Rocky Mountain Association of Recruiters v. Moss
Plaintiff: Rocky Mountain Association of Recruiters
Defendant: Scott Moss
Case Number: 1:2020cv03819
Filed: December 29, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: William J Martinez
Referring Judge: Scott T Varholak
Nature of Suit: Constitutionality of State Statutes
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2201
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 27, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER granting Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Reply in Excess of Page Limits #25 . The Plaintiff's Motion is GRANTED for good cause shown. Plaintiff is granted leave to file its Reply in Support of its Motion for Preliminary Injunction not to exceed 13 pages, exclusive of attorney signature blocks and certificate of service. It is FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff's Reply in Support of its Motion for Preliminary Injunction #26 is ACCEPTED as filed. SO ORDERED by Judge William J. Martinez on 2/18/2021. Text Only Entry(wjmsec, )
February 16, 2021 Filing 26 REPLY to Response to #7 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Plaintiff Rocky Mountain Association of Recruiters. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Affidavit Supplemental Declaration of Mary Mathews, #3 Exhibit A to Declaration, #4 Exhibit B to Declaration, #5 Exhibit C to Declaration, #6 Exhibit D to Declaration)(Kirkpatrick, Joshua)
February 16, 2021 Filing 25 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Reply in Excess of Page Limits #23 Response to Motion by Plaintiff Rocky Mountain Association of Recruiters. (Kirkpatrick, Joshua)
February 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER: This matter is before the Court on Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction #7 . Plaintiff is ORDERED to file a reply to Defendant's Response in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction #23 on or before February 22, 2021. In addition to any other matter Plaintiff chooses to address in its reply, Plaintiff is DIRECTED to clarify whether it is seeking an evidentiary hearing for the purpose of putting on evidence in support of its Motion. SO ORDERED by Judge William J. Martinez on 2/8/2021. Text Only Entry (wjmlc2)
February 2, 2021 Filing 23 RESPONSE to #7 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Defendant Scott Moss. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Exhibit A)(Maher, Krista)
February 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER granting Defendant's Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Response in Excess of 15-Page Limit #21 . The Defendant's Motion is GRANTED for good cause shown. The Defendant is granted leave to file his Response to Plaintiffs Motion for Preliminary Injunction #7 not to exceed 20 pages, exclusive of attorney signature blocks and certificate of service. SO ORDERED by Judge William J. Martinez on 2/1/2021. Text Only Entry (wjmlc2)
February 1, 2021 Filing 21 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages in Response by Defendant Scott Moss. (Maher, Krista)
January 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER granting in part Defendant's Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiffs Motion for Preliminary Injunction #18 . Defendant's Motion is GRANTED IN PART for good cause shown. Defendant is granted leave to file his Response to Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction on or before February 2, 2021. Upon receipt of Defendant's Response, the Court will determine the necessity of a Reply from the Plaintiff and/or an evidentiary hearing or oral argument. SO ORDERED by Judge William J. Martinez on 1/26/2021. Text Only Entry(wjmsec, )
January 26, 2021 Filing 19 RESPONSE to #18 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #7 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Plaintiff Rocky Mountain Association of Recruiters. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Kirkpatrick, Joshua)
January 25, 2021 Filing 18 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #7 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Defendant Scott Moss. (Maher, Krista)
January 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER: Counsel for the parties and all counsel who may later enter an appearance shall review and familiarize themselves with the undersigned's Revised Practice Standards (as most recently revised effective December 1, 2020 and as they may be amended from time to time), which may be downloaded #here. SO ORDERED by Judge William J. Martinez on 1/ 22/2021. Text Only Entry (wjmsec, )
January 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak. Magistrate Judge Varholak, or such other Magistrate Judge who may in the future be reassigned this case, is designated to conduct NDISPO proceedings pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and Fed.R.Civ.P. 72(a) and (b). Court sponsored alternative dispute resolution is governed by D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.6. On the recommendation or informal request of the Magistrate Judge or on the request of the parties by motion, the court may direct the parties to engage in an early neutral evaluation, a settlement conference, or another alternative dispute resolution proceeding. SO ORDERED by Judge William J. Martinez on 1/22/2021. Text Only Entry (wjmsec, )
January 21, 2021 Filing 15 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by John August Lizza on behalf of Scott MossAttorney John August Lizza added to party Scott Moss(pty:dft) (Lizza, John)
January 19, 2021 Filing 14 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Rocky Mountain Association of Recruiters. (Kirkpatrick, Joshua)
January 19, 2021 Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Rocky Mountain Association of Recruiters. Scott Moss served on 12/30/2020, answer due 1/20/2021. (Kirkpatrick, Joshua)
January 19, 2021 Filing 12 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Evan P. Brennan on behalf of Scott MossAttorney Evan P. Brennan added to party Scott Moss(pty:dft) (Brennan, Evan)
January 19, 2021 Filing 11 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, for Declaratory and Injunctive Relief Attorney Krista Marie Maher added to party Scott Moss(pty:dft) by Scott Moss.(Maher, Krista)
January 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER. Before the Court is Plaintiff Rocky Mountain Association of Recruiters' Motion for Preliminary Injunction #7 . The Court DIRECTS Defendant Scott Moss to respond to the Motion for Preliminary Injunction no later than 7 calendar days after counsel has entered an appearance on his behalf. Upon receipt of the response, the Court will determine whether a reply and/or an evidentiary hearing on the Motion is necessary. SO ORDERED by Judge William J. Martinez on 1/4/2021. Text Only Entry (wjmlc1, )
January 4, 2021 Filing 9 CASE REASSIGNED pursuant to 8 . This case is randomly reassigned to Judge William J. Martinez. All future pleadings should be designated as 20-cv-03819-WJM. (Text Only Entry) (cmadr, )
January 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MINUTE ORDER In light of the filing of #7 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction, the Clerk of Court is directed to reassign this matter to a District Judge. See D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1(c)(2)(a). SO ORDERED, by Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak on 1/4/2021. Text Only Entry (stvlc2, )
December 31, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Plaintiff Rocky Mountain Association of Recruiters. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Affidavit Declaration of Mary Mathews, #5 Exhibit Ex. A to Mathews Declaration, #6 Exhibit Ex. B to Mathews Declaration, #7 Exhibit Ex. C to Mathews Declaration, #8 Exhibit Ex. D to Mathews Declaration, #9 Exhibit Ex. E to Mathews Declaration, #10 Exhibit Ex. F to Mathews Declaration, #11 Affidavit Declaration of Rebecca Bayne)(Kirkpatrick, Joshua)
December 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER SETTING DEADLINE FOR FILING ELECTION CONCERNING CONSENT/NON-CONSENT TO MAGISTRATE JURISDICTION FORM AND SETTING TELEPHONIC SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak on 30 December 2020. Consent Form due by 2/23/2021. Proposed Scheduling Order due 3/2/2021. Scheduling Conference set for 3/9/2021 10:00 AM in Courtroom A 402 before Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak. The parties shall participate in the conference by calling 888.808.6929 at the scheduled time and utilizing access code: 2805116#. (cmadr, )
December 30, 2020 Filing 5 SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (cpomm, )
December 29, 2020 Filing 4 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak. Text Only Entry (cpomm, )
December 29, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Grace LaVance McGuire on behalf of Rocky Mountain Association of RecruitersAttorney Grace LaVance McGuire added to party Rocky Mountain Association of Recruiters(pty:pla) (McGuire, Grace)
December 29, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Jennifer S. Harpole on behalf of Rocky Mountain Association of RecruitersAttorney Jennifer S. Harpole added to party Rocky Mountain Association of Recruiters(pty:pla) (Harpole, Jennifer)
December 29, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Declaratory and Injunctive Relief against Scott Moss (Filing fee $ 402,Receipt Number 1082-7650078)Attorney Joshua B. Kirkpatrick added to party Rocky Mountain Association of Recruiters(pty:pla), filed by Rocky Mountain Association of Recruiters. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Kirkpatrick, Joshua)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rocky Mountain Association of Recruiters v. Moss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott Moss
Represented By: John August Lizza
Represented By: Krista Marie Maher
Represented By: Evan P. Brennan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rocky Mountain Association of Recruiters
Represented By: Grace LaVance McGuire
Represented By: Joshua B. Kirkpatrick
Represented By: Jennifer S. Harpole
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?