USA v. $52,400.00 Seized from PayPal Account No. 1546113172018429148
Plaintiff: USA
Defendant: $52,400.00 Seized from PayPal Account No. 1546113172018429148
Case Number: 1:2021cv01312
Filed: May 13, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Nina Y Wang
Nature of Suit: Forfeit/Penalty: Other
Cause of Action: 18:0981
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 14, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 14, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE of Publication by Plaintiff USA (Attachments: #1 Publication)(Andrews, Tonya)
June 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang on 6/7/21 Setting Scheduling/Planning Conference and Setting Deadline for Filing of Consent/Nonconsent Form. IT IS ORDERED that the parties shall complete and file the Consent/Nonconsent Form indicating either unanimous consent of the parties or that consent has been declined, on or before: August 16, 2021. (nmarb, )
May 19, 2021 Filing 7 WARRANT for Arrest of Property IN REM issued. (nmarb, )
May 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER FOR WARRANT for Arrest of Property IN REM, by Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang on 5/18/21. (nmarb, )
May 17, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE of Complaint for Forfeiture by Plaintiff USA (Andrews, Tonya)
May 13, 2021 Filing 4 ADVISORY NOTICE OF NONCOMPLIANCE WITH COURT RULES/PROCEDURES: re: #1 Complaint, filed by attorney Tonya Shotwell Andrews. The document was scanned and not converted directly to portable document format (PDF). DO NOT REFILE THE DOCUMENT. Action to take - future documents must be filed pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 5.1(a) and 1.3(f) of the Electronic Case Filing Procedures (Civil cases). (Text Only Entry) (jtorr, )
May 13, 2021 Filing 3 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1, direct assignment of civil actions to full time magistrate judges. No summons issued. (jtorr, )
May 13, 2021 Filing 2 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang. Text Only Entry. (jtorr, )
May 13, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Forfeiture In Rem against $52,400.00 Seized from PayPal Account No. 1546113172018429148 Attorney Tonya Shotwell Andrews added to party USA(pty:pla), filed by USA. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Warrant for Arrest of Property, #3 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Andrews, Tonya)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: USA v. $52,400.00 Seized from PayPal Account No. 1546113172018429148
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $52,400.00 Seized from PayPal Account No. 1546113172018429148
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: USA
Represented By: Tonya Shotwell Andrews
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?