Besser et al v. Sunflower Bank, N.A.
Plaintiff: Samantha Besser and Alan Schoenberger
Defendant: Sunflower Bank, N.A.
Case Number: 1:2021cv01577
Filed: June 10, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Raymond P Moore
Referring Judge: Scott T Varholak
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 5, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 MINUTE ORDER: With the assignment of this matter, the parties are advised that throughout this case they are expected to be familiar and comply with not only the Local Rules of this District, but also Judge Raymond P. Moore's Civil Practice Standards, which may be found at: http://www.cod.uscourts.gov/JudicialOfficers/ActiveArticleIIIJudges/HonRaymondPMoore.aspx. By Judge Raymond P. Moore on 8/5/2021. (Text Only Entry) (rmsec )
August 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 72(a) and (b), this case is referred to the assigned United States Magistrate Judge to (1) convene a scheduling conference under Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b) and enter a scheduling order meeting the requirements of D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.2, (2) conduct such status conferences and issue such orders necessary for compliance with the scheduling order, including amendments or modifications of the scheduling order upon a showing of good cause, (3) hear and determine pretrial matters, including discovery and other non-dispositive motions, (4) conduct a pretrial conference and enter a pretrial order, and (5) conduct hearings, including evidentiary hearings, and submit proposed findings of fact and recommendations for rulings on dispositive motions. Court sponsored alternative dispute resolution is governed by D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.6. On the recommendation or informal request of the magistrate judge or on the request of the parties by motion, this court may direct the parties to engage in an early neutral evaluation, a settlement conference, or another alternative dispute resolution proceeding. By Judge Raymond P. Moore on 8/5/2021. (Text Only Entry) (rmsec )
August 5, 2021 Filing 17 CASE REASSIGNED pursuant to #11 Consent to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge. All parties do not consent. This case is randomly reassigned to Judge Raymond P. Moore and drawn to Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak. All future pleadings should be designated as 21-cv-01577-RM. (Text Only Entry) (agarc, )
August 4, 2021 Filing 16 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent FirstSun Capital Bancorp for Sunflower Bank, N.A.. (Demko, Andrew)
July 29, 2021 Filing 15 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by David Michael Berger on behalf of All Plaintiffs Attorney David Michael Berger added to party Samantha Besser(pty:pla), Attorney David Michael Berger added to party Alan Schoenberger(pty:pla) (Berger, David)
July 28, 2021 Filing 14 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Sophia G. Gold on behalf of All Plaintiffs Attorney Sophia G. Gold added to party Samantha Besser(pty:pla), Attorney Sophia G. Gold added to party Alan Schoenberger(pty:pla) (Gold, Sophia)
July 28, 2021 Filing 13 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Ashley Taylor Brines on behalf of Sunflower Bank, N.A.Attorney Ashley Taylor Brines added to party Sunflower Bank, N.A.(pty:dft) (Brines, Ashley)
July 28, 2021 Filing 12 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Andrew J. Demko on behalf of Sunflower Bank, N.A.Attorney Andrew J. Demko added to party Sunflower Bank, N.A.(pty:dft) (Demko, Andrew)
July 28, 2021 Filing 11 CONSENT to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge by Defendant Sunflower Bank, N.A. All parties do not consent.. (Brown, Douglas)
July 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #9 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond. Defendant Sunflower Bank, N.A. shall file its responsive pleading on or before 8/23/2021. SO ORDERED, by Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak on 7/1/2021. Text Only Entry(stvlc2, )
July 1, 2021 Filing 9 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint by Defendant Sunflower Bank, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Walker, David)
June 30, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by David Cameron Walker on behalf of Sunflower Bank, N.A.Attorney David Cameron Walker added to party Sunflower Bank, N.A.(pty:dft) (Walker, David)
June 30, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Douglas Wayne Brown on behalf of Sunflower Bank, N.A.Attorney Douglas Wayne Brown added to party Sunflower Bank, N.A.(pty:dft) (Brown, Douglas)
June 29, 2021 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Samantha Besser, Alan Schoenberger. Sunflower Bank, N.A. served on 6/16/2021, answer due 7/7/2021. (Kaliel, Jeffrey)
June 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER Setting Scheduling Conference for 8/18/2021 11:30 AM in Courtroom A 402 before Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak. Consent Form due by 8/4/2021. Proposed Scheduling Order due 8/11/2021, by Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak on 6/15/2021. (jgonz, )
June 11, 2021 Filing 4 SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (cpomm, )
June 10, 2021 Filing 3 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak. Text Only Entry (cpomm, )
June 10, 2021 Filing 2 SUMMONS REQUEST as to Sunflower Bank, N.A. by Plaintiffs Samantha Besser, Alan Schoenberger. (Kaliel, Jeffrey)
June 10, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Sunflower Bank, N.A. (Filing fee $ 402,Receipt Number 1082-7910266)Attorney Jeffrey Douglas Kaliel added to party Samantha Besser(pty:pla), Attorney Jeffrey Douglas Kaliel added to party Alan Schoenberger(pty:pla), filed by Samantha Besser, Alan Schoenberger. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Kaliel, Jeffrey)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Besser et al v. Sunflower Bank, N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Samantha Besser
Represented By: Jeffrey Douglas Kaliel
Represented By: David Michael Berger
Represented By: Sophia G. Gold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alan Schoenberger
Represented By: Jeffrey Douglas Kaliel
Represented By: David Michael Berger
Represented By: Sophia G. Gold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sunflower Bank, N.A.
Represented By: Andrew J. Demko
Represented By: Ashley Taylor Brines
Represented By: David Cameron Walker
Represented By: Douglas Wayne Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?