Lenart v. Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Loriann Lenart
Defendant: Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Teva Women's Health, Inc. doing business as Teva Women's Health, LLC, Teva Women's Health LLC, CooperSurgical, Inc., The Cooper Companies, Inc and Cooper Companies, Inc, The
Case Number: 1:2021cv01308
Filed: May 13, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Scott T Varholak
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 14, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 14, 2021 Filing 17 Interdistrict Transmittal of Documents via e-mail to the Northern District of Georgia pursuant to the Certified Copy of the Conditional Transfer Order. InterdistrictTransfer_GAND@gand.uscourts.gov. Text Only Entry (evana, )
June 14, 2021 Filing 16 CERTIFIED COPY OF CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-24) from the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation pursuant to 28 USC 1407, transferring from the District of Colorado 21-cv-01308 STV, to the Northern District of Georgia, to become part of MDL 2974, by Clerk on 6/14/2021. (evana, )
June 11, 2021 Filing 15 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Loriann Lenart. Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. served on 5/21/2021, answer due 6/11/2021. (Cuneo, Carolyn)
June 11, 2021 Filing 14 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Loriann Lenart. Teva Women's Health LLC served on 5/21/2021, answer due 6/11/2021. (Cuneo, Carolyn)
June 11, 2021 Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Loriann Lenart. Teva Women's Health, Inc. served on 5/21/2021, answer due 6/11/2021. (Cuneo, Carolyn)
June 11, 2021 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Loriann Lenart. CooperSurgical, Inc. served on 5/21/2021, answer due 6/11/2021. (Cuneo, Carolyn)
June 11, 2021 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Loriann Lenart. Cooper Companies, Inc, The served on 5/21/2021, answer due 6/25/2021. (Cuneo, Carolyn)
June 10, 2021 Filing 10 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to Answer or Respond to the Complaint by Defendants Cooper Companies, Inc, The, Teva Women's Health, Inc., CooperSurgical, Inc., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Teva Women's Health LLC. All Defendants. (Erny, Frederick)
May 24, 2021 Filing 9 SUMMONSES issued by Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (jgonz, )
May 19, 2021 Filing 8 SUMMONS REQUEST as to CooperSurgical, Inc. by Plaintiff Loriann Lenart. (Cuneo, Carolyn)
May 19, 2021 Filing 7 SUMMONS REQUEST as to Cooper Companies, Inc. by Plaintiff Loriann Lenart. (Cuneo, Carolyn)
May 19, 2021 Filing 6 SUMMONS REQUEST as to Teva Women's Health, LLC by Plaintiff Loriann Lenart. (Cuneo, Carolyn)
May 19, 2021 Filing 5 SUMMONS REQUEST as to Teva Women's Health, Inc. d/b/a Teva Women's Health, LLC by Plaintiff Loriann Lenart. (Cuneo, Carolyn)
May 19, 2021 Filing 4 SUMMONS REQUEST as to Teva Pharmaceutical USA, INC. by Plaintiff Loriann Lenart. (Cuneo, Carolyn)
May 13, 2021 Filing 3 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1, direct assignment of civil actions to full time magistrate judges. NO SUMMONS ISSUED. Summons submitted has incomplete caption and not issued. Please file completed summons for issuance using the event Summons Request. (jsalz, )
May 13, 2021 Filing 2 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak. Text Only Entry (jsalz, )
May 13, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against CooperSurgical, Inc., THE COOPER COMPANIES, INC.,, Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Teva Women's Health LLC, Teva Women's Health, Inc. (Filing fee $ 402,Receipt Number 1082-7865816)Attorney Carolyn J. Cuneo added to party Loriann Lenart(pty:pla), filed by Loriann Lenart. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Civil Cover Sheet)(Cuneo, Carolyn)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lenart v. Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.
Represented By: Frederick M. Erny
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Women's Health, Inc. doing business as Teva Women's Health, LLC
Represented By: Frederick M. Erny
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Women's Health LLC
Represented By: Frederick M. Erny
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CooperSurgical, Inc.
Represented By: Frederick M. Erny
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Cooper Companies, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cooper Companies, Inc, The
Represented By: Frederick M. Erny
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Loriann Lenart
Represented By: Carolyn J . Cuneo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?