Kim v. Kettell et al
Plaintiff: Andrew Dosa Kim
Defendant: PolyPort, Inc., Chloe Kettell and Partha Ray
Case Number: 1:2021cv01152
Filed: April 27, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: N Reid Neureiter
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35 U.S.C. ยง 0256
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 25, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER OF REFERENCE. Pursuant to the consent of the parties to the jurisdiction of the magistrate judge #14 , this case is referred to Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter for all purposes pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c), by Chief Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 6/25/2021. Text Only Entry (pabsec2)
June 23, 2021 Filing 14 CONSENT to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge by Plaintiff Andrew Dosa Kim All parties consent.. (Williams, Robyn)
June 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 Minute ORDER by Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter on 16 June 2021. It is hereby ORDERED that the Unopposed Moton for Extension of Time toAnswer or Otherwise Respond to the Plaintiff's Complaint (Dkt. #12 ) is GRANTED for good cause shown. The deadline for Defendants to respond to the Complaint is extended to July 2, 2021. The Court notes that the other deadlines in this matter are not modified. PLEASE READ ATTACHED MINUTE ORDER. (cmadr, )
June 15, 2021 Filing 12 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond re #1 Complaint, by Defendants Chloe Kettell, PolyPort, Inc., Partha Ray. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Gordon, Ryan)
May 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Minute ORDER by Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter on 14 May 2021. It is HEREBY ORDERED that the Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint, Dkt. #10 , is GRANTED for good cause shown. The deadline for Defendant to respond to the Complaint is extended to June 18, 2021. PLEASE READ ATTACHED MINUTE ORDER. (cmadr, )
May 14, 2021 Filing 10 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond re #1 Complaint, by Plaintiff Andrew Dosa Kim. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Williams, Robyn)
May 3, 2021 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Andrew Dosa Kim. Chloe Kettell served on 4/28/2021, answer due 5/19/2021; Partha Ray served on 4/28/2021, answer due 5/19/2021. (Williams, Robyn)
April 29, 2021 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Andrew Dosa Kim. PolyPort, Inc. served on 4/28/2021, answer due 5/19/2021. (Williams, Robyn)
April 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING/PLANNING CONFERENCE AND SETTING DEADLINE FOR FILING OF CONSENT/NON-CONSENT FORM by Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter on 28 April 2021. Consent Form due by 6/23/2021. Proposed Scheduling Order due 6/30/2021. Scheduling Conference set for 7/7/2021 10:30 AM in Courtroom C203 before Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter. The Scheduling Conference will be conducted via telephone. The parties are directed to call the conference line as a participant at (888) 398-2342, Access Code 5755390# at the scheduled time. (cmadr, )
April 27, 2021 Filing 6 SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (alave, )
April 27, 2021 Filing 5 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1, direct assignment of civil actions to full time magistrate judges. (alave, )
April 27, 2021 Filing 4 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter. Text Only Entry. (alave, )
April 27, 2021 Filing 3 Report re Patent/Trademark: Report on the filing of an action emailed (NEF) to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. Modified on 4/29/2021 to include case number. (alave, ).
April 27, 2021 Filing 2 SUMMONS REQUEST as to Chloe Kettell, Partha Ray and PolyPort, Inc. by Plaintiff Andrew Dosa Kim. (Williams, Robyn)
April 27, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Correction of Inventorship, Unjust Enrichment, and Intentional Infliction of Emotional Distress against Chloe Kettell, PolyPort, Inc., Partha Ray (Filing fee $ 402,Receipt Number 1082-7837389)Attorney Robyn Teresa Williams added to party Andrew Dosa Kim(pty:pla), filed by Andrew Dosa Kim. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Civil Cover Sheet)(Williams, Robyn)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kim v. Kettell et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PolyPort, Inc.
Represented By: Ryan Harrison Gordon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chloe Kettell
Represented By: Ryan Harrison Gordon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Partha Ray
Represented By: Ryan Harrison Gordon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andrew Dosa Kim
Represented By: Robyn Teresa Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?