Carlson et al v. Colorado Center for Reproductive Medicine, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Douglas F. Carlson and Maya Zubkovskaya
Defendant: Robert L. Gustofson, Fertility Labs of Colorado, LLC and Colorado Center for Reproductive Medicine, LLC
Case Number: 1:2021cv01528
Filed: June 7, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Raymond P Moore
Referring Judge: Regina M Rodriguez
2 Judge: Nina Y Wang
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 13, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #10 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond. The responsive pleading deadline for all Defendants is 8/11/2021. While it recognizes Plaintiffs' expediency concerns as set forth in their Response #12 , this court nevertheless finds the requested extension warranted for purposes of judicial economy and efficiency. By Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang on 7/13/2021. Text Only Entry(nywlc1, )
July 13, 2021 Filing 13 MEMORANDUM regarding #10 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond filed by Colorado Center for Reproductive Medicine, LLC, Robert L. Gustofson, Fertility Labs of Colorado, LLC. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang by Judge Regina M Rodriguez on 7/13/2021. Text Only Entry (rmrja)
July 9, 2021 Filing 12 RESPONSE to #10 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond filed by Plaintiff Douglas F. Carlson. (Carlson, Douglas)
July 7, 2021 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Douglas F. Carlson. Colorado Center for Reproductive Medicine, LLC served on 6/16/2021, answer due 7/7/2021; Fertility Labs of Colorado, LLC served on 6/16/2021, answer due 7/7/2021. (Carlson, Douglas)
July 7, 2021 Filing 10 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond by Defendants Colorado Center for Reproductive Medicine, LLC, Fertility Labs of Colorado, LLC, Robert L. Gustofson. (Hensen, Stephen)
July 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 This action is reassigned to Judge Regina M. Rodriguez upon her appointment. Unless otherwise ordered, the dates and times for all previously scheduled matters will be maintained and will now be handled by Judge Rodriguez in Courtroom A-702. Her chambers are located in A-738 of the Alfred A. Arraj Courthouse. Her telephone number is 303-335-2170. All future pleadings should be designated as 21-cv-01528-RMR-NYW. (Text Only Entry) (rvill, )
June 25, 2021 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE of Service by Mail by Clerk of Court of #7 Minute Order, to Maya Zubkovskaya, P.O. Box 191711, San Francisco, CA 94119-1711. Text Only Entry (nmarb, )
June 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang on 6/25/21. A Telephonic Status Conference is set for 8/9/2021 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that a copy of this Order is to be sent to the following: Maya Zubkovskaya, P.O. Box 191711, San Francisco, CA 94119-1711. (nmarb, )
June 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MINUTE ORDER: This matter is before the Court sua sponte upon review of this matter in which Plaintiffs appear pro se. The Court strongly encourages Plaintiffs to contact the Federal Pro Se Clinic which provides free assistance to people representing themselves in the U.S. District Court for the District of Colorado. The Clinic cannot assist with criminal, bankruptcy, habeas, appeals, or any state cases. If Plaintiffs wish to avail themselves of this service, they may make an appointment by phone (303-380-8786) or online at www.cobar.org/cofederalproseclinic. The Clinic is located at: Alfred A. Arraj Courthouse (first floor), 901 19th Street, Denver, CO 80294. SO ORDERED by Judge Raymond P. Moore on 6/8/2021. (Text Only Entry) (rmsec)
June 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 MINUTE ORDER: With the assignment of this matter, the parties are advised that throughout this case they are expected to be familiar and comply with not only the Local Rules of this District, but also Judge Raymond P. Moore's Civil Practice Standards, which may be found at: http://www.cod.uscourts.gov/JudicialOfficers/ActiveArticleIIIJudges/HonRaymondPMoore.aspx. SO ORDERED by Judge Raymond P. Moore on 6/8/2021. (Text Only Entry) (rmsec )
June 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 72(a) and (b), this case is referred to the assigned United States Magistrate Judge to (1) convene a scheduling conference under Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b) and enter a scheduling order meeting the requirements of D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.2, (2) conduct such status conferences and issue such orders necessary for compliance with the scheduling order, including amendments or modifications of the scheduling order upon a showing of good cause, (3) hear and determine pretrial matters, including discovery and other non-dispositive motions, (4) conduct a pretrial conference and enter a pretrial order, and (5) conduct hearings, including evidentiary hearings, and submit proposed findings of fact and recommendations for rulings on dispositive motions. Court sponsored alternative dispute resolution is governed by D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.6. On the recommendation or informal request of the magistrate judge or on the request of the parties by motion, this court may direct the parties to engage in an early neutral evaluation, a settlement conference, or another alternative dispute resolution proceeding. By Judge Raymond P. Moore on 6/8/2021. (Text Only Entry) (rmsec )
June 7, 2021 Filing 3 SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (trvo, )
June 7, 2021 Filing 2 Case assigned to Judge Raymond P. Moore and drawn to Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang. Text Only Entry. (trvo, )
June 7, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Colorado Center for Reproductive Medicine, LLC, Fertility Labs of Colorado, LLC, Robert L. Gustofson (Filing Fee: $402, Receipt Number: COX099285), filed by Douglas F. Carlson, Maya Zubkovskaya. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Letter, #10 Civil Cover Sheet, #11 Summons, #12 Envelope)(trvo, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Carlson et al v. Colorado Center for Reproductive Medicine, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Douglas F. Carlson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maya Zubkovskaya
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert L. Gustofson
Represented By: Stephen Jerome Hensen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fertility Labs of Colorado, LLC
Represented By: Stephen Jerome Hensen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Colorado Center for Reproductive Medicine, LLC
Represented By: Stephen Jerome Hensen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?