Gwilt et al v. Harvard Square Retirement & Assisted Living et al
Plaintiff: Jacqueline Gwilt
Defendant: Watermark Retirement Communities and Harvard Square Retirement & Assisted Living
Case Number: 1:2021cv00472
Filed: February 17, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Philip A Brimmer
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1446 ws
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 30, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER by Chief Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 3/23/2021 re: #20 Motion for Leave to Appear Telephonically is denied as moot. Text Only Entry(pabsec2)
March 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 22 MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang on 3/23/21. This matter is before the Court sua sponte. After consultation with the Chief Judge's Chambers, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Scheduling Conference set for March 30, 2021, at 9:30 a.m. is VACATED, as is the March 23, 2021 deadline to file a proposed Scheduling Order. The Scheduling Conference will be reset at an appropriate time after an Order Referring Case is entered. (nmarb, ) .
March 23, 2021 Filing 21 REPLY to Response to #12 MOTION to Dismiss Verified Complaint and Jury Demand filed by Defendants Harvard Square Retirement & Assisted Living, Watermark Retirement Communities. (Moran, Elizabeth)
March 22, 2021 Filing 20 MOTION for Leave to Appear Telephonically #14 Order, by Plaintiff Jacqueline Gwilt. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Nesbitt, Arron)
March 15, 2021 Filing 19 CASE REASSIGNED pursuant to #17 Consent to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge. All parties do not consent. This case is randomly reassigned to Chief Judge Philip A. Brimmer. All future pleadings should be designated as 21-cv-00472-PAB. (Text Only Entry) (nmarb, )
March 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 3/15/21 re: #17 Consent to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge filed by Jacqueline Gwilt. At least one party in this civil action does not consent to have a United States Magistrate Judge conduct all proceedings. Accordingly, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that this case shall be assigned to a District Judge under D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1(c)(8) and D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1(a). (nmarb, )
March 10, 2021 Filing 17 CONSENT to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge by Plaintiff Jacqueline Gwilt All parties do not consent.. (Nesbitt, Arron)
March 9, 2021 Filing 16 RESPONSE to #12 MOTION to Dismiss Verified Complaint and Jury Demand filed by Plaintiff Jacqueline Gwilt. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Nesbitt, Arron)
March 9, 2021 Filing 15 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance and Substitution of Counsel by Nicole Kim Griffard on behalf of All Plaintiffs Attorney Nicole Kim Griffard added to party Jacqueline Gwilt(pty:pla) (Griffard, Nicole)
February 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 2/25/21 Setting Scheduling/Planning Conference. Proposed Scheduling Order due by 3/23/2021. Scheduling/Planning Conference set for 3/30/2021 09:30 AM in Courtroom A 401 before Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix. (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1, #2 Attachment 2) (nmarb, )
February 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 MINUTE ORDER. Pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1(c)(4), the deadline to file the Consent/Non-Consent to United States Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction form [#7] is March 16, 2021. by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 2/25/2021. Text Only Entry (klmlc2, )
February 24, 2021 Filing 12 MOTION to Dismiss Verified Complaint and Jury Demand by Defendants Harvard Square Retirement & Assisted Living, Watermark Retirement Communities. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B)(Moran, Elizabeth)
February 22, 2021 Filing 11 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Miah Marie Brouhard on behalf of All Plaintiffs Attorney Miah Marie Brouhard added to party Jacqueline Gwilt(pty:pla) (Brouhard, Miah)
February 22, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Arron Burt Nesbitt on behalf of All Plaintiffs Attorney Arron Burt Nesbitt added to party Jacqueline Gwilt(pty:pla) (Nesbitt, Arron)
February 18, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Rodrigo Lugo on behalf of All Defendants Attorney Rodrigo Lugo added to party Harvard Square Retirement & Assisted Living(pty:dft), Attorney Rodrigo Lugo added to party Watermark Retirement Communities(pty:dft) (Lugo, Rodrigo)
February 18, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Elizabeth C. Moran on behalf of All Defendants Attorney Elizabeth C. Moran added to party Harvard Square Retirement & Assisted Living(pty:dft), Attorney Elizabeth C. Moran added to party Watermark Retirement Communities(pty:dft) (Moran, Elizabeth)
February 17, 2021 Filing 7 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1, direct assignment of civil actions to full time magistrate judges. (alave, )
February 17, 2021 Filing 6 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix. Text Only Entry. (alave, )
February 17, 2021 Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT/RETURN of Service of Civil Summons and Verified Complaint and Jury Demand upon Watermark Retirement Communities on 01/27/2021. (alave, )
February 17, 2021 Filing 4 AFFIDAVIT/RETURN of Service of Civil Summons and Verified Complaint and Jury Demand upon Harvard Square Retirement & Assisted Living on 01/27/2021. (alave, )
February 17, 2021 Filing 3 VERIFIED COMPLAINT AND JURY DEMAND against Harvard Square Retirement & Assisted Living, Watermark Retirement Communities, filed by Jacqueline Gwilt.(alave, )
February 17, 2021 Filing 2 FIRST AND FINAL NOTICE TO ALL ATTORNEY(S) AND UNREPRESENTED PARTIES IN REMOVED, TRANSFERRED, OR OTHER CASES. To receive any further notice in a case removed or transferred to this court, or special matters including discovery disputes, bankruptcy appeals, or withdrawals of reference, Multi-district litigation (MDL), etc., all attorneys and unrepresented parties must enter an appearance under D.C.COLO.LAttyR 5(a). An attorney must be an active member of this court's bar and be in good standing in accordance with D.C.COLO.LAttyR 3. A waiver of the fee for bar admission may apply in limited situations. (Text Only Entry) (alave, )
February 17, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Watermark Retirement Communities, Harvard Square Retirement & Assisted Living from Denver District Court, Case Number 2021CV30261. (Filing fee $ 402, Receipt Number 1082-7722304), filed by Watermark Retirement Communities, Harvard Square Retirement & Assisted Living. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Ex A Not of Removal-Watermark HS AL, #3 Exhibit Ex. B Not of Removal-Watermark Aqua Operator, #4 Exhibit Ex. C Not of Removal-Aqua Operations NT-HCI LLC, #5 Exhibit Ex. D Not of Removal-Watermark Aqua Investments LLC, #6 Exhibit Ex. E Not of Removal-TRS-NT-HCI LLC, #7 Exhibit Ex. F Not of Removal-Northstar Healthcare Income Operating Ptp, #8 Exhibit Ex. G Not of Removal-Northstar Healthcare Income Inc, #9 Exhibit Ex. H Not of Removal-Watermark Aqua Holdings LLC, #10 Exhibit Ex. I Not of Removal-TGF Holdings X LLC, #11 Exhibit Ex. J Not of Removal-Watermark Retirement Comm LLC, #12 Exhibit Ex. K Not of Removal-Watermark Inv Mgr LLC, #13 Exhibit Ex. L Not of Removal-Keppel Capital Senior Living LLC, #14 Exhibit Ex. M Not of Removal-Keppel Capital US Holding Inc, #15 State Court Verified Complaint, #16 State Court Civil Cover Sheet, #17 State Court Summons - Harvard, #18 State Court Summons - Watermark, #19 State Court Aff of Service - Harvard, #20 State Court Aff of Service - Watermark, #21 State Court Delay Reduction Order, #22 State Court Order re Discovery Protocol, #23 State Court Pretrial Order)(O'Brien Crum, Catherine)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gwilt et al v. Harvard Square Retirement & Assisted Living et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jacqueline Gwilt
Represented By: Nicole Kim Griffard
Represented By: Arron Burt Nesbitt
Represented By: Miah Marie Brouhard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Watermark Retirement Communities
Represented By: Catherine O'Brien Crum
Represented By: Elizabeth C. Moran
Represented By: Rodrigo Lugo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Harvard Square Retirement & Assisted Living
Represented By: Catherine O'Brien Crum
Represented By: Elizabeth C. Moran
Represented By: Rodrigo Lugo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?