Speckman et al v. Wells Fargo Home Mortgage NA et al
Plaintiff: Mr Joel Speckman, Ms Channa Speckman, Joel Speckman and Channa Speckman
Defendant: Minuteman Financial Inc, Wells Fargo Home Mortgage Inc and Wells Fargo Home Mortgage, NA
Case Number: 1:2021cv01052
Filed: April 15, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Philip A Brimmer
Referring Judge: Kristen L Mix
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 9, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 9, 2021 Filing 20 MOTION for Clerk's Entry of Default as to Minuteman Financial by Plaintiffs Channa Speckman, Joel Speckman. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Jones, Jessamyn) Modified on 6/10/2021 to edit document title. (sphil, ).
June 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 MINUTE ORDER. In accordance with the Chief Judges General Order 2021-6 and increased access to courthouse facilities, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Scheduling Conference set for July 13, 2021, at 11:00 a.m. will be held IN PERSON in Courtroom 401, Fourth Floor, Alfred A. Arraj United States Courthouse, 901 19th Street, Denver, Colorado, UNLESS permission to appear by telephone is granted by the Court following the filing of a written motion by a party. See Section C of Order Setting Scheduling/Planning Conference. by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 6/9/2021. Text Only Entry (klmlc2, )
June 2, 2021 Filing 18 MOTION to Dismiss by Defendant Wells Fargo Home Mortgage, NA. (Hicks, Andrea)
June 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER by Chief Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 6/01/2021 re: defendant Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.'s Motion to Dismiss [Docket No. #16 ] is STRICKEN for failure to comply with III.A of this Court's Practice Standards. "All motions... shall not exceed fifteen pages." Defendant may refile a complying motion on or before June 3, 2021. Text Only Entry(pabsec2)
June 1, 2021 Filing 16 STRICKEN MOTION to Dismiss by Defendant Wells Fargo Home Mortgage, NA. (Hicks, Andrea) Modified on 6/1/2021 (pabsec2, ).
May 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 05/20/21, Setting Scheduling/Planning Conference. Proposed Scheduling Order due by 7/6/2021. Scheduling/Planning Conference set for 7/13/2021 11:00 AM in Courtroom A 401 before Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix. (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1, #2 Attachment 2, #3 Attachment 3) (nmarb, )
May 10, 2021 Filing 14 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to Answer or Respond to the Complaint by Defendant Wells Fargo Home Mortgage, NA. Wells Fargo Home Mortgage, NA answer due 6/1/2021. (Hicks, Andrea)
May 10, 2021 Filing 13 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Andrea McDonald Hicks on behalf of Wells Fargo Home Mortgage, NAAttorney Andrea McDonald Hicks added to party Wells Fargo Home Mortgage, NA(pty:dft) (Hicks, Andrea)
April 29, 2021 Filing 12 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance for Jennifer Elle Tauer by Jennifer Elizabeth Tauer on behalf of All Plaintiffs Attorney Jennifer Elizabeth Tauer added to party Channa Speckman(pty:pla), Attorney Jennifer Elizabeth Tauer added to party Joel Speckman(pty:pla) (Tauer, Jennifer)
April 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix for non-dispositive matters. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 72(a) and (b), this case is referred to the assigned United States Magistrate Judge to (1) convene a scheduling conference under Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b) and enter a scheduling order meeting the requirements of D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.2, (2) conduct such status conferences and issue such orders necessary for compliance with the scheduling order, including amendments or modifications of the scheduling order upon a showing of good cause, (3) hear and determine pretrial matters, including discovery and other non-dispositive motions, and (4) conduct a pretrial conference and enter a pretrial order. Court sponsored alternative dispute resolution is governed by D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.6. On the recommendation or informal request of the magistrate judge or on the request of the parties by motion, this court may direct the parties to engage in an early neutral evaluation, a settlement conference, or another alternative dispute resolution proceeding, by Chief Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 4/22/2021. Text Only Entry (pabsec2)
April 21, 2021 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Joel Speckman, Channa Speckman. Minuteman Financial Inc served on 4/20/2021, answer due 5/11/2021. (Jones, Jessamyn)
April 20, 2021 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Joel Speckman, Channa Speckman. Wells Fargo Home Mortgage, NA served on 4/20/2021, answer due 5/11/2021. (Jones, Jessamyn)
April 20, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance for J. Elle Tauer by Jessamyn Lynn Jones on behalf of Channa Speckman, Joel Speckman (Jones, Jessamyn)
April 16, 2021 Filing 7 SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (jsalz, )
April 16, 2021 Filing 6 Case assigned to Chief Judge Philip A. Brimmer and drawn to Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix. Text Only Entry. (jsalz, )
April 16, 2021 Filing 5 ADVISORY NOTICE OF NONCOMPLIANCE WITH COURT RULES/PROCEDURES: re: #4 Complaint, filed by attorney Jessamyn L. Jones. Attorney or pro se has used an incorrect signature format in violation of D.C.COLO.LCivR 5.1(a) and 4.3(a) of the Electronic Case Filing Procedures (Civil cases). DO NOT REFILE THE DOCUMENT. In the future, the filer must use the correct format for the signature block on all future documents. (Text Only Entry) (jsalz, )
April 16, 2021 Filing 4 COMPLAINT AND JURY DEMAND against Minuteman Financial Inc, Wells Fargo Home Mortgage Inc (Filing fee $ 402,Receipt Number 1082-7820792)Attorney Jessamyn Lynn Jones added to party Channa Speckman(pty:pla), Attorney Jessamyn Lynn Jones added to party Joel Speckman(pty:pla), filed by Joel Speckman, Channa Speckman. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Summons to Minuteman, #3 Summons Summons to Wells Fargo)(Jones, Jessamyn)
April 15, 2021 Filing 3 ADVISORY NOTICE OF NONCOMPLIANCE WITH COURT RULES/PROCEDURES:re: #1 Complaint, filed by attorney Jennifer Elizabeth Tauer.Attorney or pro se has used an incorrect signature format in violation of D.C.COLO.LCivR 5.1(a) and 4.3(a) of the Electronic Case Filing Procedures (Civil cases). DO NOT REFILE THE DOCUMENT. . In the future, the filer must use the correct format for the signature block on all future documents. (Text Only Entry) (jsalz, )
April 15, 2021 Filing 2 ADVISORY NOTICE OF NONCOMPLIANCE WITH COURT RULES/PROCEDURES: re: #1 Complaint, filed by attorney Jennifer Elizabeth Tauer. The document is incorrectly formatted. DO NOT REFILE THE DOCUMENT. Action to take - future documents must be filed pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 10.1 (Text Only Entry) (jsalz, )
April 15, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 402,Receipt Number 1082-7819879)Attorney Jennifer Elizabeth Tauer added to party Channa Speckman(pty:pla), Attorney Jennifer Elizabeth Tauer added to party Joel Speckman(pty:pla), filed by Joel Speckman, Channa Speckman. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Minuteman, #3 Summons Wells Fargo)(Tauer, Jennifer)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Speckman et al v. Wells Fargo Home Mortgage NA et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mr Joel Speckman
Represented By: Jennifer Elizabeth Tauer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ms Channa Speckman
Represented By: Jennifer Elizabeth Tauer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joel Speckman
Represented By: Jessamyn Lynn Jones
Represented By: J. Elle Tauer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Channa Speckman
Represented By: Jessamyn Lynn Jones
Represented By: J. Elle Tauer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Minuteman Financial Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Home Mortgage Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Home Mortgage, NA
Represented By: Andrea McDonald Hicks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?