O'Rourke et al v. Dominion Voting Systems, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Larry D Cook, Lori Cutunilli, Kesha Crenshaw, Amie Trapp, Nathaniel L Carter, Neil Yarbrough, Alvin Criswell and Kevin O'Rourke
Defendant: Facebook, Inc., Robert F Spindell, Jr., Dominion Voting Systems, Inc., Kathy Boockvar, Jocelyn Benson, Marge Bostelman, Mark E Zuckerberg, Dean Knudson, Brad Raffensperger, Gretchen Whitmer, Mark L. Thomsen, Julie M Glancey, Brian Kemp, Center for Tech and Civic Life, Priscilla Chan, Tom Wolf, Tony Evers and Ann S Jacobs
Case Number: 1:2020cv03747
Filed: December 22, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
Presiding Judge: N Reid Neureiter
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Voting
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 22, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 26 NOTICE of Plaintiffs' Withdrawal of Opposition to Facebook's Motion for Stay of Disclosures and Discovery Pending Ruling on Motions to Dismiss by Defendant Facebook, Inc. (Lipshutz, Joshua)
February 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 25 Unopposed MOTION to Stay DISCLOSURES AND DISCOVERY PENDING RULING ON MOTIONS TO DISMISS by Defendant Dominion Voting Systems, Inc.. (Garnett, Stanley)
February 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 24 MOTION to Stay Disclosures and Discovery Pending Ruling on Motion to Dismiss by Defendant Facebook, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Lipshutz, Joshua)
February 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 23 MOTION to Dismiss by Defendant Facebook, Inc.. (Lipshutz, Joshua)
February 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 22 MOTION to Dismiss PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT PURSUANT TO F.R.C.P. 12(b)(1) AND 12(b)(6) OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, TO STRIKE PURSUANT TO F.R.C.P. 23 by Defendant Dominion Voting Systems, Inc.. (Garnett, Stanley)
January 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 21 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Natalie Jean Hausknecht on behalf of Facebook, Inc.Attorney Natalie Jean Hausknecht added to party Facebook, Inc.(pty:dft) (Hausknecht, Natalie)
January 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 20 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Craig Brian Streit on behalf of Facebook, Inc.Attorney Craig Brian Streit added to party Facebook, Inc.(pty:dft) (Streit, Craig)
January 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Joshua Seth Lipshutz on behalf of Facebook, Inc.Attorney Joshua Seth Lipshutz added to party Facebook, Inc.(pty:dft) (Lipshutz, Joshua)
January 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 Minute ORDER by Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter on 25 January 2021. It is hereby ORDERED that Dominion Voting Systems, Inc.'s Unopposed Motionfor Extension of Time to File Answer or Response to Complaint (Dkt. #16 ) is GRANTED. Dominion Voting Systems, Inc. shall answer or otherwise respond toPlaintiffs' Complaint (Dkt. #1 ) on or before February 16, 2021. PLEASE READ ATTACHED MINUTE ORDER. (cmadr, )
January 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to Answer or Respond to the Complaint by Defendant Facebook, Inc.. Facebook, Inc. answer due 2/16/2021. (Bergsieker, Ryan)
January 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond re #1 Complaint,, by Defendant Dominion Voting Systems, Inc.. (Garnett, Stanley)
January 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Ryan Thomas Bergsieker on behalf of Facebook, Inc.Attorney Ryan Thomas Bergsieker added to party Facebook, Inc.(pty:dft) (Bergsieker, Ryan)
January 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Bridget C. DuPey on behalf of Dominion Voting Systems, Inc.Attorney Bridget C. DuPey added to party Dominion Voting Systems, Inc.(pty:dft) (DuPey, Bridget)
January 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by David Meschke on behalf of Dominion Voting Systems, Inc.Attorney David Meschke added to party Dominion Voting Systems, Inc.(pty:dft) (Meschke, David)
January 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Amanda Kristine Houseal on behalf of Dominion Voting Systems, Inc.Attorney Amanda Kristine Houseal added to party Dominion Voting Systems, Inc.(pty:dft) (Houseal, Amanda)
January 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Stanley L. Garnett on behalf of Dominion Voting Systems, Inc.Attorney Stanley L. Garnett added to party Dominion Voting Systems, Inc.(pty:dft) (Garnett, Stanley)
January 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ADVISORY NOTICE OF NONCOMPLIANCE WITH COURT RULES/PROCEDURES:re: #9 filed by attorney Ernest John Walker. Attorney has used an incorrect signature format in violation of D.C.COLO.LCivR 5.1(a) and 4.3(a) of the Electronic Case Filing Procedures (Civil cases). DO NOT REFILE THE DOCUMENT. In the future, the filer must affix an electronic s/signature followed by a typed, not an inked, signature to all future documents.(Text Only Entry) (cmadr, )
January 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Ernest John Walker on behalf of All Plaintiffs Attorney Ernest John Walker added to party Nathaniel L Carter(pty:pla), Attorney Ernest John Walker added to party Larry D Cook(pty:pla), Attorney Ernest John Walker added to party Kesha Crenshaw(pty:pla), Attorney Ernest John Walker added to party Alvin Criswell(pty:pla), Attorney Ernest John Walker added to party Lori Cutunilli(pty:pla), Attorney Ernest John Walker added to party Kevin O'Rourke(pty:pla), Attorney Ernest John Walker added to party Amie Trapp(pty:pla), Attorney Ernest John Walker added to party Neil Yarbrough(pty:pla) (Walker, Ernest)
December 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 SUMMONSES issued by Clerk. (cmadr, )
December 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 SUMMONS REQUEST as to DOMINION VOTING SYSTEMS INC., FACEBOOK, INC., CENTER FOR TECH AND CIVIC LIFE, MARK E. ZUCKERBERG, PRISCILLA CHAN, BRIAN KEMP, BRAD RAFFENSPERGER, GRETCHEN WHITMER, JOCELYN BENSON, TOM WOLF, KATHY BOOCKVAR, TONY EVERS, ANN S. JACOBS, MARK L. THOMSEN, MARGE BOSTELMAN, JULIE M. GLANCEY, DEAN KNUDSON, ROBERT F. SPINDELL, JR. re #1 Complaint,, by Plaintiff Kevin O'Rourke. (Attachments: #1 Summons Summonses on one PDF file)(Fielder, Gary)
December 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Administrative Notice: The Summonses submitted contain an incomplete caption and will not be issued. All parties to the action must be listed in the caption of the summons. (Text Only Entry) (cmadr, )
December 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 SUMMONS REQUEST as to DOMINION VOTING SYSTEMS INC., FACEBOOK, INC., CENTER FOR TECH AND CIVIC LIFE, MARK E. ZUCKERBERG, PRISCILLA CHAN, BRIAN KEMP, BRAD RAFFENSPERGER, GRETCHEN WHITMER, JOCELYN BENSON, TOM WOLF, KATHY BOOCKVAR, TONY EVERS, ANN S. JACOBS, MARK L. THOMSEN, MARGE BOSTELMAN, JULIE M. GLANCEY, DEAN KNUDSON, ROBERT F. SPINDELL, JR re #1 Complaint,, by Plaintiff Kevin O'Rourke. (Attachments: #1 Summons Summons in one pdf file)(Fielder, Gary)
December 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING/PLANNING CONFERENCE AND SETTING DEADLINE FOR FILING OF CONSENT/NON-CONSENT FORM by Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter on 23 December 2020. Consent Form due by 2/25/2021. Proposed Scheduling Order due 3/4/2021. Scheduling Conference set for 3/11/2021 11:00 AM in Courtroom C203 before Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter. The Scheduling Conference will be conducted via telephone. The parties are directed to call the conference line as a participant at (888) 398-2342, Access Code 5755390# at the scheduled time. (cmadr, )
December 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1, direct assignment of civil actions to full time magistrate judges. NO SUMMONS ISSUED. (trvo, )
December 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter. Text Only Entry. (trvo, )
December 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT and Jury Demand against All Plaintiffs (Filing fee $ 402,Receipt Number 1082-7642517)Attorney Gary D. Fielder added to party Kevin O'Rourke(pty:pla), filed by Kevin O'Rourke. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Ex. 1 O'Rourke Affidavit, #3 Exhibit Ex. 2 Carter Affidavit, #4 Exhibit Ex. 3 Cutunilli Affidavit, #5 Exhibit Ex. 4 Criswell Affidavit, #6 Exhibit Ex. 5 Cook Affidavit, #7 Exhibit Ex. 6 Crenshaw Affidavit, #8 Exhibit Ex. 7 Yarbrough Statement, #9 Exhibit Ex. 8 Trapp Statement, #10 Exhibit Ex. 9 ASOG Report, #11 Exhibit Ex. 10 Navarro Report, #12 Exhibit Ex. 11 Amistad Project Report)(Fielder, Gary)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: O'Rourke et al v. Dominion Voting Systems, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Facebook, Inc.
Represented By: Ryan Thomas Bergsieker
Represented By: Natalie Jean Hausknecht
Represented By: Craig Brian Streit
Represented By: Joshua Seth Lipshutz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert F Spindell, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dominion Voting Systems, Inc.
Represented By: Stanley L. Garnett
Represented By: Amanda Kristine Houseal
Represented By: David Meschke
Represented By: Bridget C. DuPey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kathy Boockvar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jocelyn Benson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marge Bostelman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark E Zuckerberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dean Knudson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brad Raffensperger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gretchen Whitmer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark L. Thomsen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Julie M Glancey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian Kemp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Center for Tech and Civic Life
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Priscilla Chan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tom Wolf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tony Evers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ann S Jacobs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Larry D Cook
Represented By: Ernest John Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lori Cutunilli
Represented By: Ernest John Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kesha Crenshaw
Represented By: Ernest John Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amie Trapp
Represented By: Ernest John Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nathaniel L Carter
Represented By: Ernest John Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Neil Yarbrough
Represented By: Ernest John Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alvin Criswell
Represented By: Ernest John Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kevin O'Rourke
Represented By: Gary D. Fielder
Represented By: Ernest John Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?