Estate of Shawn Billinger v. Helbig et al
Plaintiff: Estate of Shawn Billinger
Defendant: Zachary Helbig, John Fryar and City of Fort Lupton, Colorado
Case Number: 1:2020cv03720
Filed: December 21, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Kristen L Mix
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 11, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 11, 2021 Filing 11 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by David James Goldfarb on behalf of Zachary HelbigAttorney David James Goldfarb added to party Zachary Helbig(pty:dft) (Goldfarb, David)
February 10, 2021 Filing 10 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond by Defendant Zachary Helbig. (Marks, Josh)
February 8, 2021 Filing 9 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond re #1 Complaint, by Defendants City of Fort Lupton, Colorado, John Fryar. (Nelson, Jennifer)
February 8, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Jennifer Lynn Nelson on behalf of City of Fort Lupton, Colorado, John FryarAttorney Jennifer Lynn Nelson added to party City of Fort Lupton, Colorado(pty:dft), Attorney Jennifer Lynn Nelson added to party John Fryar(pty:dft) (Nelson, Jennifer)
February 8, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Eric Michael Ziporin on behalf of City of Fort Lupton, Colorado, John FryarAttorney Eric Michael Ziporin added to party City of Fort Lupton, Colorado(pty:dft), Attorney Eric Michael Ziporin added to party John Fryar(pty:dft) (Ziporin, Eric)
January 26, 2021 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Estate of Shawn Billinger. City of Fort Lupton, Colorado served on 1/22/2021, answer due 2/12/2021; John Fryar served on 1/22/2021, answer due 2/12/2021; Zachary Helbig served on 1/22/2021, answer due 2/12/2021. (Attachments: #1 Return of Service, #2 Return of Service)(Bryant, Raymond)
December 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER Setting Scheduling Conference for 3/10/2021 10:00 AM in Courtroom A 401 before Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix. Proposed Scheduling Order due 3/3/2021, by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 12/21/2020. (Attachments: #1 Continuation of Main Document, #2 Continuation of Main Document) (jgonz, )
December 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 MINUTE ORDER. Pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1(c)(4), the deadline to file the Consent/Non-Consent to United States Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction form [#3-3] is February 24, 2021. by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 12/21/2020. Text Only Entry (klmlc2, )
December 21, 2020 Filing 3 SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (trvo, )
December 21, 2020 Filing 2 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix. Text Only Entry. (trvo, )
December 21, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT and Jury Demand against City of Fort Lupton, Colorado, John Fryar, Zachary Helbig (Filing fee $ 402,Receipt Number 1082-7640184)Attorney Raymond K. Bryant added to party Estate of Shawn Billinger(pty:pla), filed by Estate of Shawn Billinger. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons)(Bryant, Raymond)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Estate of Shawn Billinger v. Helbig et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Estate of Shawn Billinger
Represented By: Raymond K. Bryant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zachary Helbig
Represented By: David James Goldfarb
Represented By: Josh Adam Marks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Fryar
Represented By: Eric Michael Ziporin
Represented By: Jennifer Lynn Nelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Fort Lupton, Colorado
Represented By: Eric Michael Ziporin
Represented By: Jennifer Lynn Nelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?