Iconic Medical Group LLC v. Lonahte Holdings LLC et al
Plaintiff: Iconic Medical Group LLC
Defendant: Ring-Neck Energy & Feed LLC, Walt Wendland, Lonahte Holdings LLC, Christopher Bentley and Zachary Stephens
Case Number: 1:2021cv00474
Filed: February 18, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Kristen L Mix
Nature of Suit: Contract Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 30, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 16, 2021 Filing 54 RESPONSE to #41 MOTION to Remand to State Court and Response and Objection to Notice of Removal filed by Defendant Christopher Bentley. (Brown, Lindsey)
April 15, 2021 Filing 53 RESPONSE to #41 MOTION to Remand to State Court and Response and Objection to Notice of Removal filed by Defendant Walt Wendland. (Quinn, Thomas)
April 14, 2021 Filing 52 RESPONSE to #41 MOTION to Remand to State Court and Response and Objection to Notice of Removal filed by Defendant Ring-Neck Energy & Feed LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - FDA March 20 2020 Guidance, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B - FDA March 27 2020 Guidance, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C - FDA April 15 Guidance, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D - FDA June 1 Guidance, #5 Exhibit Exhibit E - Removal Emails, #6 Exhibit Exhibit F - Fed Q to Plaintiff Emails, #7 Exhibit Exhibit G - Declaration of Julie Ehret, #8 Exhibit Exhibit H - Def. Wendland's Counsel's Req. to Plaintiff, #9 Exhibit Exhibit I - Plaintiff's Counsel's Response re Declaration, #10 Exhibit Exhibit J - Notice re Plaintiff's Motion to Remand)(Taravella, James)
April 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 51 MINUTE ORDER granting #48 Unopposed Motion for the Extension of Time to File Response to Plaintiffs Motion to Remand and Response and Objection to Notice of Removal ; granting #49 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to Plaintiffs Motion to Remand and Response and Objection to Notice of Removal. The deadline for Defendants Ring-Neck Energy & Feed, LLC and Christopher Bentley to file Responses to Plaintiffs Motion to Remand and Response and Objection to Notice of Removal #41 is extended to April 16, 2021, by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 4/13/2021.(jgonz, )
April 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 50 MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 4/9/21 denying AS MOOT #38 Motion to Dismiss; denying AS MOOT #39 Motion to Dismiss; denying AS MOOT #44 Motion to Dismiss; denying AS MOOT #37 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction.(nmarb, )
April 9, 2021 Filing 49 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #41 MOTION to Remand to State Court and Response and Objection to Notice of Removal by Defendant Christopher Bentley. (Brown, Lindsey)
April 9, 2021 Filing 48 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #41 MOTION to Remand to State Court and Response and Objection to Notice of Removal by Defendant Ring-Neck Energy & Feed LLC. (Taravella, Christopher)
April 8, 2021 Filing 47 NOTICE of Filing Amended Pleading First Amended Complaint by Plaintiff Iconic Medical Group LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Redline)(Ehret, Julie)
April 8, 2021 Filing 46 AMENDED COMPLAINT and Jury Demand against All Defendants, filed by Iconic Medical Group LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - 20200429 Email regarding samples, #2 Exhibit 2 - 20200430 FedEx Delivery Confirmation, #3 Exhibit 3 - 20200607 Email regarding Iconic plant visit, #4 Exhibit 4 - Ethanol Acetal Memo, #5 Exhibit 5 - FDA Response Email)(Ehret, Julie)
April 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 45 MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 4/5/21 granting #40 Motion for Leave; denying #42 Motion for Leave; granting #33 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Motions #37 and #39 are accepted. (nmarb, )
March 26, 2021 Filing 44 MOTION to Dismiss of Lindsey Brown by Defendant Christopher Bentley. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit)(Brown, Lindsey)
March 25, 2021 Filing 43 NOTICE re #41 MOTION to Remand to State Court and Response and Objection to Notice of Removal by Plaintiff Iconic Medical Group LLC (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Ehret, Julie)
March 24, 2021 Filing 42 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to Exceed Page Limits in Response to Motion to Remand by Defendant Ring-Neck Energy & Feed LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Order)(Taravella, James)
March 19, 2021 Filing 41 MOTION to Remand to State Court and Response and Objection to Notice of Removal by Plaintiff Iconic Medical Group LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Julie J. Ehret Declaration, #2 Proposed Order (PDF Only) Order Remanding Case to State Court)(Ehret, Julie)
March 18, 2021 Filing 40 MOTION for Leave to Exceed Page Limits #39 MOTION to Dismiss and Jury Demand Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 12(b)(2) and 12(b)(6) by Defendant Ring-Neck Energy & Feed LLC. (Taravella, Christopher)
March 18, 2021 Filing 39 MOTION to Dismiss and Jury Demand Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 12(b)(2) and 12(b)(6) by Defendant Ring-Neck Energy & Feed LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Declaration of Danci Baker, #2 Exhibit B - Sales Order, #3 Exhibit C - Purchase Agreement, #4 Exhibit D - Order)(Taravella, Christopher)
March 18, 2021 Filing 38 MOTION to Dismiss by Defendant Walt Wendland. (Attachments: #1 Continuation of Main Document Defendant Wendland's Memo of Law and Brief in Support of His Motion to Dismiss, #2 Exhibit 1-Affidavit of Walt Wendland, #3 Exhibit 2-Contract, #4 Proposed Order (PDF Only) to DefendantWalt Wendland's Motion to Dismiss)(Quinn, Thomas)
March 18, 2021 Filing 37 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Defendants Lonahte Holdings LLC, Zachary Stephens. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Armentrout, Hannah)
March 18, 2021 Filing 36 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Hannah E. Armentrout on behalf of Lonahte Holdings LLC, Zachary StephensAttorney Hannah E. Armentrout added to party Lonahte Holdings LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Hannah E. Armentrout added to party Zachary Stephens(pty:dft) (Armentrout, Hannah)
March 18, 2021 Filing 35 ADVISORY NOTICE TO ATTORNEY AND COURT: Under D.C.COLO.LAttyR 3(a), Alexander Christian Clayden, Lucas Franklin Van Arsdale, Jessica Jodene Smith, and Christopher James Heaphey were administratively removed from the court's attorney roll and barred from filing electronically under CM/ECF for failing to pay the 2020 Biennial Fee. Each attorney must must complete a Bar/ECF application through counsels' existing Attorney Services Portal account and pay the full application fee to be restored to the attorney roll and CM/ECF. Upon reinstatement, counsel must file a Notice of Entry of Appearance in this case. (Text Only Entry) (mfred)
March 18, 2021 Filing 34 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Allison Jean Becker on behalf of Walt WendlandAttorney Allison Jean Becker added to party Walt Wendland(pty:dft) (Becker, Allison)
March 17, 2021 Filing 33 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by Defendants Lonahte Holdings LLC, Zachary Stephens. (Smith, Jessica)
March 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 32 MINUTE ORDER granting #31 Motion for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleading. Walt Wendland answer due 3/15/2021, by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 3/15/2021.(jgonz, )
March 11, 2021 Filing 31 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond by Defendant Walt Wendland. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only) to Motion for Extension ot Time to File Responsive Pleading)(Quinn, Thomas)
March 11, 2021 Filing 30 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Thomas Baker Quinn on behalf of Walt WendlandAttorney Thomas Baker Quinn added to party Walt Wendland(pty:dft) (Quinn, Thomas)
March 4, 2021 Filing 29 Exhibits in Support of #4 Complaint Exhibits 1 - 3 by Defendants Lonahte Holdings LLC, Zachary Stephens. (Smith, Jessica)
March 4, 2021 Filing 28 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Iconic Medical Group LLC. Walt Wendland served on 1/21/2021, answer due 2/11/2021. (Ehret, Julie)
March 4, 2021 Filing 27 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Iconic Medical Group LLC. Ring-Neck Energy & Feed LLC served on 1/21/2021, answer due 3/18/2021. (Ehret, Julie)
March 4, 2021 Filing 26 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Iconic Medical Group LLC. Christopher Bentley served on 1/27/2021, answer due 3/26/2021. (Ehret, Julie)
March 4, 2021 Filing 25 NOTICE Register of Actions by Defendants Lonahte Holdings LLC, Zachary Stephens (Smith, Jessica)
March 1, 2021 Filing 24 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance of Lindsey Brown by Lindsey Jill Brown on behalf of Christopher Bentley (Brown, Lindsey)
March 1, 2021 Filing 23 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance of Amanda Milgrom by Lindsey Jill Brown on behalf of Christopher BentleyAttorney Lindsey Jill Brown added to party Christopher Bentley(pty:dft) (Brown, Lindsey)
February 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 2/25/21 Setting Scheduling/Planning Conference. Proposed Scheduling Order due by 5/13/2021. Scheduling/Planning Conference set for 5/20/2021 10:00 AM in Courtroom A 401 before Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix. (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1, #2 Attachment 2) (nmarb, )
February 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 21 MINUTE ORDER. Pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1(c)(4), the deadline to file the Consent/Non-Consent to United States Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction form [#5] is May 6, 2021. by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 2/25/2021. Text Only Entry (klmlc2, )
February 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 20 MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 2/25/21 GRANTING #19 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond. Christopher Bentley answer due 3/26/2021. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of Court shall update Defendant Christopher Bentley's contact information, as provided on page 2 of the Motion [#19].(nmarb, )
February 25, 2021 Filing 18 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to Answer or Respond to the Complaint and Jury Demand by Defendant Ring-Neck Energy & Feed LLC. Ring-Neck Energy & Feed LLC answer due 3/18/2021. (Taravella, Christopher)
February 24, 2021 Filing 19 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond re #4 Complaint, by Defendant Christopher Bentley. (nmarb, )
February 24, 2021 Filing 17 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Iconic Medical Group LLC. Zachary Stephens served on 1/19/2021, answer due 3/18/2021. (Ehret, Julie)
February 24, 2021 Filing 16 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Iconic Medical Group LLC. Lonahte Holdings LLC served on 1/22/2021, answer due 3/18/2021. (Ehret, Julie)
February 24, 2021 Filing 15 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. (Ehret, Julie)
February 24, 2021 Filing 14 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Julie J. Ehret on behalf of Iconic Medical Group LLCAttorney Julie J. Ehret added to party Iconic Medical Group LLC(pty:pla) (Ehret, Julie)
February 23, 2021 Filing 13 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by James Cullen Taravella on behalf of Ring-Neck Energy & Feed LLCAttorney James Cullen Taravella added to party Ring-Neck Energy & Feed LLC(pty:dft) (Taravella, James)
February 23, 2021 Filing 12 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Christopher Anthony Taravella on behalf of Ring-Neck Energy & Feed LLCAttorney Christopher Anthony Taravella added to party Ring-Neck Energy & Feed LLC(pty:dft) (Taravella, Christopher)
February 23, 2021 Filing 11 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Alexander Christian Clayden on behalf of Iconic Medical Group LLCAttorney Alexander Christian Clayden added to party Iconic Medical Group LLC(pty:pla) (Clayden, Alexander)
February 23, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Lucas Franklin Van Arsdale on behalf of Iconic Medical Group LLCAttorney Lucas Franklin Van Arsdale added to party Iconic Medical Group LLC(pty:pla) (Van Arsdale, Lucas)
February 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 2/19/21 DENYING AS MOOT #8 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond. D.C.COLO.LCivR 6.1(a) (the Local Rule) provides automatically for the relief requested, extending these Defendants obligation to answer or otherwise respond to the complaint to March 18, 2021, without the necessity of any Court order. (nmarb, )
February 18, 2021 Filing 8 Stipulated MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond re #4 Complaint by Defendants Lonahte Holdings LLC, Zachary Stephens. (Smith, Jessica)
February 18, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Christopher James Heaphey on behalf of Lonahte Holdings LLC, Zachary StephensAttorney Christopher James Heaphey added to party Lonahte Holdings LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Christopher James Heaphey added to party Zachary Stephens(pty:dft) (Heaphey, Christopher)
February 18, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Jessica Jodene Smith on behalf of Lonahte Holdings LLC, Zachary StephensAttorney Jessica Jodene Smith added to party Zachary Stephens(pty:dft) (Smith, Jessica)
February 18, 2021 Filing 5 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1, direct assignment of civil actions to full time magistrate judges. (jsalz, )
February 18, 2021 Filing 4 COMPLAINT and Jury Demand against Christopher Bentley, Lonahte Holdings LLC, Ring-Neck Energy & Feed LLC, Zachary Stephens, Walt Wendland, filed by Iconic Medical Group LLC.(jsalz, )
February 18, 2021 Filing 3 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix. Text Only Entry. (jsalz, )
February 18, 2021 Filing 2 FIRST AND FINAL NOTICE TO ALL ATTORNEY(S) AND UNREPRESENTED PARTIES IN REMOVED, TRANSFERRED, OR OTHER CASES. To receive any further notice in a case removed or transferred to this court, or special matters including discovery disputes, bankruptcy appeals, or withdrawals of reference, Multi-district litigation (MDL), etc., all attorneys and unrepresented parties must enter an appearance under D.C.COLO.LAttyR 5(a). An attorney must be an active member of this court's bar and be in good standing in accordance with D.C.COLO.LAttyR 3. A waiver of the fee for bar admission may apply in limited situations. (Text Only Entry) (jsalz, )
February 18, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Lonahte Holdings LLC from Pitkin County District Court, Case Number 2021CV30001. (Filing fee $ 402, Receipt Number 1082-7723128), filed by Lonahte Holdings LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Civil Cover Sheet, #9 Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet)(Smith, Jessica)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Iconic Medical Group LLC v. Lonahte Holdings LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ring-Neck Energy & Feed LLC
Represented By: James Cullen Taravella
Represented By: Christopher Anthony Taravella
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walt Wendland
Represented By: Thomas Baker Quinn
Represented By: Allison Jean Becker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lonahte Holdings LLC
Represented By: Christopher James Heaphey
Represented By: Jessica Jodene Smith
Represented By: Hannah E. Armentrout
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christopher Bentley
Represented By: Lindsey Jill Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zachary Stephens
Represented By: Christopher James Heaphey
Represented By: Jessica Jodene Smith
Represented By: Hannah E. Armentrout
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Iconic Medical Group LLC
Represented By: Julie J. Ehret
Represented By: Lucas Franklin Van Arsdale
Represented By: Alexander Christian Clayden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?