Otter Products, LLC v. Morris Mercantile LLC et al
Plaintiff: Otter Products, LLC and Treefrog Developments, Inc.
Defendant: Morris Mercantile LLC and Timothy Morris
Case Number: 1:2021cv00858
Filed: March 24, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: R Brooke Jackson
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 44
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 18, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 18, 2021 Filing 18 Proposed Scheduling Order by Plaintiffs Otter Products, LLC, Treefrog Developments, Inc.. (Wucherer, Daniel)
May 12, 2021 Filing 17 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Martha Brewer Motley on behalf of Otter Products, LLC, Treefrog Developments, Inc. Attorney Martha Brewer Motley added to party Otter Products, LLC(pty:pla), Attorney Martha Brewer Motley added to party Treefrog Developments, Inc. (pty:pla) (Motley, Martha)
May 11, 2021 Filing 16 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Daniel C.F. Wucherer on behalf of Otter Products, LLC, Treefrog Developments, Inc. Attorney Daniel C.F. Wucherer added to party Otter Products, LLC(pty:pla), Attorney Daniel C.F. Wucherer added to party Otter Products, LLC(pty:cd), Attorney Daniel C.F. Wucherer added to party Treefrog Developments, Inc. (pty:pla), Attorney Daniel C.F. Wucherer added to party Treefrog Developments, Inc. (pty:cd) (Wucherer, Daniel)
May 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #13 Unopposed MOTION to Amend/Correct/Modify #7 Answer to Complaint,Counterclaim, by Counter Claimants Timothy Morris, Morris Mercantile LLC, Defendants Timothy Morris, Morris Mercantile LLC. By Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 5/6/2021. Text Only Entry. (rbjsec. )
May 6, 2021 Filing 14 ANSWER/REPLY to #7 Answer to Complaint,, Counterclaim, Attorney William D. Kloss added to party Otter Products, LLC(pty:cd), Attorney William D. Kloss added to party Treefrog Developments, Inc. (pty:cd) by Otter Products, LLC, Treefrog Developments, Inc..(Kloss, William)
May 6, 2021 Filing 13 Unopposed MOTION to Amend/Correct/Modify #7 Answer to Complaint,, Counterclaim, by Counter Claimants Timothy Morris, Morris Mercantile LLC, Defendants Timothy Morris, Morris Mercantile LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Oertli, Richard)
May 3, 2021 Filing 12 NOTICE re #7 Answer to Complaint,, Counterclaim, Dismissal of One Counterclaim by Counter Claimants Timothy Morris, Morris Mercantile LLC, Defendants Timothy Morris, Morris Mercantile LLC (Oertli, Richard)
May 3, 2021 Filing 11 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance after reinstatement by Richard Albert Oertli on behalf of Timothy Morris, Morris Mercantile LLC (Oertli, Richard)
April 29, 2021 Filing 10 ADVISORY NOTICE TO ATTORNEY AND COURT: Under D.C.COLO.LAttyR 3(a), Richard Albert Oertli was administratively removed from the court's attorney roll and barred from filing electronically under CM/ECF for failing to pay the 2020 Biennial Fee. Counsel must complete a Bar/ECF application through counsel's existing Attorney Services Portal account and pay the full application fee to be restored to the attorney roll and CM/ECF. Upon reinstatement, counsel must file a Notice of Entry of Appearance in this case. (Text Only Entry) (tnguy)
April 16, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by William D. Kloss on behalf of Otter Products, LLC, Treefrog Developments, Inc. Attorney William D. Kloss added to party Otter Products, LLC(pty:pla), Attorney William D. Kloss added to party Treefrog Developments, Inc. (pty:pla) (Kloss, William)
April 15, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Richard Albert Oertli on behalf of Timothy Morris, Morris Mercantile LLC (Oertli, Richard)
April 15, 2021 Filing 7 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, Attorney Richard Albert Oertli added to party Timothy Morris(pty:dft), Attorney Richard Albert Oertli added to party Morris Mercantile LLC(pty:dft), COUNTERCLAIM against Otter Products, LLC, Treefrog Developments, Inc. by Morris Mercantile LLC, Timothy Morris. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Otter Federal Cases)(Oertli, Richard)
March 29, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Tyler Brent Pensyl on behalf of Otter Products, LLC, Treefrog Developments, Inc. Attorney Tyler Brent Pensyl added to party Otter Products, LLC(pty:pla), Attorney Tyler Brent Pensyl added to party Treefrog Developments, Inc. (pty:pla) (Pensyl, Tyler)
March 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 MINUTE ORDER: Due to the COVID-19 pandemic the Court will not hold a Scheduling Conference. The Court requests that counsel confer and attempt to agree on a schedule and submit a proposed scheduling order no later than 45 days after the answer, motion to dismiss or other response to the complaint is filed pointing out any areas of disagreement. Please email the proposed order to Jackson_Chambers@cod.uscourts.gov in Word format and efile into CM/ECF. The Court will review the proposed order and make such rulings as are appropriate. The proposed scheduling order should be prepared as described in the local rules. A copy of instructions for the preparation of a scheduling order and a form scheduling order can be downloaded from the Courts website www.cod.uscourts.gov/CourtOperations/RulesProcedures/Forms.aspx. By Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 3/25/2021. Text Only Entry (rbjsec. )
March 24, 2021 Filing 4 Report re Patent/Trademark: Report on the filing of an action emailed (NEF) to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (jtorr, )
March 24, 2021 Filing 3 SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (jtorr, )
March 24, 2021 Filing 2 Case assigned to Judge R. Brooke Jackson and drawn to Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter. Text Only Entry. (jtorr, )
March 24, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Timothy Morris, Morris Mercantile, LLC (Filing fee $ 402,Receipt Number 1082-7780778)Attorney Martha Louise Fitzgerald added to party Otter Products, LLC(pty:pla), Attorney Martha Louise Fitzgerald added to party Treefrog Developments, Inc. (pty:pla), filed by Otter Products, LLC, Treefrog Developments, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons)(Fitzgerald, Martha)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Otter Products, LLC v. Morris Mercantile LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Otter Products, LLC
Represented By: Martha Louise Fitzgerald
Represented By: William D. Kloss
Represented By: Martha Brewer Motley
Represented By: Daniel C.F. Wucherer
Represented By: Tyler Brent Pensyl
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Treefrog Developments, Inc.
Represented By: Martha Louise Fitzgerald
Represented By: William D. Kloss
Represented By: Martha Brewer Motley
Represented By: Daniel C.F. Wucherer
Represented By: Tyler Brent Pensyl
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Morris Mercantile LLC
Represented By: Richard Albert Oertli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Timothy Morris
Represented By: Richard Albert Oertli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?