Nielsen v. Verano Holdings, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Nicholas Nielsen
Defendant: William Young, Chris Fotopoulos, Alan Bluestine, Bill Stanley, Darren Weiss, Verano Holdings, LLC, Eula Adams, JJR Private Capital, James Leventis, Elroy Sailor, John Allison, Sol Global Investments, Jeffery J. Ryan, Martha Rouby, Ladd Scriber, Bob Dale Haun, Amy Haun Hall, Rockview Capital, David Johnson, Warren Ross, Leo Hauser, Ana Dutra, Daniel Reiner, Randy Taylor Consulting, Mark Barnard, Alliance Global Partners, Ben Kimbro, Natural State Wellness Enterprises, LLC, Marvin Parks, Canaccord Genuity, Serruya Private Equity, Kristy McDaniel, Henry Wilkins, V, Marvin Bruce Sanderson, Dustin McDaniel, George Archos, Steve White, Bart Calhoun, Ryan W. Heringer, Melissa Moody, Michael Frontier, Sam Dorf, Bobbi McDaniel, Bobby McDaniel, Nicole Stanton, Thomas M. Stank, Robert Lee Jones, III, Partner Colorado Credit Union, Bill Carwell, Edward Shen, Christine L. Edmonson, Jason Vedadi, Ross Group, The and Severn Bank
Case Number: 1:2021cv00692
Filed: March 8, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: S Kato Crews
Referring Judge: Daniel D Domenico
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 18 U.S.C. ยง 1962
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 29, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 29, 2021 Filing 122 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Peter F. Andrews by Defendants Eula Adams, Mark Barnard, Ana Dutra, Ben Kimbro, Daniel Reiner, Elroy Sailor, Nicole Stanton, Jason Vedadi. (Andrews, Peter)
September 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 121 MINUTE ORDER re: In light of the pending #3 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and Stay Action Pursuant to 9 U.S.C.A. Section 3 of the Federal Arbitration Act, #25 MOTION for Summary Judgment PLAINTIFFS DEMAND FOR A JURY TRIAL AS TO THE VALIDITY OF THE ARBITRATION AGREEMENT PURSUANT TO 9 U.S.C. 4, #87 First MOTION to Stay In Favor of Arbitration First MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim , and the recently filed #117 , #119 Notices regarding the arbitration that is currently proceeding, the Court (in its discretion to control its own docket) VACATES the forthcoming Scheduling Conference. Should these Motions be resolved in favor of proceeding in this Court, the parties shall jointly contact Judge Crews' chambers--within 72 hours of any Order--to select a mutually agreeable date for the Scheduling Conference. SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews on 9/13/2021. Text Only Entry (skclc1)
September 12, 2021 Filing 120 Exhibits in Support Harvest Defendants and Randy Taylor Consulting, LLC Joint Notice of Scope of Arbitration by Defendants Eula Adams, Mark Barnard, Ana Dutra, Ben Kimbro, Daniel Reiner, Elroy Sailor, Nicole Stanton, Jason Vedadi, Steve White. (Wallace, Sarah)
September 10, 2021 Filing 119 NOTICE re #3 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and Stay Action Pursuant to 9 U.S.C.A. Section 3 of the Federal Arbitration Act, #8 Joinder, Harvest Defendants and Randy Taylor Consulting, LLC Joint Notice of Scope of Arbitration by Defendants Eula Adams, Mark Barnard, Ana Dutra, Ben Kimbro, Randy Taylor Consulting, Daniel Reiner, Elroy Sailor, Nicole Stanton, Jason Vedadi, Steve White (Wallace, Sarah)
September 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 118 MINUTE ORDER Due to a conflict on the Court's calendar, the Telephonic Scheduling Conference is RESET for 10/5/2021 11:30 AM in Courtroom C201 before Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews. The proposed scheduling order is due seven days in advance, and the call-in instructions remain the same. SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews on 9/7/2021. Text Only Entry (amont, )
August 18, 2021 Filing 117 NOTICE re #3 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and Stay Action Pursuant to 9 U.S.C.A. Section 3 of the Federal Arbitration Act, #8 Joinder, Harvest Defendants and Randy Taylor Consulting, LLC's Joint Notice of Determination of Arbitrability by Defendants Eula Adams, Mark Barnard, Ana Dutra, Ben Kimbro, Daniel Reiner, Elroy Sailor, Nicole Stanton, Jason Vedadi, Steve White (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A to Harvest Defendants and Randy Taylor Consulting, LLC's Joint Notice of Determination of Arbitrability)(Wallace, Sarah)
August 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 116 MINUTE ORDER: The Scheduling Conference set for 9/30/2021 will take place telephonically. Dial in information for the Scheduling Conference is as follows:CONFERENCE CALL LINE: (888) 251-2909ACCESS CODE: 5662814# SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews on 8/6/2021. Text Only Entry (skclc1)
August 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 115 ORDER: In light of the Notice #114 and the Summons returned executed #113 , the Court finds as moot the #92 Motion for Service by Publication. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED a Scheduling Conference is set for 9/30/2021 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom C201 before Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews. The parties shall file their proposed scheduling order, and email a copy in Word format to Crews_Chambers@cod.uscourts.gov, on or before 9/23/2021. SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews on 8/6/2021. Text Only Entry (skclc1)
August 3, 2021 Filing 114 NOTICE re 80 Minute Order, by Plaintiff Nicholas Nielsen (Buck, Matthew)
August 3, 2021 Filing 113 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Nicholas Nielsen. JJR Private Capital served on 7/29/2021, answer due 8/19/2021. (Buck, Matthew)
June 10, 2021 Filing 112 Defendant Partner Colorado Credit Union terminated pursuant to #111 Notice of Dismissal filed on 6/10/2021. Text Only Entry (dddlc1, )
June 10, 2021 Filing 111 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of Party by Plaintiff Nicholas Nielsen (Buck, Matthew)
June 4, 2021 Filing 110 REPLY to Response to #87 First MOTION to Stay In Favor of ArbitrationFirst MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Defendants Serruya Private Equity, Sol Global Investments. (Adams, David)
June 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 109 ORDER GRANTING #108 Unopposed Motion for Leave to Exceed the Word-Count Limit. Defendants' reply in support of #87 Motion must not exceed 3,500 words. SO ORDERED by Judge Daniel D. Domenico on 6/2/2021. Text Only Entry (dddlc1, )
May 28, 2021 Filing 108 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to TO EXCEED THE WORD-COUNT LIMIT FOR REPLY IN FURTHER SUPPORT OF #87 First MOTION to Stay In Favor of ArbitrationFirst MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Defendants Serruya Private Equity, Sol Global Investments. (Adams, David)
May 21, 2021 Filing 107 RESPONSE to #87 First MOTION to Stay In Favor of ArbitrationFirst MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim AMENDED PURSUANT TO JUDGES ORDER filed by Plaintiff Nicholas Nielsen. (Buck, Matthew)
May 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 106 ORDER GRANTING #102 Unopposed Second Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint. The Verano Defendants must answer or otherwise respond to #12 Amended Complaint within twenty-one days of the Court's denial of #3 Motion to Compel Arbitration and Stay Action, or within twenty-one days of the lifting of any stay pursuant to the Court's grant of #3 Motion to Compel Arbitration and Stay Action. SO ORDERED by Judge Daniel D. Domenico on 5/21/2021. Text Only Entry (dddlc1, )
May 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 105 ORDER GRANTING #101 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Response. Plaintiff must respond to #87 Motion on or before 5/21/2021. Plaintiff's response must not exceed 5,500 words. SO ORDERED by Judge Daniel D. Domenico on 5/21/2021. Text Only Entry (dddlc1, )
May 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 104 ORDER GRANTING #100 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to the Amended Complaint. Defendant Alliance Global Partners must answer or otherwise respond to #12 Amended Complaint within twenty-one days of the Court's denial of #3 Motion to Compel Arbitration and Stay Action, or within twenty-one days of the lifting of any stay pursuant to the Court's grant of #3 Motion to Compel Arbitration and Stay Action. SO ORDERED by Judge Daniel D. Domenico on 5/21/2021. Text Only Entry (dddlc1, )
May 19, 2021 Filing 103 RESPONSE to #87 First MOTION to Stay In Favor of ArbitrationFirst MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Plaintiff Nicholas Nielsen. (Buck, Matthew)
May 18, 2021 Filing 102 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond re #12 Amended Complaint,,,, by Defendants George Archos, Sam Dorf, Chris Fotopoulos, Michael Frontier, James Leventis, Edward Shen, Verano Holdings, LLC, Darren Weiss. (Johnson, Carrie)
May 18, 2021 Filing 101 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #87 First MOTION to Stay In Favor of Arbitration, First MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Plaintiff Nicholas Nielsen. (Buck, Matthew) Modified on 5/18/2021 to correct linkage (athom, ).
May 14, 2021 Filing 100 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond by Defendant Alliance Global Partners. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Richardson, Dean)
May 14, 2021 Filing 99 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Dean Elliot Richardson on behalf of Alliance Global PartnersAttorney Dean Elliot Richardson added to party Alliance Global Partners(pty:dft) (Richardson, Dean)
May 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 98 ORDER GRANTING #97 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to the Amended Complaint. Defendants Natural State Wellness, Bart Calhoun, Leo Hauser, Bobbi McDaniel, Bobby McDaniel, Dustin McDaniel, Melissa Moody, Marvin Parks, Martha Rouby, Marvin Bruce Sanderson, Bill Stanley, John Allison, Bill Carwell, Christine Edmonson, Amy Haun Hall, Bob Dale Haun, Ryan Heringer, David Johnston, Robert Lee Jones III, Kristy McDaniel, Jeffrey Ryan, Ladd Scriber, Thomas Stank, Henry Wilkins, William Ryan Young, the Ross Group, Warren Ross, and Severn Bank must answer or otherwise respond to #12 Amended Complaint within twenty-one days of the Court's denial of #3 Motion to Compel Arbitration and Stay Action, or within twenty-one days of the lifting of any stay pursuant to the Court's grant of #3 Motion to Compel Arbitration and Stay Action. SO ORDERED by Judge Daniel D. Domenico on 5/10/2021. Text Only Entry (dddlc1, )
May 10, 2021 Filing 97 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond re #12 Amended Complaint,,,, by Defendants John Allison, Bart Calhoun, Bill Carwell, Christine L. Edmonson, Amy Haun Hall, Bob Dale Haun, Leo Hauser, Ryan W. Heringer, David Johnson, Robert Lee Jones, III, Bobbi McDaniel, Bobby McDaniel, Dustin McDaniel, Kristy McDaniel, Melissa Moody, Natural State Wellness Enterprises, LLC, Marvin Parks, Warren Ross, Ross Group, The, Martha Rouby, Jeffery J. Ryan, Marvin Bruce Sanderson, Ladd Scriber, Severn Bank, Thomas M. Stank, Bill Stanley, Henry Wilkins, V, William Young. (Frost, Kristen)
May 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 96 ORDER REFERRING MOTION: #92 Motion for Service by Publication filed by Nicholas Nielsen. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews by Judge Daniel D. Domenico on 5/7/2021. Text Only Entry (dddlc1, )
May 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 95 ORDER GRANTING #91 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File a Responsive Pleading to Plaintiff's Amended Complaint. Defendant Partner Colorado Credit Union must answer or otherwise respond to #12 Amended Complaint on or before 5/28/2021. SO ORDERED by Judge Daniel D. Domenico on 5/7/2021. Text Only Entry (dddlc1, )
May 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 94 ORDER GRANTING #90 Motion to Dismiss Defendant. All claims asserted against Defendant Alan Bluestine are DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. SO ORDERED by Judge Daniel D. Domenico on 5/7/2021. Text Only Entry (dddlc1, )
May 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 93 ORDER GRANTING #89 Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to First Amended Complaint. Defendants Randy Taylor Consulting LLC, Steve White, Jason Vedadi, Nicole Stanton, Ben Kimbro, Elroy Sailor, Ana Dutra, Mark Barnard, Eula Adams, and Daniel Reiner must answer or otherwise respond to #12 Amended Complaint within twenty-one days of the Court's denial of #3 Motion to Compel Arbitration and Stay Action, or within twenty-one days of the lifting of any stay pursuant to the Court's grant of #3 Motion to Compel Arbitration and Stay Action. SO ORDERED by Judge Daniel D. Domenico on 5/7/2021. Text Only Entry (dddlc1, )
May 7, 2021 Filing 92 MOTION for Service by Publication by Plaintiff Nicholas Nielsen. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(Buck, Matthew)
May 6, 2021 Filing 91 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Amended Complaint by Defendant Partner Colorado Credit Union. (Emmi, Donald)
May 5, 2021 Filing 90 MOTION to Dismiss Party by Plaintiff Nicholas Nielsen. (Buck, Matthew)
May 5, 2021 Filing 89 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond re #12 Amended Complaint,,,, by Defendants Eula Adams, Mark Barnard, Ana Dutra, Ben Kimbro, Randy Taylor Consulting, Daniel Reiner, Elroy Sailor, Nicole Stanton, Jason Vedadi, Steve White. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Carrington, Christopher)
May 4, 2021 Filing 88 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by David Tyler Adams on behalf of Serruya Private Equity, Sol Global Investments (Adams, David)
April 28, 2021 Filing 87 First MOTION to Stay In Favor of Arbitration, First MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Defendants Serruya Private Equity, Sol Global Investments. (Adams, David)
April 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 86 ORDER GRANTING #84 Motion for Extension of Time. The Verano Defendants must answer or otherwise respond to #12 Amended Complaint on or before 5/21/2021. SO ORDERED by Judge Daniel D. Domenico on 4/28/2021. Text Only Entry (dddlc1, )
April 28, 2021 Filing 85 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Richard B. Benenson on behalf of George Archos, Sam Dorf, Chris Fotopoulos, Michael Frontier, James Leventis, Edward Shen, Verano Holdings, LLC, Darren WeissAttorney Richard B. Benenson added to party George Archos(pty:dft), Attorney Richard B. Benenson added to party Sam Dorf(pty:dft), Attorney Richard B. Benenson added to party Chris Fotopoulos(pty:dft), Attorney Richard B. Benenson added to party Michael Frontier(pty:dft), Attorney Richard B. Benenson added to party James Leventis(pty:dft), Attorney Richard B. Benenson added to party Edward Shen(pty:dft), Attorney Richard B. Benenson added to party Verano Holdings, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Richard B. Benenson added to party Darren Weiss(pty:dft) (Benenson, Richard)
April 27, 2021 Filing 84 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond re #12 Amended Complaint,,,, by Defendants George Archos, Sam Dorf, Chris Fotopoulos, Michael Frontier, James Leventis, Edward Shen, Verano Holdings, LLC, Darren Weiss. (Johnson, Carrie)
April 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 83 ORDER GRANTING IN PART #79 Unopposed Joint Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to the Amended Complaint. Defendant Canaccord Genuity must answer or otherwise respond to #12 Amended Complaint within twenty-one days of the Court's denial of #3 Motion to Compel Arbitration and Stay Action, or within twenty-one days of the lifting of any stay pursuant to the Court's grant of #3 Motion to Compel Arbitration and Stay Action. The parties' request to set a scheduling conference is DENIED AS MOOT in light of 80 Minute Order issued by Magistrate Judge Crews. SO ORDERED by Judge Daniel D. Domenico on 4/22/2021. Text Only Entry (dddlc1, )
April 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 82 ORDER GRANTING #78 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond. Defendant Partner Colorado Credit Union must answer or otherwise respond to #12 Amended Complaint on or before 5/7/2021. SO ORDERED by Judge Daniel D. Domenico on 4/22/2021. Text Only Entry (dddlc1, )
April 21, 2021 Filing 81 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Nicholas Nielsen. Darren Weiss served on 4/15/2021, answer due 5/6/2021. (Buck, Matthew)
April 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 80 MINUTE ORDER: Given the number of Defendants and the pending or recently granted requests for extension of time to respond, IT IS ORDERED that at the point where all Defendants have been served and have answered (or have been given a deadline for answering), Plaintiff shall file a Notice with the Court that the matter should be set for a Scheduling Conference. By Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews on 4/21/2021. Text Only Entry (skclc1)
April 21, 2021 Filing 79 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond to the Amended Complaint by Defendant Canaccord Genuity. (Fiotto, Anthony)
April 20, 2021 Filing 78 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond to the Amended Complaint by Defendant Partner Colorado Credit Union. (Emmi, Donald)
April 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 77 ORDER GRANTING #75 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond. Arkansas Defendants must answer or otherwise respond to #12 Amended Complaint on or before 5/11/2021. SO ORDERED by Judge Daniel D. Domenico on 4/19/2021. Text Only Entry (dddlc1, )
April 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 76 ORDER GRANTING #73 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond. Defendants Serruya Private Equity and Sol Global Investments must answer or otherwise respond to #12 Amended Complaint on or before 4/28/2021. SO ORDERED by Judge Daniel D. Domenico on 4/19/2021. Text Only Entry (dddlc1, ) Modified on 4/19/2021 to correct linkage (athom, ).
April 19, 2021 Filing 75 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond re #12 Amended Complaint,,,, by Defendants John Allison, Bart Calhoun, Bill Carwell, Christine L. Edmonson, Amy Haun Hall, Bob Dale Haun, Leo Hauser, Ryan W. Heringer, David Johnson, Robert Lee Jones, III, Bobbi McDaniel, Bobby McDaniel, Dustin McDaniel, Kristy McDaniel, Melissa Moody, Natural State Wellness Enterprises, LLC, Marvin Parks, Martha Rouby, Jeffery J. Ryan, Marvin Bruce Sanderson, Ladd Scriber, Thomas M. Stank, Bill Stanley, Henry Wilkins, V, William Young. (Frost, Kristen)
April 19, 2021 Filing 74 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Kristen M. Frost on behalf of John Allison, Bart Calhoun, Bill Carwell, Christine L. Edmonson, Amy Haun Hall, Bob Dale Haun, Leo Hauser, Ryan W. Heringer, David Johnson, Robert Lee Jones, III, Bobbi McDaniel, Bobby McDaniel, Dustin McDaniel, Kristy McDaniel, Melissa Moody, Natural State Wellness Enterprises, LLC, Marvin Parks, Martha Rouby, Jeffery J. Ryan, Marvin Bruce Sanderson, Ladd Scriber, Thomas M. Stank, Bill Stanley, Henry Wilkins, V, William YoungAttorney Kristen M. Frost added to party John Allison(pty:dft), Attorney Kristen M. Frost added to party Bart Calhoun(pty:dft), Attorney Kristen M. Frost added to party Bill Carwell(pty:dft), Attorney Kristen M. Frost added to party Christine L. Edmonson(pty:dft), Attorney Kristen M. Frost added to party Amy Haun Hall(pty:dft), Attorney Kristen M. Frost added to party Bob Dale Haun(pty:dft), Attorney Kristen M. Frost added to party Leo Hauser(pty:dft), Attorney Kristen M. Frost added to party Ryan W. Heringer(pty:dft), Attorney Kristen M. Frost added to party David Johnson(pty:dft), Attorney Kristen M. Frost added to party Robert Lee Jones, III(pty:dft), Attorney Kristen M. Frost added to party Bobbi McDaniel(pty:dft), Attorney Kristen M. Frost added to party Bobby McDaniel(pty:dft), Attorney Kristen M. Frost added to party Dustin McDaniel(pty:dft), Attorney Kristen M. Frost added to party Kristy McDaniel(pty:dft), Attorney Kristen M. Frost added to party Melissa Moody(pty:dft), Attorney Kristen M. Frost added to party Natural State Wellness Enterprises, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Kristen M. Frost added to party Marvin Parks(pty:dft), Attorney Kristen M. Frost added to party Martha Rouby(pty:dft), Attorney Kristen M. Frost added to party Jeffery J. Ryan(pty:dft), Attorney Kristen M. Frost added to party Marvin Bruce Sanderson(pty:dft), Attorney Kristen M. Frost added to party Ladd Scriber(pty:dft), Attorney Kristen M. Frost added to party Thomas M. Stank(pty:dft), Attorney Kristen M. Frost added to party Bill Stanley(pty:dft), Attorney Kristen M. Frost added to party Henry Wilkins, V(pty:dft), Attorney Kristen M. Frost added to party William Young(pty:dft) (Frost, Kristen)
April 16, 2021 Filing 73 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond to Amended Complaint by Defendants Serruya Private Equity, Sol Global Investments. (Dickie, Lauren)
April 16, 2021 Filing 72 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Nicholas Nielsen. Alliance Global Partners served on 4/12/2021, answer due 5/3/2021. (Buck, Matthew)
April 14, 2021 Filing 71 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Nicholas Nielsen. Bobbi McDaniel served on 4/13/2021, answer due 5/4/2021. (Buck, Matthew)
April 14, 2021 Filing 70 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Nicholas Nielsen. Martha Rouby served on 4/14/2021, answer due 5/5/2021. (Buck, Matthew)
April 13, 2021 Filing 69 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Nicholas Nielsen. Chris Fotopoulos served on 4/13/2021, answer due 5/4/2021. (Buck, Matthew)
April 13, 2021 Filing 68 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Nicholas Nielsen. James Leventis served on 4/13/2021, answer due 5/4/2021. (Buck, Matthew)
April 13, 2021 Filing 67 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Nicholas Nielsen. Verano Holdings, LLC served on 4/13/2021, answer due 5/4/2021. (Buck, Matthew)
April 13, 2021 Filing 66 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Nicholas Nielsen. Sam Dorf served on 4/13/2021, answer due 5/4/2021. (Buck, Matthew)
April 13, 2021 Filing 65 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Nicholas Nielsen. Edward Shen served on 4/13/2021, answer due 5/4/2021. (Buck, Matthew)
April 13, 2021 Filing 64 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Nicholas Nielsen. George Archos served on 4/13/2021, answer due 5/4/2021. (Buck, Matthew)
April 13, 2021 Filing 63 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Nicholas Nielsen. Michael Frontier served on 4/7/2021, answer due 4/28/2021. (Buck, Matthew)
April 13, 2021 Filing 62 REPLY to Response to #25 MOTION for Summary Judgment PLAINTIFFS DEMAND FOR A JURY TRIAL AS TO THE VALIDITY OF THE ARBITRATION AGREEMENT PURSUANT TO 9 U.S.C. 4 filed by Plaintiff Nicholas Nielsen. (Buck, Matthew)
April 13, 2021 Filing 61 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Nicholas Nielsen. Melissa Moody served on 4/12/2021, answer due 5/3/2021. (Buck, Matthew)
April 13, 2021 Filing 60 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Nicholas Nielsen. Marvin Bruce Sanderson served on 4/12/2021, answer due 5/3/2021. (Buck, Matthew)
April 13, 2021 Filing 59 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Nicholas Nielsen. Marvin Parks served on 4/9/2021, answer due 4/30/2021. (Buck, Matthew)
April 13, 2021 Filing 58 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Nicholas Nielsen. Leo Hauser served on 4/9/2021, answer due 4/30/2021. (Buck, Matthew)
April 12, 2021 Filing 57 RESPONSE to #3 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and Stay Action Pursuant to 9 U.S.C.A. Section 3 of the Federal Arbitration Act filed by Defendants Eula Adams, Mark Barnard, Ana Dutra, Ben Kimbro, Daniel Reiner, Elroy Sailor, Nicole Stanton, Jason Vedadi, Steve White. (Wallace, Sarah)
April 12, 2021 Filing 56 REPLY to Response to #3 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and Stay Action Pursuant to 9 U.S.C.A. Section 3 of the Federal Arbitration Act filed by Defendant Randy Taylor Consulting. (Carrington, Christopher)
April 8, 2021 Filing 55 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Nicholas Nielsen. Robert Lee Jones, III served on 4/8/2021, answer due 4/29/2021. (Buck, Matthew)
April 8, 2021 Filing 54 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Nicholas Nielsen. Bart Calhoun served on 4/7/2021, answer due 4/28/2021. (Buck, Matthew)
April 8, 2021 Filing 53 AFFIDAVIT DUSTIN MCDANIEL RETURN OF SERVICE by Plaintiff Nicholas Nielsen. (Buck, Matthew)
April 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER GRANTING #51 Motion to Withdraw and DENYING AS MOOT #16 Motion to Strike. By Judge Daniel D. Domenico on 4/7/2021. Text Only Entry (dddlc1, )
April 7, 2021 Filing 51 MOTION to Withdraw Document re #16 MOTION to Strike #3 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and Stay Action Pursuant to 9 U.S.C.A. Section 3 of the Federal Arbitration Act, #8 Joinder, by Plaintiff Nicholas Nielsen. (Buck, Matthew)
April 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER DENYING WITHOUT PREJUDICE #17 Motion for Costs of Attorneys' Fees and Service. Plaintiff may refile a motion for expenses and attorneys' fees pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(d)(2) after each of the defendants in question has been served. Any such motion must (1) clearly specify the defendant(s) from which Plaintiff seeks expenses and fees; (2) demonstrate that Plaintiff complied with the requirements of Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(d)(1) as to each such defendant; and (3) demonstrate the expenses actually incurred in making service on each such defendant. SO ORDERED by Judge Daniel D. Domenico on 4/7/2021. Text Only Entry (dddlc1, )
April 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER GRANTING IN PART #41 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to #12 Amended Complaint. Defendants Warren Ross, The Ross Group, and Severn Bank must answer or otherwise respond to the Amended Complaint on or before 5/11/2021. SO ORDERED by Judge Daniel D. Domenico on 4/7/2021. Text Only Entry (dddlc1, )
April 6, 2021 Filing 48 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to Answer or Respond to the Complaint (Amended) by Defendant Canaccord Genuity.. (Fiotto, Anthony)
April 6, 2021 Filing 47 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to Answer or Respond to the Complaint by Defendants Serruya Private Equity, Sol Global Investments. Serruya Private Equity answer due 4/21/2021; Sol Global Investments answer due 4/21/2021. (Dickie, Lauren)
April 6, 2021 Filing 46 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Eric Daniel Lawson on behalf of Canaccord GenuityAttorney Eric Daniel Lawson added to party Canaccord Genuity(pty:dft) (Lawson, Eric)
April 6, 2021 Filing 45 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Anthony S. Fiotto on behalf of Canaccord GenuityAttorney Anthony S. Fiotto added to party Canaccord Genuity(pty:dft) (Fiotto, Anthony)
April 6, 2021 Filing 44 RESPONSE to #17 MOTION for Costs filed by Defendant Randy Taylor Consulting. (Carrington, Christopher)
April 6, 2021 Filing 43 RESPONSE to #41 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond re #12 Amended Complaint,,,, filed by Plaintiff Nicholas Nielsen. (Buck, Matthew)
April 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 42 MINUTE ORDER re: #41 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to the Amended Complaint. Plaintiff must file its response, if any, to the motion for extension no later than noon on 4/7/2021. SO ORDERED by Judge Daniel D. Domenico on 4/5/2021. Text Only Entry (dddlc1, )
April 2, 2021 Filing 41 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond re #12 Amended Complaint,,,, by Defendants Warren Ross, Ross Group, The, Severn Bank. (Frost, Kristen)
April 2, 2021 Filing 40 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Kristen M. Frost on behalf of Warren Ross, Ross Group, The, Severn BankAttorney Kristen M. Frost added to party Warren Ross(pty:dft), Attorney Kristen M. Frost added to party Ross Group, The(pty:dft), Attorney Kristen M. Frost added to party Severn Bank(pty:dft) (Frost, Kristen)
April 2, 2021 Filing 39 JOINDER re #34 Response to Motion, #25 MOTION for Summary Judgment PLAINTIFFS DEMAND FOR A JURY TRIAL AS TO THE VALIDITY OF THE ARBITRATION AGREEMENT PURSUANT TO 9 U.S.C. 4 by Defendant Randy Taylor Consulting. (Carrington, Christopher)
April 1, 2021 Filing 38 Utility Setting Deadlines: Partner Colorado Credit Union answer due 4/22/2021 per #37 Stipulation. Text Only Entry (athom, )
April 1, 2021 Filing 37 Stipulation for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Amended Complaint by Defendant Partner Colorado Credit Union. (Emmi, Donald) Modified on 4/2/2021 to correct event (athom, ).
March 31, 2021 Filing 36 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Donald Thomas Emmi on behalf of Partner Colorado Credit UnionAttorney Donald Thomas Emmi added to party Partner Colorado Credit Union(pty:dft) (Emmi, Donald)
March 31, 2021 Filing 35 AFFIDAVIT re #1 Complaint,,,, RETURN OF SERVICE ON PARTNER CREDIT UNION by Plaintiff Nicholas Nielsen. (Buck, Matthew)
March 30, 2021 Filing 34 RESPONSE to #25 MOTION for Summary Judgment PLAINTIFFS DEMAND FOR A JURY TRIAL AS TO THE VALIDITY OF THE ARBITRATION AGREEMENT PURSUANT TO 9 U.S.C. 4 filed by Defendants Eula Adams, Mark Barnard, Ana Dutra, Ben Kimbro, Daniel Reiner, Elroy Sailor, Nicole Stanton, Jason Vedadi, Steve White. (Wallace, Sarah)
March 29, 2021 Filing 33 Exhibits in Support of #32 Response to Motion by Plaintiff Nicholas Nielsen. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit B Offer of At-Will employment., #2 Exhibit A Harvest Employment Dispute Resolution Policy)(Buck, Matthew)
March 29, 2021 Filing 32 RESPONSE to #3 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and Stay Action Pursuant to 9 U.S.C.A. Section 3 of the Federal Arbitration Act filed by Plaintiff Nicholas Nielsen. (Buck, Matthew)
March 29, 2021 Filing 31 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Matthew William Buck on behalf of Nicholas Nielsen (Buck, Matthew)
March 29, 2021 Filing 30 ADVISORY NOTICE TO ATTORNEY AND COURT: Under D.C.COLO.LAttyR 3(a), Matthew William Buck was administratively removed from the court's attorney roll and barred from filing electronically under CM/ECF for failing to pay the 2020 Biennial Fee. Counsel must complete a Bar/ECF application through counsel's existing Attorney Services Portal account and pay the full application fee to be restored to the attorney roll and CM/ECF. Upon reinstatement, counsel must file a Notice of Entry of Appearance in this case. (Text Only Entry) (mfred)
March 26, 2021 Filing 29 AFFIDAVIT RETURN OF SERVICE SERRUYA PRIVATE EQUITY by Plaintiff Nicholas Nielsen. (Buck, Matthew)
March 26, 2021 Filing 28 AFFIDAVIT RETURN OF SERVICE SOL GLOBAL by Plaintiff Nicholas Nielsen. (Buck, Matthew)
March 26, 2021 Filing 27 APPENDIX RETURN OF SERVICE JJR PRIVATE CAPITAL by Plaintiff Nicholas Nielsen. (Buck, Matthew)
March 25, 2021 Filing 26 AFFIDAVIT RETURN OF SERVICE ON THE ROSS GROUP C/O WARREN ROSS by Plaintiff Nicholas Nielsen. (Buck, Matthew)
March 25, 2021 Filing 25 MOTION for Summary Judgment PLAINTIFFS DEMAND FOR A JURY TRIAL AS TO THE VALIDITY OF THE ARBITRATION AGREEMENT PURSUANT TO 9 U.S.C. 4 by Plaintiff Nicholas Nielsen. (Buck, Matthew)
March 24, 2021 Filing 24 AFFIDAVIT RETURN OF SERVICE on defendant Severn Bank by Plaintiff Nicholas Nielsen. (Buck, Matthew)
March 24, 2021 Filing 23 AFFIDAVIT RETURN OF SERVICE on defendant Rockview Capital Corp now DBA Windsong Verano II by Plaintiff Nicholas Nielsen. (Buck, Matthew)
March 23, 2021 Filing 22 RESPONSE to #16 MOTION to Strike #3 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and Stay Action Pursuant to 9 U.S.C.A. Section 3 of the Federal Arbitration Act, #8 Joinder, Attorney Peter Francis Andrews added to party Eula Adams(pty:dft), Attorney Peter Francis Andrews added to party Mark Barnard(pty:dft), Attorney Peter Francis Andrews added to party Ana Dutra(pty:dft), Attorney Peter Francis Andrews added to party Ben Kimbro(pty:dft), Attorney Peter Francis Andrews added to party Daniel Reiner(pty:dft), Attorney Peter Francis Andrews added to party Elroy Sailor(pty:dft), Attorney Peter Francis Andrews added to party Nicole Stanton(pty:dft), Attorney Peter Francis Andrews added to party Jason Vedadi(pty:dft), Attorney Peter Francis Andrews added to party Steve White(pty:dft) filed by Defendants Eula Adams, Mark Barnard, Ana Dutra, Ben Kimbro, Daniel Reiner, Elroy Sailor, Nicole Stanton, Jason Vedadi, Steve White. (Andrews, Peter)
March 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 72(a) and (b), this case is referred to the assigned United States Magistrate Judge to (1) convene a scheduling conference under Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b) and enter a scheduling order meeting the requirements of Local Civ. R. 16.2, (2) conduct such status conferences and issue such orders necessary for compliance with the scheduling order, including amendments or modifications of the scheduling order upon a showing of good cause, (3) hear and determine pretrial matters, including discovery and other non-dispositive motions, (4) conduct hearings, including evidentiary hearings, and submit proposed findings of fact and recommendations for rulings on dispositive motions, and (5) pursuant to Local Civ. R. 16.6 and at the discretion of the Magistrate Judge, convene such early neutral evaluation and/or settlement conferences and direct related procedures as may facilitate resolution of this case without the necessity of a motion or prior authorization of the undersigned. SO ORDERED by Judge Daniel D. Domenico on 3/22/2021. Text Only Entry (dddlc1, )
March 22, 2021 Filing 20 RESPONSE to #16 MOTION to Strike #3 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and Stay Action Pursuant to 9 U.S.C.A. Section 3 of the Federal Arbitration Act, #8 Joinder, filed by Defendant Randy Taylor Consulting. (Carrington, Christopher)
March 17, 2021 Filing 19 SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (athom, )
March 17, 2021 Filing 18 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Sarah Block Wallace on behalf of Eula Adams, Mark Barnard, Ana Dutra, Ben Kimbro, Daniel Reiner, Elroy Sailor, Nicole Stanton, Jason Vedadi, Steve WhiteAttorney Sarah Block Wallace added to party Eula Adams(pty:dft), Attorney Sarah Block Wallace added to party Mark Barnard(pty:dft), Attorney Sarah Block Wallace added to party Ana Dutra(pty:dft), Attorney Sarah Block Wallace added to party Ben Kimbro(pty:dft), Attorney Sarah Block Wallace added to party Daniel Reiner(pty:dft), Attorney Sarah Block Wallace added to party Elroy Sailor(pty:dft), Attorney Sarah Block Wallace added to party Nicole Stanton(pty:dft), Attorney Sarah Block Wallace added to party Jason Vedadi(pty:dft), Attorney Sarah Block Wallace added to party Steve White(pty:dft) (Wallace, Sarah)
March 17, 2021 Filing 17 MOTION for Costs by Plaintiff Nicholas Nielsen. (Attachments: #1 Email from Barrow Grimm to Buck, #2 Email from Frost to Buck, #3 Email from Buck to Frost)(Buck, Matthew)
March 17, 2021 Filing 16 WITHDRAWN - MOTION to Strike #3 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and Stay Action Pursuant to 9 U.S.C.A. Section 3 of the Federal Arbitration Act, #8 Joinder, by Plaintiff Nicholas Nielsen. (Buck, Matthew) Modified on 4/12/2021 to withdraw pursuant to 52 Order (athom, ).
March 17, 2021 Filing 15 SUMMONS REQUEST as to SEVERN BANK re #12 Amended Complaint,,,, by Plaintiff Nicholas Nielsen. (Attachments: #1 List of Defendants)(Buck, Matthew)
March 16, 2021 Filing 14 Administrative Notice: The #13 Summons submitted is incomplete and will not be issued. All defendants must be listed in the caption - et al can not be used. Please complete the forms for issuance using the event Summons Request.. (Text Only Entry) (athom, )
March 16, 2021 Filing 13 SUMMONS REQUEST as to SEVERN BANK re #12 Amended Complaint,,,, by Plaintiff Nicholas Nielsen. (Buck, Matthew)
March 16, 2021 Filing 12 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Eula Adams, Alliance Global Partners, John Allison, George Archos, Mark Barnard, Alan Bluestine, Bart Calhoun, Canaccord Genuity, Bill Carwell, Sam Dorf, Ana Dutra, Christine L. Edmonson, Chris Fotopoulos, Michael Frontier, Amy Haun Hall, Bob Dale Haun, Leo Hauser, Ryan W. Heringer, JJR Private Capital, David Johnson, Robert Lee Jones, III, Ben Kimbro, James Leventis, Bobbi McDaniel, Bobby McDaniel, Dustin McDaniel, Kristy McDaniel, Melissa Moody, Natural State Wellness Enterprises, LLC, Marvin Parks, Partner Colorado Credit Union, Randy Taylor Consulting, Daniel Reiner, Rockview Capital, Warren Ross, Ross Group, The, Martha Rouby, Jeffery J. Ryan, Elroy Sailor, Marvin Bruce Sanderson, Ladd Scriber, Serruya Private Equity, Edward Shen, Sol Global Investments, Thomas M. Stank, Bill Stanley, Nicole Stanton, Jason Vedadi, Verano Holdings, LLC, Darren Weiss, Steve White, Henry Wilkins, V, William Young, Severn Bank, filed by Nicholas Nielsen.(Buck, Matthew)
March 16, 2021 Filing 11 CASE REASSIGNED pursuant to #10 Consent/Non-Consent to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge. All parties do not consent. This case is randomly reassigned to Judge Daniel D. Domenico. All future pleadings should be designated as 21-cv-00692-DDD. (Text Only Entry) (jgonz, )
March 16, 2021 Filing 10 CONSENT to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge by Defendant Randy Taylor Consulting All parties do not consent.. (Carrington, Christopher)
March 15, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Michael Norris Mulvania on behalf of Randy Taylor ConsultingAttorney Michael Norris Mulvania added to party Randy Taylor Consulting(pty:dft) (Mulvania, Michael)
March 15, 2021 Filing 8 JOINDER re #3 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and Stay Action Pursuant to 9 U.S.C.A. Section 3 of the Federal Arbitration Act by Defendants Eula Adams, Mark Barnard, Ana Dutra, Ben Kimbro, Daniel Reiner, Elroy Sailor, Nicole Stanton, Jason Vedadi, Steve White. (Petrie, Andrew)
March 10, 2021 Filing 7 ERRATA re #1 Complaint,,,, CIVIL COVER SHEET by Plaintiff Nicholas Nielsen. (Buck, Matthew)
March 8, 2021 Filing 6 SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (jsalz, )
March 8, 2021 Filing 5 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews. Text Only Entry. (jsalz, )
March 8, 2021 Filing 4 ADVISORY NOTICE OF NONCOMPLIANCE WITH COURT RULES/PROCEDURES: re: #1 Complaint, filed by attorney Matthew W. Buck. DO NOT REFILE THE DOCUMENT. Action to take - counsel must submit a change of contact request through the Attorney Services Portal Account pursuant to D.C.COLO.LAttyR 5(c) and 3.5 of the Electronic Case Filing Procedures (Civil cases).(Text Only Entry) (jsalz, )
March 8, 2021 Filing 3 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and Stay Action Pursuant to 9 U.S.C.A. Section 3 of the Federal Arbitration Act by Defendant Randy Taylor Consulting. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Carrington, Christopher)
March 8, 2021 Filing 2 SUMMONS REQUEST as to Verano Holdings, LLC, Sam Dorf, George Archos, Darren Weiss, James Leventis, Chris Fotopoulos, Edward Shen, Michael Frontier, Rockview Capital, JJR Private Capital, Alan Bluestine, Sol Global Investments, Serruya Private Equity, Randy Taylor Consulting, Partner Colorado Credit Union, Steve White, Jason Vedadi, Nicole Stanton, Ben Kimbro, Elroy Sailor, Ana Dutra, Mark Barnard, and Eula Adams, Daniel Reiner, Canaccord Genuity, Alliance Global Partners, Natural State Wellness Enterprises, LLC, John Allison, Henry Wilkins V, Dr. William Young, Bill Carwell, Christine L. Edmonson, Amy Haun Hall, Bob Dale Haun, Leo Hauser, Ryan W Heringer, David Johnson, Robert Lee Jones III, Bobbi McDaniel, Dustin McDaniel, Bobby McDaniel, Kristy McDaniel, Marvin Parks, Jeffery J. Ryan, Dr. Marvin Bruce Sanderson, Dr. Ladd Scriber, Dr. Thomas M Stank, Bill Stanley, Bart Calhoun, Melissa Moody, Martha Rouby, Warren Ross, and The Ross Group re #1 Complaint,,,, by Plaintiff Nicholas Nielsen. (Attachments: #1 List of Defendants)(Buck, Matthew)
March 8, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Eula Adams, Alliance Global Partners, John Allison, George Archos, Mark Barnard, Alan Bluestine, Bart Calhoun, Canaccord Genuity, Bill Carwell, Sam Dorf, Ana Dutra, Christine Edmonson, Chris Fotopoulos, Michael Frontier, Amy Hall, Bob Haun, Leo Hauser, Ryan Heringer, JJR Private Capital, David Johnson, Robert Lee Jones III, Ben Kimbro, James Leventis, Bobbi McDaniel, Bobby McDaniel, Dustin McDaniel, Kristy McDaniel, Melissa Moody, Natural State Wellness Enterprises, LLC, Marvin Parks, Partner Colorado Credit Union, Randy Taylor Consulting, Daniel Reiner, Rockview Capital, Warren Ross, Martha Rouby, Jeffery Ryan, Elroy Sailor, Marvin Bruce Sanderson, Ladd Scriber, Serruya Private Equity, Edward Shen, Sol Global Investments, Thomas Stank, Bill Stanley, Nicole Stanton, The Ross Group, Jason Vedadi, Verano Holdings, LLC, Darren Weiss, Steve White, Henry Wilkins V, William Young (Filing fee $ 402,Receipt Number 1082-7752120)Attorney Matthew William Buck added to party Nicholas Nielsen(pty:pla), filed by Nicholas Nielsen. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit RICO Enterprise Map)(Buck, Matthew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nielsen v. Verano Holdings, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Young
Represented By: Kristen M. Frost
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chris Fotopoulos
Represented By: Carrie Elizabeth Johnson
Represented By: Richard B. Benenson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alan Bluestine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bill Stanley
Represented By: Kristen M. Frost
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Darren Weiss
Represented By: Carrie Elizabeth Johnson
Represented By: Richard B. Benenson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Verano Holdings, LLC
Represented By: Carrie Elizabeth Johnson
Represented By: Richard B. Benenson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eula Adams
Represented By: Andrew John Petrie
Represented By: Sarah Block Wallace
Represented By: Peter Francis Andrews
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JJR Private Capital
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Leventis
Represented By: Carrie Elizabeth Johnson
Represented By: Richard B. Benenson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elroy Sailor
Represented By: Andrew John Petrie
Represented By: Sarah Block Wallace
Represented By: Peter Francis Andrews
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Allison
Represented By: Kristen M. Frost
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sol Global Investments
Represented By: Lauren Hadley Dickie
Represented By: David Tyler Adams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeffery J. Ryan
Represented By: Kristen M. Frost
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Martha Rouby
Represented By: Kristen M. Frost
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ladd Scriber
Represented By: Kristen M. Frost
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bob Dale Haun
Represented By: Kristen M. Frost
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amy Haun Hall
Represented By: Kristen M. Frost
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rockview Capital
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Johnson
Represented By: Kristen M. Frost
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warren Ross
Represented By: Kristen M. Frost
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Leo Hauser
Represented By: Kristen M. Frost
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ana Dutra
Represented By: Andrew John Petrie
Represented By: Sarah Block Wallace
Represented By: Peter Francis Andrews
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel Reiner
Represented By: Andrew John Petrie
Represented By: Sarah Block Wallace
Represented By: Peter Francis Andrews
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Randy Taylor Consulting
Represented By: Christopher Patrick Carrington
Represented By: Michael Norris Mulvania
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Barnard
Represented By: Andrew John Petrie
Represented By: Sarah Block Wallace
Represented By: Peter Francis Andrews
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alliance Global Partners
Represented By: Dean Elliot Richardson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ben Kimbro
Represented By: Andrew John Petrie
Represented By: Sarah Block Wallace
Represented By: Peter Francis Andrews
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Natural State Wellness Enterprises, LLC
Represented By: Kristen M. Frost
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marvin Parks
Represented By: Kristen M. Frost
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Canaccord Genuity
Represented By: Eric Daniel Lawson
Represented By: Anthony S. Fiotto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Serruya Private Equity
Represented By: Lauren Hadley Dickie
Represented By: David Tyler Adams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kristy McDaniel
Represented By: Kristen M. Frost
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Henry Wilkins, V
Represented By: Kristen M. Frost
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marvin Bruce Sanderson
Represented By: Kristen M. Frost
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dustin McDaniel
Represented By: Kristen M. Frost
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: George Archos
Represented By: Carrie Elizabeth Johnson
Represented By: Richard B. Benenson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steve White
Represented By: Andrew John Petrie
Represented By: Sarah Block Wallace
Represented By: Peter Francis Andrews
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bart Calhoun
Represented By: Kristen M. Frost
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ryan W. Heringer
Represented By: Kristen M. Frost
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Melissa Moody
Represented By: Kristen M. Frost
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Frontier
Represented By: Carrie Elizabeth Johnson
Represented By: Richard B. Benenson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sam Dorf
Represented By: Carrie Elizabeth Johnson
Represented By: Richard B. Benenson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bobbi McDaniel
Represented By: Kristen M. Frost
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bobby McDaniel
Represented By: Kristen M. Frost
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nicole Stanton
Represented By: Andrew John Petrie
Represented By: Sarah Block Wallace
Represented By: Peter Francis Andrews
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas M. Stank
Represented By: Kristen M. Frost
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Lee Jones, III
Represented By: Kristen M. Frost
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Partner Colorado Credit Union
Represented By: Donald Thomas Emmi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bill Carwell
Represented By: Kristen M. Frost
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Edward Shen
Represented By: Carrie Elizabeth Johnson
Represented By: Richard B. Benenson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christine L. Edmonson
Represented By: Kristen M. Frost
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jason Vedadi
Represented By: Andrew John Petrie
Represented By: Sarah Block Wallace
Represented By: Peter Francis Andrews
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ross Group, The
Represented By: Kristen M. Frost
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Severn Bank
Represented By: Kristen M. Frost
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nicholas Nielsen
Represented By: Matthew William Buck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?