Teaching Company, LLC, The et al v. Sling TV L.L.C. et al
Plaintiff: The Teaching Company, LLC, Comcast Cable Communication Management, LLC d/b/a Comcast Technology Solutions, Comcast Cable Communications, LLC, Teaching Company, LLC, The and Comcast Cable Communications Management, LLC doing business as Comcast Technology Solutions
Defendant: Dish Technologies L.L.C. and Sling TV L.L.C.
Case Number: 1:2021cv00740
Filed: March 11, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Scott T Varholak
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 4, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 4, 2021 Filing 15 Civil Case Terminated pursuant to the notice of dismissal or stipulation to dismiss filed in this case on 5/4/2021. Text Only Entry (jgonz, )
May 4, 2021 Filing 14 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of Case Without Prejudice by Plaintiffs Comcast Cable Communications Management, LLC, Comcast Cable Communications, LLC, Teaching Company, LLC, The (Stauss, David)
April 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #12 Motion to Withdraw as Counsel. Attorney Natalie Cha is relieved of any further representation of Plaintiffs. The Clerk of Court is instructed to terminate Attorney Cha as counsel of record, and to remove her name from the electronic certificate of mailing. Plaintiffs shall continue to be represented by Attorneys Ashok Ramani, David J. Lisson, and Gareth E. DeWalt of Davis Polk & Wardwell LLP. SO ORDERED, by Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak on 4/07/2021. Text Only Entry(stvlc1, )
April 7, 2021 Filing 12 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Plaintiffs Comcast Cable Communications Management, LLC, Comcast Cable Communications, LLC, Teaching Company, LLC, The. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Cha, Natalie)
March 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER Setting Scheduling Conference for 5/26/2021 09:15 AM before Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak. Consent Form due by 5/12/2021. Proposed Scheduling Order due 5/19/2021, by Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak on 3/15/2021. (jgonz, )
March 12, 2021 Filing 10 Report re Patent/Trademark: Report on the filing of an action emailed (NEF) to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (jtorr, )
March 12, 2021 Filing 9 SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (jtorr, )
March 11, 2021 Filing 8 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak. Text Only Entry. (jtorr, )
March 11, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Natalie Cha on behalf of All Plaintiffs Attorney Natalie Cha added to party Comcast Cable Communication Management, LLC d/b/a Comcast Technology Solutions(pty:pla), Attorney Natalie Cha added to party Comcast Cable Communications, LLC(pty:pla), Attorney Natalie Cha added to party The Teaching Company, LLC(pty:pla) (Cha, Natalie)
March 11, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Gareth E. DeWalt on behalf of Comcast Cable Communication Management, LLC d/b/a Comcast Technology Solutions, Comcast Cable Communications, LLC, The Teaching Company, LLCAttorney Gareth E. DeWalt added to party Comcast Cable Communication Management, LLC d/b/a Comcast Technology Solutions(pty:pla), Attorney Gareth E. DeWalt added to party Comcast Cable Communications, LLC(pty:pla), Attorney Gareth E. DeWalt added to party The Teaching Company, LLC(pty:pla) (DeWalt, Gareth)
March 11, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by David James Lisson on behalf of Comcast Cable Communication Management, LLC d/b/a Comcast Technology Solutions, Comcast Cable Communications, LLC, The Teaching Company, LLCAttorney David James Lisson added to party Comcast Cable Communication Management, LLC d/b/a Comcast Technology Solutions(pty:pla), Attorney David James Lisson added to party Comcast Cable Communications, LLC(pty:pla), Attorney David James Lisson added to party The Teaching Company, LLC(pty:pla) (Lisson, David)
March 11, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Ashok Ramani on behalf of Comcast Cable Communication Management, LLC d/b/a Comcast Technology Solutions, Comcast Cable Communications, LLC, The Teaching Company, LLCAttorney Ashok Ramani added to party Comcast Cable Communication Management, LLC d/b/a Comcast Technology Solutions(pty:pla), Attorney Ashok Ramani added to party Comcast Cable Communications, LLC(pty:pla), Attorney Ashok Ramani added to party The Teaching Company, LLC(pty:pla) (Ramani, Ashok)
March 11, 2021 Filing 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Other Affiliate The Teaching Company Intermediate Holdings, LLC, Other Affiliate The Teaching Company Holdings, LLC for The Teaching Company, LLC. (Stauss, David)
March 11, 2021 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Other Affiliate Comcast Corporation, Other Affiliate Comcast Corporation for Comcast Cable Communication Management, LLC d/b/a Comcast Technology Solutions, Comcast Cable Communications, LLC. (Stauss, David)
March 11, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Declaratory Judgment of Noninfringement against Dish Technologies L.L.C., Sling TV L.L.C. (Filing fee $ 402,Receipt Number 1082-7760430)Attorney David Matthew Stauss added to party Comcast Cable Communication Management, LLC d/b/a Comcast Technology Solutions(pty:pla), Attorney David Matthew Stauss added to party Comcast Cable Communications, LLC(pty:pla), Attorney David Matthew Stauss added to party The Teaching Company, LLC(pty:pla), filed by The Teaching Company, LLC, Comcast Cable Communications, LLC, Comcast Cable Communication Management, LLC d/b/a Comcast Technology Solutions. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Civil Cover Sheet, #6 Summons Dish Technologies L.L.C., #7 Summons Sling TV L.L.C.)(Stauss, David)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Teaching Company, LLC, The et al v. Sling TV L.L.C. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Teaching Company, LLC
Represented By: Gareth E. DeWalt
Represented By: Ashok Ramani
Represented By: David Matthew Stauss
Represented By: Natalie Cha
Represented By: David James Lisson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Comcast Cable Communication Management, LLC d/b/a Comcast Technology Solutions
Represented By: Gareth E. DeWalt
Represented By: Ashok Ramani
Represented By: David Matthew Stauss
Represented By: Natalie Cha
Represented By: David James Lisson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Comcast Cable Communications, LLC
Represented By: Gareth E. DeWalt
Represented By: Ashok Ramani
Represented By: David Matthew Stauss
Represented By: Natalie Cha
Represented By: David James Lisson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Teaching Company, LLC, The
Represented By: Gareth E. DeWalt
Represented By: Ashok Ramani
Represented By: David Matthew Stauss
Represented By: Natalie Cha
Represented By: David James Lisson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Comcast Cable Communications Management, LLC doing business as Comcast Technology Solutions
Represented By: Gareth E. DeWalt
Represented By: Ashok Ramani
Represented By: David Matthew Stauss
Represented By: Natalie Cha
Represented By: David James Lisson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dish Technologies L.L.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sling TV L.L.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?