Greene v. JJLV LLC et al
Plaintiff: Joe Greene
Defendant: JJLV LLC, Higher Cut LLC, Jonathan David Vesely and JJLV LLC doing business as Cannaves
Case Number: 1:2021cv01182
Filed: April 29, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Philip A Brimmer
Referring Judge: Kathleen M Tafoya
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 17, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 23, 2021 Filing 17 Summons Returned Unexecuted by Joe Greene as to Higher Cut LLC. (Dodson, Penn)
June 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 AMENDED ORDER SETTING INITIAL CASE DEADLINES. Proposed Scheduling Order due 9/27/2021. By Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 6/23/2021. (evaug )
June 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 MINUTE ORDER granting #13 Motion for Extension of Time. The proposed scheduling order deadline is VACATED and will be reset by separate order. By Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 06/23/21. Text Only Entry(kmtlc2)
June 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 MEMORANDUM regarding #13 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Proposed Scheduling Order filed by Joe Greene. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya, by Chief Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 6/23/2021. Text Only Entry (pabsec2)
June 23, 2021 Filing 13 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Proposed Scheduling Order by Plaintiff Joe Greene. (Dodson, Penn)
June 23, 2021 Filing 12 Summons Returned Unexecuted by Joe Greene as to JJLV LLC. (Dodson, Penn)
June 23, 2021 Filing 11 Summons Returned Unexecuted by Joe Greene as to Jonathan David Vesely. (Dodson, Penn)
May 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER SETTING INITIAL CASE DEADLINES. Proposed Scheduling Order due 6/28/2021. By Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 05/03/2021. (evaug )
April 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya for non-dispositive matters. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 72(a) and (b), this case is referred to the assigned United States Magistrate Judge to (1) convene a scheduling conference under Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b) and enter a scheduling order meeting the requirements of D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.2, (2) conduct such status conferences and issue such orders necessary for compliance with the scheduling order, including amendments or modifications of the scheduling order upon a showing of good cause, (3) hear and determine pretrial matters, including discovery and other non-dispositive motions, and (4) conduct a pretrial conference and enter a pretrial order. Court sponsored alternative dispute resolution is governed by D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.6. On the recommendation or informal request of the magistrate judge or on the request of the parties by motion, this court may direct the parties to engage in an early neutral evaluation, a settlement conference, or another alternative dispute resolution proceeding, by Chief Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 4/30/2021. Text Only Entry (pabsec2)
April 30, 2021 Filing 8 SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (alave, )
April 30, 2021 Filing 7 Case assigned to Chief Judge Philip A. Brimmer and drawn to Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya. Text Only Entry. (alave, )
April 30, 2021 Filing 6 ADVISORY NOTICE OF NONCOMPLIANCE WITH COURT RULES/PROCEDURES:re: #1 Complaint, filed by attorney Penn Anderson Dodson. DO NOT REFILE THE DOCUMENT. Action to take - counsel must submit a change of contact request through the Attorney Services Portal Account pursuant to D.C.COLO.LAttyR 5(c) and 3.5 of the Electronic Case Filing Procedures (Civil cases).(Text Only Entry) (alave, )
April 29, 2021 Filing 5 SUMMONS REQUEST as to JJLV LLC d/b/a Cannaves re #1 Complaint, by Plaintiff Joe Greene. (Dodson, Penn)
April 29, 2021 Filing 4 SUMMONS REQUEST as to Higher Cut LLC re #1 Complaint, by Plaintiff Joe Greene. (Dodson, Penn)
April 29, 2021 Filing 3 SUMMONS REQUEST as to Jonathan David Vesely re #1 Complaint, by Plaintiff Joe Greene. (Dodson, Penn)
April 29, 2021 Filing 2 SUMMONS REQUEST as to Jonathan David Vesely re #1 Complaint, by Plaintiff Joe Greene. (Dodson, Penn)
April 29, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Higher Cut LLC, JJLV LLC, Jonathan David Vesely (Filing fee $ 402,Receipt Number 1082-7843610)Attorney Penn Anderson Dodson added to party Joe Greene(pty:pla), filed by Joe Greene. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Dodson, Penn)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Greene v. JJLV LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JJLV LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Higher Cut LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jonathan David Vesely
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JJLV LLC doing business as Cannaves
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joe Greene
Represented By: Penn Anderson Dodson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?