BE Labs, Inc. v. Ubee Interactive Inc.
Plaintiff: BE Labs, Inc.
Defendant: Ubee Interactive Inc.
Case Number: 1:2021cv00238
Filed: January 25, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Kristen L Mix
Referring Judge: Raymond P Moore
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35 U.S.C. ยง 271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 19, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 19, 2021 Filing 22 MEMORANDUM regarding #21 Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond re #1 Complaint, filed by Ubee Interactive Inc. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix. By Judge Raymond P. Moore on 3/19/2021. (Text Only Entry) (rmsec )
March 19, 2021 Filing 21 Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond re #1 Complaint, by Defendant Ubee Interactive Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only) Proposed Order)(Wilcox, Jason)
March 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 20 MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 3/19/21 granting #18 Motion to Continue. Proposed Scheduling Order due by 5/20/2021. Scheduling Conference reset for 5/27/2021 09:30 AM in Courtroom A 401 before Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix.(nmarb, )
March 17, 2021 Filing 19 MEMORANDUM regarding #18 Unopposed MOTION to Continue Scheduling/Planning Conference filed by BE Labs, Inc. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix. By Judge Raymond P. Moore on 3/17/2021. (Text Only Entry) (rmsec )
March 17, 2021 Filing 18 Unopposed MOTION to Continue Scheduling/Planning Conference by Plaintiff BE Labs, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Rabicoff, Isaac)
February 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 2/25/21 GRANTING #15 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond. Ubee Interactive Inc. answer due 3/26/2021.(nmarb, )
February 22, 2021 Filing 16 MEMORANDUM regarding #15 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond re #1 Complaint, filed by Ubee Interactive Inc. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix. By Judge Raymond P. Moore on 2/22/2021. (Text Only Entry) (rmsec )
February 22, 2021 Filing 15 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond re #1 Complaint, by Defendant Ubee Interactive Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Wilcox, Jason)
February 22, 2021 Filing 14 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent Ubee Interactive Holding Corp. for Ubee Interactive Inc.. (Wilcox, Jason)
February 22, 2021 Filing 13 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Jason Michael Wilcox on behalf of Ubee Interactive Inc.Attorney Jason Michael Wilcox added to party Ubee Interactive Inc.(pty:dft) (Wilcox, Jason)
February 10, 2021 Filing 12 CONSENT to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge by Plaintiff BE Labs, Inc. All parties do not consent.. (Rabicoff, Isaac)
January 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 1/26/21 Setting Scheduling/Planning Conference. Proposed Scheduling Order due by 3/22/2021. Scheduling/Planning Conference set for 3/29/2021 09:30 AM in Courtroom A 401 before Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix. (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1, #2 Attachment 2, #3 Attachment 3) (nmarb, )
January 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MINUTE ORDER: With the assignment of this matter, the parties are advised that throughout this case they are expected to be familiar and comply with not only the Local Rules of this District, but also Judge Raymond P. Moore's Civil Practice Standards, which may be found at: http://www.cod.uscourts.gov/JudicialOfficers/ActiveArticleIIIJudges/HonRaymondPMoore.aspx. SO ORDERED by Judge Raymond P. Moore on 1/26/2021. (Text Only Entry) (rmsec )
January 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 72(a) and (b), this case is referred to the assigned United States Magistrate Judge to (1) convene a scheduling conference under Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b) and enter a scheduling order meeting the requirements of D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.2, (2) conduct such status conferences and issue such orders necessary for compliance with the scheduling order, including amendments or modifications of the scheduling order upon a showing of good cause, (3) hear and determine pretrial matters, including discovery and other non-dispositive motions, (4) conduct a pretrial conference and enter a pretrial order, and (5) conduct hearings, including evidentiary hearings, and submit proposed findings of fact and recommendations for rulings on dispositive motions. Court sponsored alternative dispute resolution is governed by D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.6. On the recommendation or informal request of the magistrate judge or on the request of the parties by motion, this court may direct the parties to engage in an early neutral evaluation, a settlement conference, or another alternative dispute resolution proceeding. By Judge Raymond P. Moore on 1/26/2021. (Text Only Entry) (rmsec )
January 26, 2021 Filing 8 ADVISORY NOTICE OF NONCOMPLIANCE WITH COURT RULES/PROCEDURES:re: #2 Notice of Entry of Appearance, #3 Corporate Disclosure Statement, #1 Complaint, filed by attorney Isaac Rabicoff. DO NOT REFILE THE DOCUMENT. Action to take - counsel must submit a change of contact request through the Attorney Services Portal Account pursuant to D.C.COLO.LAttyR 5(c) and 3.5 of the Electronic Case Filing Procedures (Civil cases).(Text Only Entry) (jtorr, )
January 26, 2021 Filing 7 Report re Patent/Trademark: Report on the filing of an action emailed (NEF) to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (jtorr, )
January 26, 2021 Filing 6 SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (jtorr, )
January 25, 2021 Filing 5 Case assigned to Judge Raymond P. Moore and drawn to Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix. Text Only Entry. (jtorr, )
January 25, 2021 Filing 4 SUMMONS REQUEST as to Ubee Interactive Inc. by Plaintiff BE Labs, Inc.. (Rabicoff, Isaac)
January 25, 2021 Filing 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. (Rabicoff, Isaac)
January 25, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Isaac Philip Rabicoff on behalf of BE Labs, Inc. (Rabicoff, Isaac)
January 25, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR PATENT INFRINGEMENT against Ubee Interactive Inc. (Filing fee $ 402,Receipt Number 1082-7686221)Attorney Isaac Philip Rabicoff added to party BE Labs, Inc.(pty:pla), filed by BE Labs, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(Rabicoff, Isaac)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BE Labs, Inc. v. Ubee Interactive Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BE Labs, Inc.
Represented By: Isaac Philip Rabicoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ubee Interactive Inc.
Represented By: Jason Michael Wilcox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?