Simonet v. Samsung SDI Co., Ltd. et al
Plaintiff: Charles J. Simonet
Defendant: Samsung SDI America and Samsung SDI Co., Ltd
Case Number: 1:2020cv03724
Filed: December 21, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Michael E Hegarty
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 26, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 23 SCHEDULING ORDER by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 1/26/2021. (cthom, )
January 26, 2021 Filing 22 COURTROOM MINUTES for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty: Scheduling Conference held on 1/26/2021. FTR: A501. (cthom, )
January 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 21 Minute ORDER by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 25 January 2021. This matter comes before the Court sua sponte. Because of a conflict in the Court's calendar, the Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b) Scheduling Conference currently set for January 26, 2021, at 10:30 a.m. in Courtroom A-501, on the fifth floor of the Alfred A. Arraj United States Courthouse located at 901 19th Street, Denver, Colorado, is rescheduled to 10:45 a.m. on that same morning. (Time Change Only). (cmadr, )
January 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 20 Minute ORDER by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 20 January 2021. This matter comes before the Court sua sponte. Because of a conflict in the Court's calendar, the Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b) Scheduling Conference currently set for January 26, 2021, at 10:00 a.m. in Courtroom A-501, on the fifth floor of the Alfred A. Arraj United States Courthouse located at 901 19th Street, Denver, Colorado, is rescheduled to 10:30 a.m. on that same morning. (Time Change Only). (cmadr, )
January 19, 2021 Filing 19 Proposed Scheduling Order by Defendant Samsung SDI Co., Ltd. (Vaughn, Katherine)
January 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER OF REFERENCE. Pursuant to the consent of the parties to the jurisdiction of the magistrate judge #17 , this case is referred to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty for all purposes pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c), by Chief Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 1/06/2021. Text Only Entry (pabsec2)
January 6, 2021 Filing 17 CONSENT to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge by Plaintiff Charles J. Simonet All parties consent.. (Tasker, Thomas)
January 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 Minute ORDER by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 5 January 2021. Before the Court is the parties' consent form filed on January 5, 2021. ECF #15 . The parties failed to include an "s/" in the signature blocks of the form. Additionally, Defendant's signature block is missing a date. The parties are directed to correct these deficiencies and to refile the consent form. (cmadr, )
January 5, 2021 Filing 15 CONSENT to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge by Plaintiff Charles J. Simonet All parties consent.. (Tasker, Thomas)
December 28, 2020 Filing 14 ANSWER to #7 Amended Complaint by Samsung SDI Co., Ltd.(Knight, Scott)
December 23, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Thomas George Tasker on behalf of All Plaintiffs Attorney Thomas George Tasker added to party Charles J. Simonet(pty:pla) (Tasker, Thomas)
December 22, 2020 Filing 12 Exhibits in Support of #1 Notice of Removal, Exhibit D by Defendant Samsung SDI Co., Ltd. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit State Court Complaint, #2 Exhibit State Court Civil Procedure Order, #3 Exhibit State Court Summons (08.11.2020), #4 Exhibit Affidavit of Service upon Budz House of Vape, LLC, #5 Exhibit State Court Amended Complaint, #6 Exhibit State Court Answer from Budz House of Vape, LLC, #7 Exhibit State Court Summons (09.17.2020), #8 Exhibit Affidavit of Service upon Budz Houser of Vape, LLC, #9 Exhibit State Court Notice of Dismissal of Budz Houser of Vape, LLC, #10 Exhibit State Court Motion to Allow Second Amended Complaint, #11 Exhibit State Court Order Allowing Second Amended Complaint, #12 Exhibit State Court Summons to Samsung SDI America, Inc., #13 Exhibit Affidavit of Service of Second Amended Complaint, #14 Exhibit State Court Answer from Samsung SDI America, Inc., #15 Exhibit State Court Stipulated Motion for Dismissal of Samsung SDI America, Inc., #16 Exhibit State Court Summons to Samsung SDI, Ltd., #17 Exhibit State Court Order Granting Stipulation for Dismissing Samsung SDI America, Inc., #18 Exhibit State Court Order of Dismissal of Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd., #19 Exhibit State Court Order Setting Status Conference)(Knight, Scott)
December 22, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Scott Douglas Knight on behalf of Samsung SDI Co., LtdAttorney Scott Douglas Knight added to party Samsung SDI Co., Ltd(pty:dft) (Knight, Scott)
December 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Minute ORDER by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 22 December 2020. Consent Form due by 1/6/2021. Proposed Scheduling Order due 1/19/2021. Scheduling Conference set for 1/26/2021 10:00 AM in Courtroom A 501 before Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. (cmadr, )
December 21, 2020 Filing 9 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1, direct assignment of civil actions to full time magistrate judges. (alave, )
December 21, 2020 Filing 8 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. Text Only Entry. (alave, )
December 21, 2020 Filing 7 SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT AND JURY DEMAND against Samsung SDI America, Samsung SDI Co., Ltd, filed by Charles J. Simonet.(alave, )
December 21, 2020 Filing 6 COMPLAINT AND JURY DEMAND against Samsung SDI America, Samsung SDI Co., Ltd, filed by Charles J. Simonet.(alave, )
December 21, 2020 Filing 5 Administrative Notice: Notice to filer of non-compliance with Notice of Removal case opening procedures. It is the responsibility of the attorney or pro se party removing the case to follow Local Rule D.C.COLO.LCivR 81.1, and 28 U.S.C. 1446(a).Each of the state court documents shall be individual PDFs. See Appendix B Notice of Removal, in the User Guide - Attorney Case Opening Procedures document. (Text Only Entry) (alave, )
December 21, 2020 Filing 4 FIRST AND FINAL NOTICE TO ALL ATTORNEY(S) AND UNREPRESENTED PARTIES IN REMOVED, TRANSFERRED, OR OTHER CASES. To receive any further notice in a case removed or transferred to this court, or special matters including discovery disputes, bankruptcy appeals, or withdrawals of reference, Multi-district litigation (MDL), etc., all attorneys and unrepresented parties must enter an appearance under D.C.COLO.LAttyR 5(a). An attorney must be an active member of this court's bar and be in good standing in accordance with D.C.COLO.LAttyR 3. A waiver of the fee for bar admission may apply in limited situations. (Text Only Entry) (alave, )
December 21, 2020 Filing 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. (Vaughn, Katherine)
December 21, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Filing Notice of Removal in State Court by Defendant Samsung SDI Co., Ltd., a foreign corporation (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Vaughn, Katherine)
December 21, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Samsung SDI Co., Ltd., a foreign corporation from Jefferson County District Court, Colorado, Case Number 2020CV30933. (Filing fee $ 402, Receipt Number 1082-7640423), filed by Samsung SDI Co., Ltd., a foreign corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Civil Cover Sheet)(Vaughn, Katherine)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Simonet v. Samsung SDI Co., Ltd. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Samsung SDI America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Samsung SDI Co., Ltd
Represented By: Katherine Leigh Vaughn
Represented By: Scott Douglas Knight
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles J. Simonet
Represented By: Thomas George Tasker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?