Charter Communications, Inc v. Audible Magic Corporation
Petitioner: Charter Communications, Inc.
Respondent: Audible Magic Corporation
Interested Party: MarkMonitor, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2020mc00168
Filed: October 6, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: R Brooke Jackson
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 6, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 6, 2020 Filing 20 Case assigned to Judge R. Brooke Jackson. Text Only Entry. (jsalz, )
October 6, 2020 Filing 19 FIRST AND FINAL NOTICE TO ALL ATTORNEY(S) AND UNREPRESENTED PARTIES IN REMOVED, TRANSFERRED, OR OTHER CASES. To receive any further notice in a case removed or transferred to this court, or special matters including discovery disputes, bankruptcy appeals, or withdrawals of reference, Multi-district litigation (MDL), etc., all attorneys and unrepresented parties must enter an appearance under D.C.COLO.LAttyR 5(a). An attorney must be an active member of this court's bar and be in good standing in accordance with D.C.COLO.LAttyR 3. A waiver of the fee for bar admission may apply in limited situations. (Text Only Entry) (jsalz, )
October 6, 2020 Filing 18 Case transferred in from District of California Northern; Case Number 5:20-mc-80160. File, transfer order and docket sheet received
October 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting #3 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal. Signed by Judge Susan van Keulen on 10/2/2020. (svklc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/2/2020) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/6/2020.]
October 2, 2020 Filing 16 Declaration of Andrew Castricone in Support of #3 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed byMarkMonitor, Inc.. (Related document(s) #3 ) (Castricone, Andrew) (Filed on 10/2/2020) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/6/2020.]
September 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER RELATED TO THE JOINT STIPULATED MOTION TO TRANSFER AND RELATED BRIEFING SCHEDULE by Judge Susan van Keulen granting #14 Stipulation to Transfer the Motion to Compel to the District of Colorado.Response due by 10-16-20.Reply due by 10-30-20. (jhfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/29/2020) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/6/2020.]
September 28, 2020 Filing 14 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Joint Stipulated Motion to Transfer and Related Briefing Schedule filed by Charter Communications, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Padmanabhan, Krishnan) (Filed on 9/28/2020) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/6/2020.]
September 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #12 Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Joshua M. Rychlinski. Signed by Judge Susan van Keulen on 9/28/2020. (svklc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/28/2020) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/6/2020.]
September 25, 2020 Filing 12 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice for Joshua Rychlinski ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-14989828.) filed by Audible Magic Corporation. (Rychlinski, Joshua) (Filed on 9/25/2020) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/6/2020.]
September 25, 2020 Filing 11 Declaration of Gabriel Ramsey in Support of #3 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULES 79-5(e)(1) filed byAudible Magic Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Related document(s) #3 ) (Ramsey, Gabriel) (Filed on 9/25/2020) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/6/2020.]
September 25, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Kayvan Ghaffari (Ghaffari, Kayvan) (Filed on 9/25/2020) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/6/2020.]
September 25, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Gabriel M. Ramsey (Ramsey, Gabriel) (Filed on 9/25/2020) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/6/2020.]
September 24, 2020 Filing 8 Declaration of Jennifer A. Golinveaux in Support of #1 Notice (Other), refiled per Court Order, Dkt. 7, filed byCharter Communications, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits 1-35 to Golinveaux Decl ISO Motion to Compel (replaces Dkt 2))(Related document(s) #1 ) (Golinveaux, Jennifer) (Filed on 9/24/2020) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/6/2020.]
September 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER RE FILING, SERVICE, AND BRIEFING SCHEDULE ON #1 MOTION TO COMPEL COMPLIANCE WITH SUBPOENA. Signed by Judge Susan van Keulen on 9/24/2020. (svklc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/24/2020) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/6/2020.]
September 21, 2020 Filing 6 Declaration of KRISHNAN PADMANABHAN IN SUPPORT OF CHARTER'S ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO FILE UNDER SEAL CERTAIN DOCUMENTS IN CONNECTION WITH CHARTER'S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO COMPEL COMPLIANCE WITH SUBPOENA DUCES TECUM #3 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Charter Communications, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits 1 - 4, #2 Exhibits 5 - 8)(Related document(s) #3 ) (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/21/2020) Modified on 9/23/2020 (bwS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 10/6/2020.]
September 21, 2020 Filing 5 [Proposed Order] Granting Movants' Motion to Compel Compliance with Subpoena Duces Tec1um re #1 by Charter Communications, Inc.(bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/21/2020) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/6/2020.]
September 21, 2020 Filing 4 [Proposed Order] Granting Movants Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Certain Documents in Connection with Charter's Notice of Motion and Motion to Compel Compliance with Subpoena Duces Tecum re #3 (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/21/2020) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/6/2020.]
September 21, 2020 Filing 3 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Certain Documents in Connection with Charters' Notice of Motion and Motion to Compel Compliance with Subpoena Duces Tecum filed by Charter Communications, Inc.. (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/21/2020) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/6/2020.]
September 21, 2020 Filing 2 Declaration of Jennifer a Golinveaux in Suuport of Charter Communications, Inc's Motion to Compel Compliance with Subpoena Duces Tecum in Support of #1 filed by Charter Communications, Inc.. (Related document(s) #1 ) (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/21/2020) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/23/2020: #1 Exhibitrs 1 - 19, #2 Exhibits 20 - 24, #3 Exhibits 24 - 35) (bwS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 10/6/2020.]
September 21, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE of Motion and Motion to Compel Compliance with subpoena Duces Tecum by Charter Communications, Inc. (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/21/2020) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/23/2020: #1 Filing Fee of $47,00 paid, Receipt # 54611018514)) (bwS, COURT STAFF). Modified on 9/23/2020 (bwS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 10/6/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Charter Communications, Inc v. Audible Magic Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Charter Communications, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Audible Magic Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: MarkMonitor, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?