White v. General Motors LLC
Plaintiff: Roy White
Defendant: GENERAL MOTORS LLC
Case Number: 1:2021cv00410
Filed: February 10, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Michael E Hegarty
Nature of Suit: Contract Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 31, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 31, 2021 Filing 15 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Tyner D. Helms on behalf of Roy WhiteAttorney Tyner D. Helms added to party Roy White(pty:pla) (Helms, Tyner)
March 30, 2021 Filing 14 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Kathleen Taylor Sooy on behalf of General Motors LLCAttorney Kathleen Taylor Sooy added to party General Motors LLC(pty:dft) (Sooy, Kathleen)
March 30, 2021 Filing 13 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by April Nelson Ross on behalf of General Motors LLCAttorney April Nelson Ross added to party General Motors LLC(pty:dft) (Ross, April)
March 30, 2021 Filing 12 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Rachel Paige Raphael on behalf of General Motors LLCAttorney Rachel Paige Raphael added to party General Motors LLC(pty:dft) (Raphael, Rachel)
March 29, 2021 Filing 11 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Michael John Gallagher on behalf of General Motors LLCAttorney Michael John Gallagher added to party General Motors LLC(pty:dft) (Gallagher, Michael)
March 29, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Andrew P. Garnett on behalf of General Motors LLCAttorney Andrew P. Garnett added to party General Motors LLC(pty:dft) (Garnett, Andrew)
March 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Minute ORDER by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 22 March 2021. Due to a conflict in the Court's calendar, the Scheduling Conference currently set for April 19, 2021 is rescheduled to April 28, 2021, at 11:00 a.m. in Courtroom A-501, on the fifth floor of the Alfred A. Arraj United States Courthouse located at 901 19th Street, Denver, Colorado. The parties shall complete and file the Magistrate Judge Consent Form (ECF 3-1) on or before April 15, 2021. (cmadr, )
February 26, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Wilson D. Miles, III on behalf of Roy WhiteAttorney Wilson D. Miles, III added to party Roy White(pty:pla) (Miles, Wilson)
February 25, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by H. Clay Barnett, III on behalf of Roy WhiteAttorney H. Clay Barnett, III added to party Roy White(pty:pla) (Barnett, H.)
February 25, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by James Mitchell Williams on behalf of Roy WhiteAttorney James Mitchell Williams added to party Roy White(pty:pla) (Williams, James)
February 16, 2021 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Roy White. General Motors LLC waiver sent on 2/12/2021, answer due 4/13/2021. (Levitt, Adam)
February 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Minute ORDER by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 11 February 2021. Consent Form due by 3/30/2021. Proposed Scheduling Order due 4/12/2021. Scheduling Conference set for 4/19/2021 11:00 AM in Courtroom A 501 before Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. (cmadr, )
February 11, 2021 Filing 3 SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (cpomm, )
February 10, 2021 Filing 2 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. Text Only Entry (cpomm, )
February 10, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against GENERAL MOTORS LLC (Filing fee $ 402,Receipt Number 1082-7712540)Attorney Adam Jay Levitt added to party Roy White(pty:pla), filed by Roy White. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Levitt, Adam)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: White v. General Motors LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GENERAL MOTORS LLC
Represented By: Michael John Gallagher
Represented By: Rachel Paige Raphael
Represented By: April Nelson Ross
Represented By: Kathleen Taylor Sooy
Represented By: Andrew P. Garnett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roy White
Represented By: Adam Jay Levitt
Represented By: James Mitchell Williams
Represented By: Tyner D. Helms
Represented By: Wilson D. Miles, III
Represented By: H. Clay Barnett, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?