore, Inc.
Represented By: Kristin L. Bryan
Represented By: Sven C. Collins
Represented By: Damond R. Mace
Represented By: Marissa L. Black
Represented By: Rafael M. Langer-Osuna
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?