Moody et al v. Microport Orthopedics, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: William B Moody and Leslie S Moody
Defendant: Microport Orthopedics, Inc. and Onkos Surgical, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2021cv00937
Filed: April 1, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Daniel D Domenico
Referring Judge: Scott T Varholak
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 17, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 9, 2021 Filing 39 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Thomas Robert Watson on behalf of Onkos Surgical, Inc.Attorney Thomas Robert Watson added to party Onkos Surgical, Inc.(pty:dft) (Watson, Thomas)
September 9, 2021 Filing 38 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Kevin Alexander on behalf of Onkos Surgical, Inc.Attorney Kevin Alexander added to party Onkos Surgical, Inc.(pty:dft) (Alexander, Kevin)
August 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER re: #36 Stipulation for Extension of Time filed by Leslie S Moody, William B Moody. Plaintiffs' response to Onkos's Motion to Dismiss is due on or before September 17, 2021. SO ORDERED by Judge Daniel D. Domenico on 8/27/2021. Text Only Entry (dddlc3, )
August 26, 2021 Filing 36 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to Respond to Defendant Onkos Surgical, Inc.'s Partial Motion to Dismiss [Doc. 28] by Plaintiffs Leslie S Moody, William B Moody. (McLaughlin, George)
August 19, 2021 Filing 35 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Julie Y Park on behalf of Microport Orthopedics, Inc.Attorney Julie Y Park added to party Microport Orthopedics, Inc.(pty:dft) (Park, Julie)
August 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 34 SCHEDULING ORDER: by Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak on 8/10/2021. (morti, )
August 10, 2021 Filing 33 MINUTE ENTRY for Telephonic Scheduling Conference held before Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak on 8/10/2021. Discovery due by 10/5/2022. Dispositive Motions due by 11/9/2022. FTR: 402. (morti, )
August 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 32 MINUTE ORDER The parties may participate in the Scheduling Conference set for 8/10/2021 09:00 AM TELEPHONICALLY by calling 888.808.6929 at the scheduled time and utilizing access code: 2805116#. SO ORDERED, by Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak on 8/9/2021. Text Only Entry (stvlc1, )
August 6, 2021 Filing 31 Defendant's ANSWER to #19 Amended Complaint Second Amended Complaint by Microport Orthopedics, Inc..(Bosman, Erin)
August 6, 2021 Filing 30 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Erin M. Bosman on behalf of Microport Orthopedics, Inc.Attorney Erin M. Bosman added to party Microport Orthopedics, Inc.(pty:dft) (Bosman, Erin)
August 6, 2021 Filing 29 ANSWER to #19 Amended Complaint by Onkos Surgical, Inc..(Quinn, Thomas)
August 6, 2021 Filing 28 Partial MOTION to Dismiss by Defendant Onkos Surgical, Inc.. (Quinn, Thomas)
August 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 72(a) and (b), this case is referred to the assigned United States Magistrate Judge to (1) convene a scheduling conference under Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b) and enter a scheduling order meeting the requirements of Local Civ. R. 16.2, (2) conduct such status conferences and issue such orders necessary for compliance with the scheduling order, including amendments or modifications of the scheduling order upon a showing of good cause, (3) hear and determine pretrial matters, including discovery and other non-dispositive motions, (4) conduct hearings, including evidentiary hearings, and submit proposed findings of fact and recommendations for rulings on dispositive motions, and (5) pursuant to Local Civ. R. 16.6 and at the discretion of the Magistrate Judge, convene such early neutral evaluation and/or settlement conferences and direct related procedures as may facilitate resolution of this case without the necessity of a motion or prior authorization of the undersigned. SO ORDERED by Judge Daniel D. Domenico on 8/5/2021. Text Only Entry (dddlc3, )
August 3, 2021 Filing 26 Proposed Scheduling Order by Plaintiffs Leslie S Moody, William B Moody. (McLaughlin, George)
August 3, 2021 Filing 25 CASE REASSIGNED pursuant to #24 Consent to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge. All parties do not consent. This case is randomly reassigned to Judge Daniel D. Domenico and drawn to Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak. All future pleadings should be designated as 21-cv-00937-DDD. (Text Only Entry) (agarc, )
August 3, 2021 Filing 24 CONSENT to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge by Defendant Microport Orthopedics, Inc. All parties do not consent.. (Cain, Lyndsey)
August 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 23 MINUTE ORDER Pursuant to 7 Order on Motion to Reset, the form indicating consent/nonconsent to magistrate judge jurisdiction was due by 7/27/2021. No such form has been filed. Accordingly, the parties shall jointly file the magistrate consent form by end of day tomorrow, 8/3/2021. SO ORDERED, by Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak on 8/2/2021. Text Only Entry (stvlc2, )
July 28, 2021 Filing 22 NOTICE of Filing Amended Pleading re 20 Minute Order,,, by Plaintiffs Leslie S Moody, William B Moody (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Second Amended Complaint)(McLaughlin, George)
July 28, 2021 Filing 21 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. (Boehmer, Margaret)
July 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 20 MINUTE ORDER This matter is before the Court on #19 Amended Complaint. Pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 15.1(a): "A party who files an amended pleading under Fed. R. Civ. P.15(a)(1) or with the consent of the opposing party shall file a separate notice of filing the amended pleading and shall attach as an exhibit a copy of the amended pleading which strikes through... the text to be deleted and underlines the text to be added." The Second Amended Complaint indicates that it has been filed with consent of the opposing parties; however, no separate notice was filed. Accordingly, on or before 7/30/2021 Plaintiffs shall file a separate notice pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 15.1(a). SO ORDERED, by Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak on 7/26/2021. Text Only Entry (stvlc2, )
July 23, 2021 Filing 19 AMENDED COMPLAINT Second Amended Complaint against Microport Orthopedics, Inc., Onkos Surgical, Inc., filed by William B Moody, Leslie S Moody.(McLaughlin, George)
July 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting #15 and #17 Motions for Extensions of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond. Defendants Onkos Surgical, Inc. and Microport Orthopedics, Inc. shall file their answers, or otherwise respond, on or before 7/30/2021. SO ORDERED, by Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak on 7/16/2021. Text Only Entry(stvlc2, )
July 16, 2021 Filing 17 Stipulated MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond re #5 Amended Complaint by Defendant Onkos Surgical, Inc.. (Boehmer, Margaret)
July 16, 2021 Filing 16 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent Microport Orthopedics Holdings Inc., Corporate Parent MicroPort Scientific Cooperatief U.A., Corporate Parent MicroPort Orthopedics Corp., Corporate Parent MicroPort Surgical Corp., Corporate Parent Shanghai MicroPort Orthopedics Co., Ltd., Corporate Parent MicroPort Orthopedics (Suzhou) Co., Corporate Parent MicroPort Scientific Corporation for Microport Orthopedics, Inc.. (Cain, Lyndsey)
July 16, 2021 Filing 15 Stipulated MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond re #5 Amended Complaint by Defendant Microport Orthopedics, Inc.. (Cain, Lyndsey)
July 16, 2021 Filing 14 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Lyndsey Haas Cain on behalf of Microport Orthopedics, Inc.Attorney Lyndsey Haas Cain added to party Microport Orthopedics, Inc.(pty:dft) (Cain, Lyndsey)
July 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #12 Motion for Extension of Time. The deadline for designating nonparties at fault is extended to 8/16/2021. SO ORDERED, by Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak on 7/1/2021. Text Only Entry(stvlc2, )
June 30, 2021 Filing 12 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Designate Non-Parties at Fault by Defendant Onkos Surgical, Inc.. (Boehmer, Margaret)
June 2, 2021 Filing 11 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by William B Moody, Leslie S Moody. Onkos Surgical, Inc. waiver sent on 5/17/2021, answer due 7/16/2021. (McLaughlin, George)
May 26, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Margaret Louise Boehmer on behalf of Onkos Surgical, Inc.Attorney Margaret Louise Boehmer added to party Onkos Surgical, Inc.(pty:dft) (Boehmer, Margaret)
May 26, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Thomas Baker Quinn on behalf of Onkos Surgical, Inc.Attorney Thomas Baker Quinn added to party Onkos Surgical, Inc.(pty:dft) (Quinn, Thomas)
May 26, 2021 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by William B Moody, Leslie S Moody. Microport Orthopedics, Inc. waiver sent on 5/17/2021, answer due 7/16/2021. (McLaughlin, George)
May 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #6 Motion to Reset. The Scheduling Conference set for 6/10/2021 is VACATED and RESET for 8/10/2021 09:00 AM in Courtroom A 402 before Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak. Consent Form due by 7/27/2021. Proposed Scheduling Order due 8/3/2021. SO ORDERED, by Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak on 5/17/2021. Text Only Entry(stvlc2, )
May 17, 2021 Filing 6 MOTION to Reset Dates and Deadlines by Plaintiffs Leslie S Moody, William B Moody. (McLaughlin, George)
May 17, 2021 Filing 5 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Microport Orthopedics, Inc., Onkos Surgical, Inc., filed by William B Moody, Leslie S Moody.(McLaughlin, George)
April 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER Setting Scheduling Conference for 6/10/2021 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak. Consent Form due by 5/27/2021. Proposed Scheduling Order due 6/3/2021, by Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak on 4/2/2021. (jgonz, )
April 1, 2021 Filing 3 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1, direct assignment of civil actions to full time magistrate judges. (jsalz, )
April 1, 2021 Filing 2 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak. Text Only Entry. (jsalz, )
April 1, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Microport Orthopedics, Inc., Onkos Surgical, Inc. (Filing fee $ 402,Receipt Number 1082-7795175)Attorney George E. McLaughlin added to party Leslie S Moody(pty:pla), Attorney George E. McLaughlin added to party William B Moody(pty:pla), filed by William B Moody, Leslie S Moody. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(McLaughlin, George)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Moody et al v. Microport Orthopedics, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Microport Orthopedics, Inc.
Represented By: Erin M. Bosman
Represented By: Julie Y Park
Represented By: Lyndsey Haas Cain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Onkos Surgical, Inc.
Represented By: Thomas Baker Quinn
Represented By: Margaret Louise Boehmer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William B Moody
Represented By: George E. McLaughlin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leslie S Moody
Represented By: George E. McLaughlin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?