U.S. Securities and Exchange Commission v. Cell>Point, LLC et al
Plaintiff: U.S. Securities and Exchange Commission and United States Securities and Exchange Commission
Defendant: Cell>Point, LLC, Terry Allen Colip and Greg Russell Colip
Case Number: 1:2021cv01574
Filed: June 10, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Philip A Brimmer
Referring Judge: Kristen L Mix
Nature of Suit: Securities, Commodities, Exchange
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 78
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 29, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 29, 2021 Filing 15 MEMORANDUM regarding #14 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond filed by Greg Russell Colip, Terry Allen Colip, Cell>Point, LLC. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix, by Chief Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 7/29/2021. Text Only Entry (pabsec)
July 29, 2021 Filing 14 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond by Defendants Cell>Point, LLC, Greg Russell Colip, Terry Allen Colip. (Garnett, Stanley)
July 21, 2021 Filing 13 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Amanda Kristine Houseal on behalf of All Defendants Attorney Amanda Kristine Houseal added to party Cell>Point, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Amanda Kristine Houseal added to party Greg Russell Colip(pty:dft), Attorney Amanda Kristine Houseal added to party Terry Allen Colip(pty:dft) (Houseal, Amanda)
July 21, 2021 Filing 12 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Craig Maxwell Finger on behalf of All Defendants Attorney Craig Maxwell Finger added to party Cell>Point, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Craig Maxwell Finger added to party Greg Russell Colip(pty:dft), Attorney Craig Maxwell Finger added to party Terry Allen Colip(pty:dft) (Finger, Craig)
July 21, 2021 Filing 11 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Carrie Elizabeth Johnson on behalf of All Defendants Attorney Carrie Elizabeth Johnson added to party Cell>Point, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Carrie Elizabeth Johnson added to party Greg Russell Colip(pty:dft), Attorney Carrie Elizabeth Johnson added to party Terry Allen Colip(pty:dft) (Johnson, Carrie)
July 21, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Stanley L. Garnett on behalf of Cell>Point, LLC, Greg Russell Colip, Terry Allen ColipAttorney Stanley L. Garnett added to party Cell>Point, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Stanley L. Garnett added to party Greg Russell Colip(pty:dft), Attorney Stanley L. Garnett added to party Terry Allen Colip(pty:dft) (Garnett, Stanley)
July 15, 2021 Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by United States Securities and Exchange Commission. Terry Allen Colip waiver sent on 7/14/2021, answer due 9/12/2021. (Atkinson, Polly)
July 15, 2021 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by United States Securities and Exchange Commission. Greg Russell Colip waiver sent on 7/14/2021, answer due 9/12/2021. (Atkinson, Polly)
July 15, 2021 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by United States Securities and Exchange Commission. Cell>Point, LLC waiver sent on 7/14/2021, answer due 9/12/2021. (Atkinson, Polly)
June 23, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Mark L. Williams on behalf of U.S. Securities and Exchange CommissionAttorney Mark L. Williams added to party U.S. Securities and Exchange Commission(pty:pla) (Williams, Mark)
June 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 6/11/21, Setting Scheduling/Planning Conference. Proposed Scheduling Order due by 8/31/2021. Scheduling/Planning Conference set for 9/7/2021 03:00 PM in Courtroom A 401 before Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix. (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1, #2 Attachment 2, #3 Attachment 3) (nmarb, )
June 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix for non-dispositive matters. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 72(a) and (b), this case is referred to the assigned United States Magistrate Judge to (1) convene a scheduling conference under Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b) and enter a scheduling order meeting the requirements of D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.2, (2) conduct such status conferences and issue such orders necessary for compliance with the scheduling order, including amendments or modifications of the scheduling order upon a showing of good cause, (3) hear and determine pretrial matters, including discovery and other non-dispositive motions, and (4) conduct a pretrial conference and enter a pretrial order. Court sponsored alternative dispute resolution is governed by D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.6. On the recommendation or informal request of the magistrate judge or on the request of the parties by motion, this court may direct the parties to engage in an early neutral evaluation, a settlement conference, or another alternative dispute resolution proceeding, by Chief Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 6/11/2021. Text Only Entry (pabsec2)
June 10, 2021 Filing 3 SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (cpomm, )
June 10, 2021 Filing 2 Case assigned to Chief Judge Philip A. Brimmer and drawn to Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix. Text Only Entry (cpomm, )
June 10, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Cell>Point, LLC, Greg Russell Colip, Terry Allen Colip Attorney Polly Arlene Atkinson added to party U.S. Securities and Exchange Commission(pty:pla), filed by U.S. Securities and Exchange Commission. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Defendent Cell>Point, LLC, #3 Summons Defendant Greg Russell Colip, #4 Summons Defendant Terry Allen Colip)(Atkinson, Polly)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: U.S. Securities and Exchange Commission v. Cell>Point, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cell>Point, LLC
Represented By: Amanda Kristine Houseal
Represented By: Carrie Elizabeth Johnson
Represented By: Craig Maxwell Finger
Represented By: Stanley L. Garnett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Terry Allen Colip
Represented By: Amanda Kristine Houseal
Represented By: Carrie Elizabeth Johnson
Represented By: Craig Maxwell Finger
Represented By: Stanley L. Garnett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Greg Russell Colip
Represented By: Amanda Kristine Houseal
Represented By: Carrie Elizabeth Johnson
Represented By: Craig Maxwell Finger
Represented By: Stanley L. Garnett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: U.S. Securities and Exchange Commission
Represented By: Polly Arlene Atkinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States Securities and Exchange Commission
Represented By: Polly Arlene Atkinson
Represented By: Mark L. Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?