Citizens for A Healthy Community et al v. United States Department of Interior et al
Plaintiff: WildEarth Guardians, Wilderness Workshop, High Country Conservation Advocates, Citizens for A Healthy Community and Center for Biological Diversity
Defendant: United States Department of Interior, United States Forest Service, United States Bureau of Land Management and Gunnison Energy LLC
Case Number: 1:2021cv01268
Filed: May 10, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Marcia S Krieger
Nature of Suit: APA Review/Appeal
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 4231 National Environmental Policy Act (NEPA)
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 29, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 34 STIPULATION re #33 Proposed Bill of Costs, by Plaintiffs Center for Biological Diversity, Citizens for A Healthy Community, High Country Conservation Advocates, WildEarth Guardians, Wilderness Workshop. (Hornbein, Melissa)
June 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 33 Proposed Bill of Costs by Plaintiffs Center for Biological Diversity, Citizens for A Healthy Community, High Country Conservation Advocates, WildEarth Guardians, Wilderness Workshop. (Attachments: #1 Receipt Filing fee, #2 Receipt Service mailing)(Hornbein, Melissa)
May 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 32 FINAL JUDGMENT in favor of Center for Biological Diversity, Citizens for A Healthy Community, High Country Conservation Advocates, WildEarth Guardians, Wilderness Workshop and against Gunnison Energy LLC, United States Bureau of Land Management, United States Department of Interior, United States Forest Service pursuant to #31 Opinion and Order Remanding Action, by Clerk on 5/20/2022. (ebuch)
May 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 31 OPINION AND ORDER REMANDING ACTION: Granting in part and denying in part #21 Agencies' Motion for Remand, by Judge Marcia S. Krieger on 5/19/2022. (ebuch)
May 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ADVISORY NOTICE OF NONCOMPLIANCE WITH COURT RULES/PROCEDURES: re #29 Notice of Entry of Appearance filed by attorney Edward B. Zukoski. DO NOT REFILE THE DOCUMENT. Action to take - counsel must submit a change of contact request through the Manage my Account tab at the PACER website at https://www.pacer.gov/, pursuant to D.C.COLO.LAttyR 5(c) and 3.5 of the Electronic Case Filing Procedures (Civil cases).(Text Only Entry) (sdunb, )
May 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 29 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Edward Breckenridge Zukoski on behalf of Center for Biological DiversityAttorney Edward Breckenridge Zukoski added to party Center for Biological Diversity(pty:pla) (Zukoski, Edward)
April 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER granting #27 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Diana Michele Dascalu-Joffe terminated. By Judge Marcia S. Krieger on 4/27/22. Text Only Entry(msklc2, )
April 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 27 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Plaintiff Center for Biological Diversity. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Dascalu-Joffe, Diana)
March 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 26 REPLY to Response to #21 MOTION to Remand filed by Defendants United States Bureau of Land Management, United States Department of Interior, United States Forest Service. (Doktor, Leilani)
March 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER granting #24 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply: Reply due 3/31/22. By Judge Marcia S. Krieger on 3/23/22. Text Only Entry(msklc2, )
March 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 24 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #21 MOTION to Remand by Defendants United States Bureau of Land Management, United States Department of Interior, United States Forest Service. (Doktor, Leilani)
March 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 23 RESPONSE to #21 MOTION to Remand filed by Defendant Gunnison Energy LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Nabavian Declaration, #2 Exhibit B - Email from Doktor to Counsel)(Barron, Mark)
March 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 22 BRIEF in Opposition to #21 MOTION to Remand Without Vacatur filed by Plaintiffs Center for Biological Diversity, Citizens for A Healthy Community, High Country Conservation Advocates, WildEarth Guardians, Wilderness Workshop. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Peter Hart, #2 Exhibit A to Declaration of Peter Hart, #3 Notice of Service Interruption)(Hornbein, Melissa)
February 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 21 MOTION to Remand by Defendants United States Bureau of Land Management, United States Department of Interior, United States Forest Service. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(Doktor, Leilani)
January 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER granting #19 Motion for Extension of Time to File: Adm Defendants and Intervenors Response Brief(s) due by 2/18/2022. Adm Plaintiff Reply Brief due by 3/11/2022. by Judge Marcia S. Krieger on 1/24/22. Text Only Entry(msklc2, )
January 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 19 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response and Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment by Defendants United States Bureau of Land Management, United States Department of Interior, United States Forest Service. (Doktor, Leilani)
December 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 NOTICE of Filing of Document to Complete the Administrative Record by Defendants United States Bureau of Land Management, United States Department of Interior, United States Forest Service (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit)(Doktor, Leilani)
December 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 BRIEF Administrative Record, Plaintiffs' Opening Brief by Plaintiffs Center for Biological Diversity, Citizens for A Healthy Community, High Country Conservation Advocates, WildEarth Guardians, Wilderness Workshop. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Declaration of Peter Hart, #2 Exhibit 2 - Declaration of Natasha Legere, #3 Exhibit 3 - Declaration of Jeremy Nichols, #4 Exhibit 4 - Declaration of Matt Reed, #5 Exhibit 5 - Declaration of Mark Waltermire, #6 Exhibit 6 - COGCC Spill Report)(Hornbein, Melissa)
November 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 Conventionally Submitted Material : Flash Drive to #15 Notice of Revised Administrative Record by Defendant United States Department of Interior. Located in Clerk's Office D-5-9. Text Only Entry. (sdunb, )
November 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 NOTICE of Lodging of the Revised Administrative Record by Defendants United States Bureau of Land Management, United States Department of Interior, United States Forest Service (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Affidavit, #3 Exhibit)(Doktor, Leilani)
October 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 NOTICE of Lodging of the Administrative Record by Defendants United States Bureau of Land Management, United States Department of Interior, United States Forest Service (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Forest Service AR Certification, #2 Exhibit BLM AR Certification, #3 Exhibit AR Index)(Doktor, Leilani)
September 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER: The Court adopts the parties' Proposed Joint Case Management Plan #12 and that Plan is deemed to constitute an order of the Court. By Judge Marcia S. Krieger on 9/15/21. (msklc2, )
August 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 NOTICE Proposed Joint Case Management Plan by all parties, filed by Plaintiffs Center for Biological Diversity, Citizens for A Healthy Community, High Country Conservation Advocates, WildEarth Guardians, Wilderness Workshop (Hornbein, Melissa)
July 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,,, and Petition for Review by United States Bureau of Land Management, United States Department of Interior, United States Forest Service.(Doktor, Leilani)
July 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Gunnison Energy LLC. (Answer filed in this case pursuant to #9 Order).(sphil, )
July 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER by Judge Marcia S. Krieger on 7/8/2021, re: #7 Motion to Intervene is GRANTED. ORDERED that Gunnison's Answer to Plaintiffs' Complaint (#7-1) shall be deemed filed on the date on which this order is entered. ORDERED that the clerk shall amend the case caption to add Gunnison as a Defendant in this action and enter the Answer attached to the motion to intervene.(sphil, )
June 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Leilani Doktor on behalf of United States Bureau of Land Management, United States Department of Interior, United States Forest ServiceAttorney Leilani Doktor added to party United States Bureau of Land Management(pty:dft), Attorney Leilani Doktor added to party United States Department of Interior(pty:dft), Attorney Leilani Doktor added to party United States Forest Service(pty:dft) (Doktor, Leilani)
June 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MOTION to Intervene by Defendant Gunnison Energy LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Proposed Answer)(Barron, Mark)
May 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed upon Federal defendant(s) United States Bureau of Land Management served on 5/17/2021, answer due 7/16/2021; United States Department of Interior served on 5/17/2021, answer due 7/16/2021; United States Forest Service served on 5/17/2021, answer due 7/16/2021. (Attachments: #1 Summons Executed / Proof of Service Upon U.S. Defendants, #2 Summons Executed / Proof of Service Upon U.S. Attorney Dist. of Colorado, #3 Summons Executed / Proof of Service Upon U.S. Attorney General)(Hornbein, Melissa)
May 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER DIRECTING PREPARATION OF JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN by Judge Marcia S. Krieger on 5/11/2021. (sphil, )
May 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (alave, )
May 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Case assigned to Judge Marcia S. Krieger. Text Only Entry. (alave, )
May 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. (Hornbein, Melissa)
May 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 402,Receipt Number 1082-7859778)Attorney Melissa Anne Hornbein added to party CITIZENS FOR A HEALTHY COMMUNITY(pty:pla), Attorney Melissa Anne Hornbein added to party Center for Biological Diversity(pty:pla), Attorney Melissa Anne Hornbein added to party High Country Conservation Advocates(pty:pla), Attorney Melissa Anne Hornbein added to party WildEarth Guardians(pty:pla), Attorney Melissa Anne Hornbein added to party Wilderness Workshop(pty:pla), filed by Wilderness Workshop, High Country Conservation Advocates, CITIZENS FOR A HEALTHY COMMUNITY, Center for Biological Diversity, WildEarth Guardians. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Civil Cover Sheet Attachment re. Sec. I(c), #3 Summons Summons USDOI, #4 Summons Summons BLM, #5 Summons Summons USFS, #6 Summons Summons USACO, #7 Summons Summons USATG)(Hornbein, Melissa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Citizens for A Healthy Community et al v. United States Department of Interior et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WildEarth Guardians
Represented By: Melissa Anne Hornbein
Represented By: Diana Michele Dascalu-Joffe
Represented By: Kyle James Tisdel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wilderness Workshop
Represented By: Melissa Anne Hornbein
Represented By: Diana Michele Dascalu-Joffe
Represented By: Kyle James Tisdel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: High Country Conservation Advocates
Represented By: Melissa Anne Hornbein
Represented By: Diana Michele Dascalu-Joffe
Represented By: Kyle James Tisdel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Citizens for A Healthy Community
Represented By: Melissa Anne Hornbein
Represented By: Diana Michele Dascalu-Joffe
Represented By: Kyle James Tisdel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Center for Biological Diversity
Represented By: Melissa Anne Hornbein
Represented By: Diana Michele Dascalu-Joffe
Represented By: Kyle James Tisdel
Represented By: Edward Breckenridge Zukoski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Department of Interior
Represented By: Leilani Doktor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Forest Service
Represented By: Leilani Doktor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Bureau of Land Management
Represented By: Leilani Doktor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gunnison Energy LLC
Represented By: Mark Simeon Barron
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?