Frida Kahlo Corporation v. Artists Rights Society, Inc.
Plaintiff: Frida Kahlo Corporation
Defendant: Artists Rights Society, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2021cv00635
Filed: March 3, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Raymond P Moore
Referring Judge: Scott T Varholak
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2201 cp
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 16, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 16, 2021 Filing 12 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. (Sholder, Scott)
April 15, 2021 Filing 11 MOTION to Dismiss by Defendant Artists Rights Society, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. A - Declaration of Adrienne R. Fields, #2 Exhibit Ex. B- Declaration of Scott J. Sholder)(Sholder, Scott)
April 15, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Scott Jonathon Sholder on behalf of Artists Rights Society, Inc. Attorney Scott Jonathon Sholder added to party Artists Rights Society, Inc. (pty:dft) (Sholder, Scott)
April 14, 2021 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Frida Kahlo Corporation. Artists Rights Society, Inc. served on 3/22/2021, answer due 4/12/2021. (Agarwal, Monty)
March 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER Setting Scheduling Conference for 5/25/2021 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak. Proposed Scheduling Order due 5/18/2021, by Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak on 3/4/2021. (jgonz, )
March 3, 2021 Filing 7 SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (jtorr, )
March 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MINUTE ORDER: With the assignment of this matter, the parties are advised that throughout this case they are expected to be familiar and comply with not only the Local Rules of this District, but also Judge Raymond P. Moore's Civil Practice Standards, which may be found at: http://www.cod.uscourts.gov/JudicialOfficers/ActiveArticleIIIJudges/HonRaymondPMoore.aspx. SO ORDERED by Judge Raymond P. Moore on 3/3/2021. (Text Only Entry) (rmsec )
March 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 72(a) and (b), this case is referred to the assigned United States Magistrate Judge to (1) convene a scheduling conference under Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b) and enter a scheduling order meeting the requirements of D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.2, (2) conduct such status conferences and issue such orders necessary for compliance with the scheduling order, including amendments or modifications of the scheduling order upon a showing of good cause, (3) hear and determine pretrial matters, including discovery and other non-dispositive motions, (4) conduct a pretrial conference and enter a pretrial order, and (5) conduct hearings, including evidentiary hearings, and submit proposed findings of fact and recommendations for rulings on dispositive motions. Court sponsored alternative dispute resolution is governed by D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.6. On the recommendation or informal request of the magistrate judge or on the request of the parties by motion, this court may direct the parties to engage in an early neutral evaluation, a settlement conference, or another alternative dispute resolution proceeding. By Judge Raymond P. Moore on 3/3/2021. (Text Only Entry) (rmsec )
March 3, 2021 Filing 4 Case assigned to Judge Raymond P. Moore and drawn to Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak. Text Only Entry. (jtorr, )
March 3, 2021 Filing 3 ADVISORY NOTICE OF NONCOMPLIANCE WITH COURT RULES/PROCEDURES:re: #2 Corporate Disclosure Statement and #1 Complaint, filed by attorney Monty Agarwal. Attorney has used an incorrect signature format in violation of D.C.COLO.LCivR 5.1(a) and 4.3(a) of the Electronic Case Filing Procedures (Civil cases). DO NOT REFILE THE DOCUMENT. In the future, the filer must affix an electronic s/signature and s/followed by a typed, not an inked, signature to all future documents.(Text Only Entry) (jtorr, )
March 3, 2021 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. (Agarwal, Monty)
March 3, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Declaratory Judgment against Artists Rights Society, Inc. (Filing fee $ 402,Receipt Number 1082-7745677)Attorney Monty Agarwal added to party Frida Kahlo Corporation(pty:pla), filed by Frida Kahlo Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Agarwal, Monty)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Frida Kahlo Corporation v. Artists Rights Society, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Artists Rights Society, Inc.
Represented By: Scott Jonathon Sholder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Frida Kahlo Corporation
Represented By: Monty Agarwal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?