Enderle v. Mutual Securities, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Anne Enderle
Defendant: Nicholas Damiani, Julie Cohen, Mary Evans, Tom Bock, Aaron Jasper, Mitchell Voss, Ryan Sabol, Mutual Securities, Inc., Thomas Bock and Mary Catherine Evans
Case Number: 1:2020cv03659
Filed: December 14, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Daniel D Domenico
Referring Judge: Michael E Hegarty
Nature of Suit: Securities, Commodities, Exchange
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 9, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 9, 2021 Filing 19 COURTROOM MINUTES for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty: Status Conference held on 2/9/2021. FTR: A501. (cthom, )
February 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 Minute ORDER by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 2 February 2021. At the parties' request, the Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b) Scheduling Conference currently set for February 9, 2021 at 10:30 a.m. is vacated. In its place, a Status Conference is scheduled for the same day and time (February 9, 2021 at 10:30 a.m.) in Courtroom A-501, on the fifth floor of the Alfred A. Arraj United States Courthouse located at 901 19th Street, Denver, Colorado. (cmadr, )
January 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting #15 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond. Defendant Mary Evans shall answer or otherwise respond to the complaint in this case on or before 21 days after the court issues its decision on the motions to dismiss in Case No. 1:20-cv-02928-DDD-MEH, styled as Alzado-Lotz v. Mutual Securities, Inc et al. SO ORDERED by Judge Daniel D. Domenico on 1/26/2021. Text Only Entry(dddlc3, )
January 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 MINUTE ORDER re: #15 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond filed by Mary Catherine Evans. While the court is inclined to grant the requested extension as it did for some of the other defendants, Ms. Evans did not indicate whether her extension request was opposed. If Plaintiff opposes the request, she shall file a notice on or before January 25, 2021. If no such notice is filed, the court will treat the motion as unopposed and grant the requested extension. SO ORDERED by Judge Daniel D. Domenico on 1/21/2021. Text Only Entry (dddlc3, )
January 20, 2021 Filing 15 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond by Defendant Mary Catherine Evans. (Evans, Mary)
January 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #13 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond. The MSI Defendants (all defendants except for Mary Evans and Thomas Bock), shall answer or otherwise respond to the complaint in this case on or before 21 days after the court issues its decision on the motions to dismiss in Case No. 1:20-cv-02928-DDD-MEH, styled as Alzado-Lotz v. Mutual Securities, Inc et al. SO ORDERED by Judge Daniel D. Domenico on 1/15/2021. Text Only Entry(dddlc3, )
January 11, 2021 Filing 13 Stipulated MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond re #1 Complaint, by Defendants Julie Cohen, Nicholas Damiani, Aaron Jasper, Mutual Securities, Inc., Ryan Sabol, Mitchell Voss. (Scarborough, Harry)
January 11, 2021 Filing 12 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance of Meaghan Fischer by Meaghan Elaine Fischer on behalf of Julie Cohen, Nicholas Damiani, Aaron Jasper, Mutual Securities, Inc., Ryan Sabol, Mitchell VossAttorney Meaghan Elaine Fischer added to party Julie Cohen(pty:dft), Attorney Meaghan Elaine Fischer added to party Nicholas Damiani(pty:dft), Attorney Meaghan Elaine Fischer added to party Aaron Jasper(pty:dft), Attorney Meaghan Elaine Fischer added to party Mutual Securities, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Meaghan Elaine Fischer added to party Ryan Sabol(pty:dft), Attorney Meaghan Elaine Fischer added to party Mitchell Voss(pty:dft) (Fischer, Meaghan)
January 11, 2021 Filing 11 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance of Harry Scarborough by Harry Lloyd Scarborough on behalf of Julie Cohen, Nicholas Damiani, Aaron Jasper, Mutual Securities, Inc., Ryan Sabol, Mitchell VossAttorney Harry Lloyd Scarborough added to party Julie Cohen(pty:dft), Attorney Harry Lloyd Scarborough added to party Nicholas Damiani(pty:dft), Attorney Harry Lloyd Scarborough added to party Aaron Jasper(pty:dft), Attorney Harry Lloyd Scarborough added to party Mutual Securities, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Harry Lloyd Scarborough added to party Ryan Sabol(pty:dft), Attorney Harry Lloyd Scarborough added to party Mitchell Voss(pty:dft) (Scarborough, Harry)
January 11, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Lauren C. Hillemann on behalf of Julie Cohen, Nicholas Damiani, Aaron Jasper, Mutual Securities, Inc., Ryan Sabol, Mitchell VossAttorney Lauren C. Hillemann added to party Julie Cohen(pty:dft), Attorney Lauren C. Hillemann added to party Nicholas Damiani(pty:dft), Attorney Lauren C. Hillemann added to party Aaron Jasper(pty:dft), Attorney Lauren C. Hillemann added to party Mutual Securities, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Lauren C. Hillemann added to party Ryan Sabol(pty:dft), Attorney Lauren C. Hillemann added to party Mitchell Voss(pty:dft) (Hillemann, Lauren)
December 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Minute ORDER by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 29 December 2020. The Court notes that there are two related cases to this one: 20-cv-02928-DDD-MEH and 20-cv-03653-DDD-MEH. In order to address scheduling with all three cases, the Court will hold the Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b) Scheduling Conference on February 9, 2021, at 10:30 a.m. in Courtroom A-501, on the fifth floor of the Alfred A. Arraj United States Courthouse located at 901 19th Street, Denver, Colorado. Proposed Scheduling Order due 2/2/2021. (cmadr, )
December 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 72(a) and (b), this case is referred to the assigned United States Magistrate Judge to (1) convene a scheduling conference under Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b) and enter a scheduling order meeting the requirements of Local Civ. R. 16.2, (2) conduct such status conferences and issue such orders necessary for compliance with the scheduling order, including amendments or modifications of the scheduling order upon a showing of good cause, (3) hear and determine pretrial matters, including discovery and other non-dispositive motions, (4) conduct hearings, including evidentiary hearings, and submit proposed findings of fact and recommendations for rulings on dispositive motions, and (5) pursuant to Local Civ. R. 16.6 and at the discretion of the Magistrate Judge, convene such early neutral evaluation and/or settlement conferences and direct related procedures as may facilitate resolution of this case without the necessity of a motion or prior authorization of the undersigned. SO ORDERED by Judge Daniel D. Domenico on 12/24/2020. Text Only Entry (dddlc3, )
December 16, 2020 Filing 7 CASE REASSIGNED Pursuant to Order. This case is directly reassigned to Judge Daniel D. Domenico. All future pleadings should be designated as 20-cv-03659-DDD. (Text Only Entry) (nmarb, )
December 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 12/16/20. This matter comes before the Court sua sponte. In order to ensure the just, speedy, and inexpensive determination of this civil action, the Court finds that this matter should be reassigned pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1(d)(4). With the approval of the Chief Judge and Judge Daniel Domenico, IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that this case is hereby transferred to the Honorable Judge Domenico. The Clerks Office shall effect such transfer. (nmarb, )
December 15, 2020 Filing 5 SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (alave, )
December 14, 2020 Filing 4 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix. Text Only Entry. (alave, )
December 14, 2020 Filing 3 SUMMONS REQUEST as to all Defendants re #1 Complaint, by Plaintiff Anne Enderle. (Sturgeon-Garcia, David)
December 14, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE OF RELATED CASE by Plaintiff Anne Enderle (Sturgeon-Garcia, David)
December 14, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Tom Bock, Julie Cohen, Nicholas Damiani, Mary Evans, Aaron Jasper, Mutual Securities, Inc., Ryan Sabol, Mitchell Voss (Filing fee $ 402,Receipt Number 1082-7630592)Attorney David Sturgeon-Garcia added to party Anne Enderle(pty:pla), filed by Anne Enderle. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exh1- Class Complaint, #2 Exhibit Exh.2- MSJ Orders, #3 Exhibit Exh.3- Cohen Depo, #4 Exhibit Exh.4- MSI depo, #5 Exhibit Exh.5- Brokerage Agmnt)(Sturgeon-Garcia, David)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Enderle v. Mutual Securities, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nicholas Damiani
Represented By: Meaghan Elaine Fischer
Represented By: Harry Lloyd Scarborough
Represented By: Lauren C. Hillemann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Julie Cohen
Represented By: Meaghan Elaine Fischer
Represented By: Harry Lloyd Scarborough
Represented By: Lauren C. Hillemann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mary Evans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tom Bock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aaron Jasper
Represented By: Meaghan Elaine Fischer
Represented By: Harry Lloyd Scarborough
Represented By: Lauren C. Hillemann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mitchell Voss
Represented By: Meaghan Elaine Fischer
Represented By: Harry Lloyd Scarborough
Represented By: Lauren C. Hillemann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ryan Sabol
Represented By: Meaghan Elaine Fischer
Represented By: Harry Lloyd Scarborough
Represented By: Lauren C. Hillemann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mutual Securities, Inc.
Represented By: Meaghan Elaine Fischer
Represented By: Harry Lloyd Scarborough
Represented By: Lauren C. Hillemann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas Bock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mary Catherine Evans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anne Enderle
Represented By: David Sturgeon-Garcia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?