Handy v. Knight et al
Plaintiff: Wyatt T. Handy, Jr.
Defendant: O'Brien, Mike Mead and Knight
Case Number: 1:2021cv00462
Filed: February 16, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Lewis T Babcock
Referring Judge: Gordon P Gallagher
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 12, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 12, 2021 Filing 8 RECOMMENDATION OF UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE that the Complaint, ECF No.1, and the action be dismissed without prejudice pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(e)(2)(B) and Heck v. Humphrey, 512 U.S. 477 (1994), by Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 4/12/2021. (evana, )
April 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER OF REFERENCE TO UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE This action is under review pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 8.1. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b), Fed. R. Civ. P. 72, and D.C.COLO.LCivR 72.1, United States Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher is designated to conduct proceedings in this civil action, by Judge Lewis T. Babcock on 2/8/2021. (evana, )
March 31, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE of Change of Address/Contact Information by Plaintiff Wyatt T. Handy, Jr (evana, )
March 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 MINUTE ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 8.1, the Clerk of Court is directed to assign this matter to Senior Judge Lewis T. Babcock. The undersigned will remain as the assigned magistrate judge, by Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 3/30/2021. (evana, )
February 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER that the Application to Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs (Long Form), ECF No. #3 , is GRANTED, by Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 2/17/2021.(evana, )
February 16, 2021 Filing 3 Application to Proceed in District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs. by Plaintiff Wyatt T. Handy, Jr. (cpomm, )
February 16, 2021 Filing 2 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher. Text Only Entry (cpomm, )
February 16, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Knight, Mike Mead, O'Brien, filed by Wyatt T. Handy, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(cpomm, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Handy v. Knight et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: O'Brien
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mike Mead
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Knight
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wyatt T. Handy, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?