Raramuri Construction, Inc. v. Pine Grove Hotel Venture, LLC
Plaintiff: Raramuri Construction, Inc.
Defendant: MCP Build, Inc., Multi-Family Framing, LLC, The Guarantee Company of North America, Pine Grove Hotel Venture, LLC d/b/a Residence Inn Steamboat Springs, Pine Grove Hotel Venture, LLC a Colorado limited liability company doing business as Residence Inn Steamboat Springs and Guarantee Company of North America, The
Case Number: 1:2021cv01410
Filed: May 24, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Christine M Arguello
Referring Judge: Gordon P Gallagher
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 10, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER: This matter has its factual nexus in Routt County. According to the Court's Revised Jury Plan for Random Jury Selection, this case is therefore properly designated for Jury Division 3. Because the jury will be drawn from that Division, it is appropriate that the case be managed, for pretrial purposes, by Magistrate Judge Gallagher in Grand Junction. Accordingly, pursuant to D.C. Colo. L. Civ. R. 40.1(a), and as approved by the Chief Judge of the Court, the undersigned directs that the Clerk of the Court reassign this action to Magistrate Judge Gallagher as the referral judge. All further pleadings in this case shall reflect the case number of 21-cv-01410-CMA-GPG. SO ORDERED by Judge Christine M. Arguello on 7/27/2021. Text Only Entry (cmasec)
July 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews. Magistrate Judge Crews is designated to conduct NDISPO proceedings pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 72(a) and (b). Court-sponsored alternative dispute resolution is governed by D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.6. The Magistrate Judge, at his/her discretion, may convene such early neutral evaluation and/or settlement conferences and direct related procedures as may facilitate resolution of this case without the necessity of a motion or prior authorization of the undersigned. SO ORDERED by Judge Christine M. Arguello on 7/26/2021. Text Only Entry (cmasec)
July 21, 2021 Filing 20 REPLY to Response to #10 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Plaintiff Raramuri Construction, Inc.. (Demmitt, Thomas)
July 20, 2021 Filing 19 CASE REASSIGNED The deadline for parties to consent has lapsed. This case is randomly reassigned to Judge Christine M. Arguello. All future pleadings should be designated as 21-cv-01410-CMA. (Text Only Entry) (amont, )
July 14, 2021 Filing 18 RESPONSE to #10 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Defendants Guarantee Company of North America, The, MCP Build, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Iver Retrum, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A to Affidavit of Iver Retrum, #3 Exhibit B to Affidavit of Iver Retrum, #4 Exhibit C to Response to Plaintiff's Motion and Brief in Support of Motion for Remand, #5 Exhibit D to Response to Plaintiff's Motion and Brief in Support of Motion for Remand)(Joseph, Jerome)
July 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER: Plaintiff's #16 Motion to Amend/Correct/Modify the Complaint does not comply with D.C.COLO.LCivR 15.1(b). Therefore, the Motion is denied without prejudice. By Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews on 7/2/2021. Text Only Entry(skclc1)
June 30, 2021 Filing 16 MOTION to Amend/Correct/Modify Complaint by Plaintiff Raramuri Construction, Inc.. (Demmitt, Thomas)
June 30, 2021 Filing 15 RESPONSE to #8 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Plaintiff Raramuri Construction, Inc.. (Demmitt, Thomas)
June 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER re #12 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. On May 25, 2021, Plaintiff's Counsel was notified that he would need to enter an appearance in this matter in order to receive any electronic service via the CM/ECF system. To be sure, in this District, represented parties are required to utilize the electronic filing system. Yet Counsel chose to wait until one month later to do so, and therefore, did not receive any of the filings, including Defendant's Motion to Dismiss. Thus, while Defendant may have failed to provide a courtesy copy to Plaintiff, much of the responsibility for this current posture is due to Counsel's own delay. The Court does not perceive any nefarious behavior. Nevertheless, the Court will grant Plaintiff up to and including July 2, 2021, to file its response to the Motion to Dismiss. SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews on 6/30/2021. Text Only Entry(skclc1)
June 29, 2021 Filing 13 RESPONSE to #12 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #8 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Defendants Guarantee Company of North America, The, MCP Build, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Redacted Hospital Discharge Papers)(Joseph, Jerome)
June 23, 2021 Filing 12 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #8 MOTION to Dismiss by Plaintiff Raramuri Construction, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only) Granting Extension)(Demmitt, Thomas)
June 23, 2021 Filing 11 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. (Demmitt, Thomas)
June 23, 2021 Filing 10 MOTION to Remand to State Court by Plaintiff Raramuri Construction, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 - Summons - Pine Grove Hotel Venture, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2 - Affidavit of Service - Pine Grove Hotel, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 3, Notice of Exempt Offering of Securities, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 4 - Colorado Secretary of State - Summary - Pine Grove Hotel Venture, #5 Proposed Order (PDF Only) Order for Remand)(Demmitt, Thomas)
June 23, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Thomas Brent Demmitt on behalf of All Plaintiffs Attorney Thomas Brent Demmitt added to party Raramuri Construction, Inc.(pty:pla) (Demmitt, Thomas)
June 1, 2021 Filing 8 MOTION to Dismiss by Defendants Guarantee Company of North America, The, MCP Build, Inc.. (Joseph, Jerome)
June 1, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance to Assert Jurisdictional Insufficiency of Process; and Insufficiency of Service of Process by Jerome M. Joseph on behalf of Pine Grove Hotel Venture, LLC Attorney Jerome M. Joseph added to party Pine Grove Hotel Venture, LLC (pty:dft) (Joseph, Jerome)
May 25, 2021 Filing 6 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1, direct assignment of civil actions to full time magistrate judges. (alave, )
May 25, 2021 Filing 5 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews. Text Only Entry. (alave, )
May 25, 2021 Filing 4 COMPLAINT AND LIEN FORECLOSURE against Guarantee Company of North America, The, MCP Build, Inc., Multi-Family Framing, LLC, Pine Grove Hotel Venture, LLC, filed by Raramuri Construction, Inc..(alave, )
May 25, 2021 Filing 3 FIRST AND FINAL NOTICE TO ALL ATTORNEY(S) AND UNREPRESENTED PARTIES IN REMOVED, TRANSFERRED, OR OTHER CASES. To receive any further notice in a case removed or transferred to this court, or special matters including discovery disputes, bankruptcy appeals, or withdrawals of reference, Multi-district litigation (MDL), etc., all attorneys and unrepresented parties must enter an appearance under D.C.COLO.LAttyR 5(a). An attorney must be an active member of this court's bar and be in good standing in accordance with D.C.COLO.LAttyR 3. A waiver of the fee for bar admission may apply in limited situations. (Text Only Entry) (alave, )
May 25, 2021 Filing 2 ADVISORY NOTICE OF NONCOMPLIANCE WITH COURT RULES/PROCEDURES: re: #1 Notice of Removal,, filed by attorney Jerome M. Joseph.The document was scanned and not converted directly to portable document format (PDF). DO NOT REFILE THE DOCUMENT. Action to take - future documents must be filed pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 5.1(a) and 1.3(f) of the Electronic Case Filing Procedures (Civil cases). (Text Only Entry) (alave, )
May 24, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by MCP Build, Inc. from District Court, Routt County, State of Colorado, Case Number 2021CV030023. (Filing fee $ 402, Receipt Number 1082-7883630), filed by MCP Build, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - 20210401 Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - 20210401 District Case Coversheet, #3 Exhibit C - 20210401 Summons - Guarantee Company, #4 Exhibit D - 20210401 Summons - Pine Grove Hotel Venture, #5 Exhibit E - 20210401 Summons - MCP Build, #6 Exhibit F - 20210521 Register of Actions and Party Information, #7 Exhibit G - Civil Cover Sheet and Supplemental Civil Case Cover Sheet, #8 Exhibit H - Email Correspondence from Guarantee)(Joseph, Jerome)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Raramuri Construction, Inc. v. Pine Grove Hotel Venture, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MCP Build, Inc.
Represented By: Jerome M. Joseph
Represented By: Daniela Laura Reichelstein
Represented By: Theodore Allen Wells
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Multi-Family Framing, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Guarantee Company of North America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pine Grove Hotel Venture, LLC d/b/a Residence Inn Steamboat Springs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pine Grove Hotel Venture, LLC a Colorado limited liability company doing business as Residence Inn Steamboat Springs
Represented By: Jerome M. Joseph
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Guarantee Company of North America, The
Represented By: Jerome M. Joseph
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Raramuri Construction, Inc.
Represented By: Thomas Brent Demmitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?