Sealand v. Enterprise Holdings, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Orlen Sealand
Defendant: John Doe, Enterprise Holdings, Inc. d/b/a Enterprise Rent-A-Car and Enterprise Holdings, Inc. John Doe, Individual doing business as Enterprise Rent-A-Car
Case Number: 1:2021cv00849
Filed: March 23, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Scott T Varholak
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 13, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 13, 2021 Filing 24 CERTIFICATE of Service by E-Mail by Clerk of Court re #13 MOTION to Withdraw Notice of Removal, 22 Order on Motion to Withdraw, #21 Response to Motion to genevieve.rotella@judicial.state.co.us at Denver County District Court. Text Only Entry (jgonz, )
April 13, 2021 Filing 23 Civil Case Terminated pursuant to the Order to Remand filed in this case 4/13/2021. Text Only Entry (jgonz, )
April 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER granting #13 Motion to Withdraw. This matter is remanded to Denver County District Court. SO ORDERED, by Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak on 4/13/2021. Text Only Entry(stvlc2, )
April 13, 2021 Filing 21 RESPONSE to #13 MOTION to Withdraw Notice of Removal filed by Plaintiff Orlen Sealand. (Fossenier, Michael)
April 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 20 MINUTE ORDER This matter is before the Court on #13 MOTION to Withdraw Notice of Removal. Plaintiff shall file a response to the motion indicating its position on or before 4/19/2021. SO ORDERED, by Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak on 4/12/2021. Text Only Entry (stvlc2, )
April 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER OF REFERENCE. Pursuant to the consent of the parties to the jurisdiction of the magistrate judge #18 , this case is referred to Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak for all purposes pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c), by Chief Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 4/09/2021. Text Only Entry (pabsec2)
April 8, 2021 Filing 18 CONSENT to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge by Defendant Enterprise Holdings, Inc. All parties consent.. (Jachimiak, Mark)
April 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 MINUTE ORDER This matter is before the Court on #16 Consent to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge filed by Defendant Enterprise Holdings, Inc. That form does not include the signature of Plaintiff's attorney and therefore does not appropriately indicate the consent of all the parties. The parties shall jointly file a new form indicating consent/nonconsent to United States Magistrate Judge jurisdiction on or before 4/12/2021. SO ORDERED, by Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak on 4/8/2021. Text Only Entry (stvlc2, )
April 7, 2021 Filing 16 CONSENT to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge by Defendant Enterprise Holdings, Inc. All parties consent.. (Jachimiak, Mark)
April 7, 2021 Filing 15 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Michael Paul Fossenier on behalf of Orlen SealandAttorney Michael Paul Fossenier added to party Orlen Sealand(pty:pla) (Fossenier, Michael)
March 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 MINUTE ORDER In light of #13 MOTION to Withdraw, the parties shall file the form indicating consent/nonconsent to magistrate judge jurisdiction on or before 4/7/2021. SO ORDERED, by Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak on 3/29/2021. Text Only Entry (stvlc2, )
March 25, 2021 Filing 13 MOTION to Withdraw Notice of Removal by Defendant Enterprise Holdings, Inc.. (Jachimiak, Mark)
March 23, 2021 Filing 12 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1, direct assignment of civil actions to full time magistrate judges. (alave, )
March 23, 2021 Filing 11 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak. Text Only Entry. (alave, )
March 23, 2021 Filing 9 AFFIDAVIT/RETURN of Service of Civil Summons and Civil Complaint upon Enterprise Holdings on 03/03/2021. (alave, )
March 23, 2021 Filing 8 AFFIDAVIT/RETURN of Service of Civil Summons and Petition-Circuit Personally upon Enterprise Holdings, Inc. on 03/03/2021. (alave, )
March 23, 2021 Filing 7 PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT against Enterprise Holdings, Inc., filed by Orlen Sealand.(alave, )
March 23, 2021 Filing 6 FIRST AND FINAL NOTICE TO ALL ATTORNEY(S) AND UNREPRESENTED PARTIES IN REMOVED, TRANSFERRED, OR OTHER CASES. To receive any further notice in a case removed or transferred to this court, or special matters including discovery disputes, bankruptcy appeals, or withdrawals of reference, Multi-district litigation (MDL), etc., all attorneys and unrepresented parties must enter an appearance under D.C.COLO.LAttyR 5(a). An attorney must be an active member of this court's bar and be in good standing in accordance with D.C.COLO.LAttyR 3. A waiver of the fee for bar admission may apply in limited situations. (Text Only Entry) (alave, )
March 23, 2021 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint by Enterprise Holdings, Inc. d/b/a Enterprise Rent-A-Car.(Jachimiak, Mark)
March 23, 2021 Filing 4 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. (Jachimiak, Mark)
March 23, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Mark Joseph Jachimiak on behalf of Enterprise Holdings, Inc. d/b/a Enterprise Rent-A-Car (Jachimiak, Mark)
March 23, 2021 Filing 2 Exhibits in Support of #1 Notice of Removal, by Defendant Enterprise Holdings, Inc. d/b/a Enterprise Rent-A-Car. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit Exhibit J)(Jachimiak, Mark)
March 23, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Enterprise Holdings, Inc. d/b/a Enterprise Rent-A-Car from Denver County District Court, Case Number 2020CV33951. (Filing fee $ 402, Receipt Number 1082-7779091), filed by Enterprise Holdings, Inc. d/b/a Enterprise Rent-A-Car.(Jachimiak, Mark)
March 23, 2021 Filing 10 STATE COURT ORDER GRANTING Motion for Extension of Time to Serve Process. By

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sealand v. Enterprise Holdings, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Enterprise Holdings, Inc. d/b/a Enterprise Rent-A-Car
Represented By: Mark Joseph Jachimiak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Enterprise Holdings, Inc. John Doe, Individual doing business as Enterprise Rent-A-Car
Represented By: Mark Joseph Jachimiak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Orlen Sealand
Represented By: Michael Paul Fossenier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?