SJ Enterprises Pty Ltd. v. GrowGeneration Corp. et al
Plaintiff: SJ Enterprises Pty Ltd.
Defendant: GrowGeneration Corp., GrowGeneration Michigan Corp. and GrowGeneration California Corp
Case Number: 1:2020cv03661
Filed: December 15, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: R Brooke Jackson
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1051
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 11, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 MINUTE ORDER re: #18 Notice of Settlement filed by GrowGeneration Corp., GrowGeneration California Corp, GrowGeneration Michigan Corp. Dismissal Paper due by 3/12/2021. By Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 2/11/2021. Text Only Entry (rbjsec. )
February 10, 2021 Filing 18 NOTICE of Settlement by Defendants GrowGeneration California Corp, GrowGeneration Corp., GrowGeneration Michigan Corp. (Tamkin, Gregory)
February 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting #16 Third MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond re 1 Complaint. GrowGeneration California Corp answer due 2/10/2021; GrowGeneration Corp. answer due 2/10/2021; GrowGeneration Michigan Corp. answer due 2/10/2021. By Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 2/4/2021. Text Only Entry(rbjsec. )
February 3, 2021 Filing 16 Third MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond re #1 Complaint, by Defendants GrowGeneration California Corp, GrowGeneration Corp., GrowGeneration Michigan Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Tamkin, Gregory)
February 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #14 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond re #1 Complaint. GrowGeneration California Corp answer due 2/3/2021; GrowGeneration Corp. answer due 2/3/2021; GrowGeneration Michigan Corp. answer due 2/3/2021. By Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 2/1/2021. Text Only Entry(rbjsec. )
January 29, 2021 Filing 14 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond re #1 Complaint, by Defendants GrowGeneration California Corp, GrowGeneration Corp., GrowGeneration Michigan Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only) Second Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time)(Tamkin, Gregory)
January 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #12 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond re #1 Complaint. GrowGeneration California Corp answer due 1/30/2021; GrowGeneration Corp. answer due 1/30/2021; GrowGeneration Michigan Corp. answer due 1/30/2021. by Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 1/21/2021. Text Only Entry(rbjsec. )
January 20, 2021 Filing 12 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond re #1 Complaint, by Defendants GrowGeneration California Corp, GrowGeneration Corp., GrowGeneration Michigan Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Tamkin, Gregory)
January 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #8 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond. However, the motion should not have been necessary, the response should not have been necessary, and labeling the motion "frivolous" was not necessary. Plaintiff indicates that this is a refiled action, originally filed in California, and that the lawyers know each other and have frequently communicated with each other. Maybe so, but they didn't do a good job of communicating about amounts to be a minor and routine type extension of time. Please do better in the future. GrowGeneration California Corp answer due 1/20/2021; GrowGeneration Corp. answer due 1/20/2021; GrowGeneration Michigan Corp. answer due 1/20/2021. By Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 1/8/2021. Text Only Entry(rbjsec.)
January 7, 2021 Filing 10 RESPONSE to #8 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond re #1 Complaint, filed by Plaintiff SJ Enterprises Pty Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Ballard, Marcella)
January 7, 2021 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by SJ Enterprises Pty Ltd.. GrowGeneration California Corp served on 12/16/2020, answer due 1/6/2021; GrowGeneration Corp. served on 12/16/2020, answer due 1/6/2021; GrowGeneration Michigan Corp. served on 12/16/2020, answer due 1/6/2021. (Sinatra, Maria)
January 6, 2021 Filing 8 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond re #1 Complaint, by Defendants GrowGeneration California Corp, GrowGeneration Corp., GrowGeneration Michigan Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only) [PROPOSED] Order on Defendants' Motion for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleading)(Tamkin, Gregory)
December 18, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Marcella Ballard on behalf of SJ Enterprises Pty Ltd.Attorney Marcella Ballard added to party SJ Enterprises Pty Ltd.(pty:pla) (Ballard, Marcella)
December 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MINUTE ORDER: Due to the COVID-19 pandemic the Court will not hold a Scheduling Conference. The Court requests that counsel confer and attempt to agree on a schedule and submit a proposed scheduling order no later than 45 days after the answer, motion to dismiss or other response to the complaint is filed pointing out any areas of disagreement. Please email the proposed order to Jackson_Chambers@cod.uscourts.gov in Word format and efile into CM/ECF. The Court will review the proposed order and make such rulings as are appropriate. The proposed scheduling order should be prepared as described in the local rules. A copy of instructions for the preparation of a scheduling order and a form scheduling order can be downloaded from the Courts website www.cod.uscourts.gov/CourtOperations/RulesProcedures/Forms.aspx. By Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 12/15/2020. Text Only Entry (rbjsec.)
December 15, 2020 Filing 5 Report re Patent/Trademark: Report on the filing of an action emailed (NEF) to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (jtorr, )
December 15, 2020 Filing 4 SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (jtorr, )
December 15, 2020 Filing 3 Case assigned to Judge R. Brooke Jackson and drawn to Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak. Text Only Entry. (jtorr, )
December 15, 2020 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. (Sinatra, Maria)
December 15, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT AND JURY DEMAND against GrowGeneration California Corp, GrowGeneration Corp., GrowGeneration Michigan Corp. (Filing fee $ 402,Receipt Number 1082-7631235)Attorney Maria R. Sinatra added to party SJ Enterprises Pty Ltd.(pty:pla), filed by SJ Enterprises Pty Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons, #7 Civil Cover Sheet, #8 Exhibit A0 120 Form)(Sinatra, Maria)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SJ Enterprises Pty Ltd. v. GrowGeneration Corp. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GrowGeneration Corp.
Represented By: Gregory Scot Tamkin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GrowGeneration Michigan Corp.
Represented By: Gregory Scot Tamkin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GrowGeneration California Corp
Represented By: Gregory Scot Tamkin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SJ Enterprises Pty Ltd.
Represented By: Maria R. Sinatra
Represented By: Marcella Ballard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?