Millennium Funding, Inc. et al v. Micfo, LLC et al
Plaintiff: MON, LLC, Voltage Holdings, LLC., Millennium Funding, Inc., FAMILY OF THE YEAR PRODUCTIONS, LLC, LHF Productions, Inc., SF FILMS, LLC, Killing Link Distribution, LLC, Millennium IP, Inc., HUNTER KILLER PRODUCTIONS, INC., I am Wrath Production, Inc., Millennium SPVH, Inc., Millennium Media, Inc., Bodyguard Productions, Inc, Day of the Dead Productions, Inc., RAMBO V PRODUCTIONS, INC., 211 Productions, Inc., Venice PI, LLC., Bedeviled, LLC, Family of the Year Productions LLC and SF Films, LLC.
Defendant: Micfo, LLC and Amir Golestan
Case Number: 1:2021cv01594
Filed: June 11, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: R Brooke Jackson
Referring Judge: Nina Y Wang
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17 U.S.C. ยง 101
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 30, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 21 MINUTE ORDER: In light of the reassignment of this case to this Court the Scheduling Conference set 9/14/2021 before Magistrate Judge Wang is vacated. The Court requests that the parties confer and attempt to agree on a schedule and submit a proposed scheduling order by 9/7/2021 pointing out any areas of disagreement. Please email the proposed order to Jackson_Chambers@cod.uscourts.gov in Word format and efile into CM/ECF. Without holding a Scheduling Conference, the Court will review and enter the order making such rulings as are appropriate and will provide the parties with potential trial preparation conference and trial dates for you to choose from. If the parties prefer that the Court hold a Scheduling Conference, please notify Chambers via email by the date the proposed scheduling order is due and Court staff will provide you a date. By Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 7/30/2021. Text Only Entry (rbjsec.)
July 29, 2021 Filing 20 CASE REASSIGNED pursuant to #19 Consent/Non-Consent to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge. All parties do not consent. This case is randomly reassigned to Judge R. Brooke Jackson. All future pleadings should be designated as 21-cv-01594-RBJ. (Text Only Entry) (alave, )
July 29, 2021 Filing 19 CONSENT to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge by Plaintiffs 211 Productions, Inc., Bedeviled, LLC, Bodyguard Productions, Inc, Day of the Dead Productions, Inc., Family of the Year Productions LLC, Hunter Killer Productions, Inc., I am Wrath Production, Inc., Killing Link Distribution, LLC, LHF Productions, Inc., MON, LLC, Millennium Funding, Inc., Millennium IP, Inc., Millennium Media, Inc., Millennium SPVH, Inc., Rambo V Productions, Inc., SF Films, LLC., Venice PI, LLC., Voltage Holdings, LLC. All parties do not consent.. (Culpepper, Kerry)
July 29, 2021 Filing 18 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,,,,,,, Attorney James Bernard Hood added to party Micfo, LLC(pty:dft) by Micfo, LLC.(Hood, James)
July 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting #16 Motion to Vacate. The telephonic Scheduling Conference is RE-SET for 9/14/2021 at 09:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang. A Proposed Scheduling Order is due by 9/7/2021. The Consent Form deadline REMAINS SET for 7/28/2021. By Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang on 7/23/2021. Text Only Entry(nywlc1, )
July 22, 2021 Filing 16 First MOTION to Vacate #10 Order, PLAINTIFFS FIRST UNOPPOSED MOTION TO VACATE SCHEDULING/PLANNING CONFERENCE DATE by Plaintiffs 211 Productions, Inc., Bedeviled, LLC, Bodyguard Productions, Inc, Day of the Dead Productions, Inc., Family of the Year Productions LLC, Hunter Killer Productions, Inc., I am Wrath Production, Inc., Killing Link Distribution, LLC, LHF Productions, Inc., MON, LLC, Millennium Funding, Inc., Millennium IP, Inc., Millennium Media, Inc., Millennium SPVH, Inc., Rambo V Productions, Inc., SF Films, LLC., Venice PI, LLC., Voltage Holdings, LLC.. (Culpepper, Kerry)
July 13, 2021 Filing 15 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of Party Amir Golestan without Prejudice by Plaintiffs 211 Productions, Inc., Bedeviled, LLC, Bodyguard Productions, Inc, Day of the Dead Productions, Inc., Family of the Year Productions LLC, Hunter Killer Productions, Inc., I am Wrath Production, Inc., Killing Link Distribution, LLC, LHF Productions, Inc., MON, LLC, Millennium Funding, Inc., Millennium IP, Inc., Millennium Media, Inc., Millennium SPVH, Inc., Rambo V Productions, Inc., SF Films, LLC., Venice PI, LLC., Voltage Holdings, LLC. (Culpepper, Kerry)
July 8, 2021 Filing 14 SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (alave, )
July 6, 2021 Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Millennium IP, Inc., Hunter Killer Productions, Inc., Venice PI, LLC., 211 Productions, Inc., Millennium Funding, Inc., Voltage Holdings, LLC., SF Films, LLC., Millennium SPVH, Inc., Family of the Year Productions LLC, Bedeviled, LLC, Killing Link Distribution, LLC, Millennium Media, Inc., MON, LLC, Rambo V Productions, Inc., I am Wrath Production, Inc., Bodyguard Productions, Inc, LHF Productions, Inc., Day of the Dead Productions, Inc.. Micfo, LLC served on 7/1/2021, answer due 7/22/2021. (Culpepper, Kerry)
July 6, 2021 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Millennium IP, Inc., Hunter Killer Productions, Inc., Venice PI, LLC., 211 Productions, Inc., Millennium Funding, Inc., Voltage Holdings, LLC., SF Films, LLC., Millennium SPVH, Inc., Family of the Year Productions LLC, Bedeviled, LLC, Killing Link Distribution, LLC, Millennium Media, Inc., MON, LLC, Rambo V Productions, Inc., I am Wrath Production, Inc., Bodyguard Productions, Inc, LHF Productions, Inc., Day of the Dead Productions, Inc.. Amir Golestan served on 7/1/2021, answer due 7/22/2021. (Culpepper, Kerry)
June 30, 2021 Filing 11 SUMMONS REQUEST as to AMIR GOLESTAN by Plaintiffs 211 Productions, Inc., Bedeviled, LLC, Bodyguard Productions, Inc, Day of the Dead Productions, Inc., Family of the Year Productions LLC, Hunter Killer Productions, Inc., I am Wrath Production, Inc., Killing Link Distribution, LLC, LHF Productions, Inc., MON, LLC, Millennium Funding, Inc., Millennium IP, Inc., Millennium Media, Inc., Millennium SPVH, Inc., Rambo V Productions, Inc., SF Films, LLC., Venice PI, LLC., Voltage Holdings, LLC.. (Culpepper, Kerry)
June 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang on 06/25/2021 Setting Scheduling/Planning Conference and Setting Deadline for Filing of Consent/Non-Consent Form. Consent Form due by 7/28/2021. Proposed Scheduling Order due 8/4/2021. Telephonic Scheduling/Planning Conference set for 8/11/2021 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang. (nmarb, )
June 14, 2021 Filing 9 CASE REASSIGNED pursuant to #8 Memorandum Returning Case. This case is randomly reassigned to Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang. All future pleadings should be designated as 21-cv-01654-NYW. (Text Only Entry) (rkeec)
June 14, 2021 Filing 8 MEMORANDUM RETURNING CASE entered by Judge Marcia S. Krieger. (rkeec)
June 11, 2021 Filing 7 Report re Copyright: Report on the filing of an action emailed separately to the Director of the Copyright Office. (cpomm, )
June 11, 2021 Filing 6 SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (cpomm, )
June 11, 2021 Filing 5 Case assigned to Judge Marcia S. Krieger and drawn to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. Text Only Entry (cpomm, )
June 11, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Kerry Steven Culpepper on behalf of All Plaintiffs Attorney Kerry Steven Culpepper added to party 211 Productions, Inc.(pty:pla), Attorney Kerry Steven Culpepper added to party Bedeviled, LLC(pty:pla), Attorney Kerry Steven Culpepper added to party Bodyguard Productions, Inc(pty:pla), Attorney Kerry Steven Culpepper added to party Day of the Dead Productions, Inc.(pty:pla), Attorney Kerry Steven Culpepper added to party FAMILY OF THE YEAR PRODUCTIONS, LLC(pty:pla), Attorney Kerry Steven Culpepper added to party HUNTER KILLER PRODUCTIONS, INC.(pty:pla), Attorney Kerry Steven Culpepper added to party I am Wrath Production, Inc.(pty:pla), Attorney Kerry Steven Culpepper added to party Killing Link Distribution, LLC(pty:pla), Attorney Kerry Steven Culpepper added to party LHF Productions, Inc.(pty:pla), Attorney Kerry Steven Culpepper added to party MON, LLC(pty:pla), Attorney Kerry Steven Culpepper added to party Millennium Funding, Inc.(pty:pla), Attorney Kerry Steven Culpepper added to party Millennium IP, Inc.(pty:pla), Attorney Kerry Steven Culpepper added to party Millennium Media, Inc.(pty:pla), Attorney Kerry Steven Culpepper added to party Millennium SPVH, Inc.(pty:pla), Attorney Kerry Steven Culpepper added to party RAMBO V PRODUCTIONS, INC.(pty:pla), Attorney Kerry Steven Culpepper added to party SF FILMS, LLC(pty:pla), Attorney Kerry Steven Culpepper added to party Venice PI, LLC.(pty:pla), Attorney Kerry Steven Culpepper added to party Voltage Holdings, LLC.(pty:pla) (Culpepper, Kerry)
June 11, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE of Copyright Report by Plaintiffs 211 Productions, Inc., Bedeviled, LLC, Bodyguard Productions, Inc, Day of the Dead Productions, Inc., FAMILY OF THE YEAR PRODUCTIONS, LLC, HUNTER KILLER PRODUCTIONS, INC., I am Wrath Production, Inc., Killing Link Distribution, LLC, LHF Productions, Inc., MON, LLC, Millennium Funding, Inc., Millennium IP, Inc., Millennium Media, Inc., Millennium SPVH, Inc., RAMBO V PRODUCTIONS, INC., SF FILMS, LLC, Venice PI, LLC., Voltage Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Lee, Joshua)
June 11, 2021 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent Millennium Funding, Inc. for 211 Productions, Inc., Bodyguard Productions, Inc, Day of the Dead Productions, Inc., LHF Productions, Inc.; Corporate Parent Hannibal Classics, Inc. for I am Wrath Production, Inc.; Corporate Parent Millennium IP, Inc. for RAMBO V PRODUCTIONS, INC.. (Lee, Joshua)
June 11, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Amir Golestan, Micfo, LLC (Filing fee $ 402,Receipt Number 1082-7911553)Attorney Joshua J. Lee added to party 211 Productions, Inc.(pty:pla), Attorney Joshua J. Lee added to party Bedeviled, LLC(pty:pla), Attorney Joshua J. Lee added to party Bodyguard Productions, Inc(pty:pla), Attorney Joshua J. Lee added to party Day of the Dead Productions, Inc.(pty:pla), Attorney Joshua J. Lee added to party FAMILY OF THE YEAR PRODUCTIONS, LLC(pty:pla), Attorney Joshua J. Lee added to party HUNTER KILLER PRODUCTIONS, INC.(pty:pla), Attorney Joshua J. Lee added to party I am Wrath Production, Inc.(pty:pla), Attorney Joshua J. Lee added to party Killing Link Distribution, LLC(pty:pla), Attorney Joshua J. Lee added to party LHF Productions, Inc.(pty:pla), Attorney Joshua J. Lee added to party MON, LLC(pty:pla), Attorney Joshua J. Lee added to party Millennium Funding, Inc.(pty:pla), Attorney Joshua J. Lee added to party Millennium IP, Inc.(pty:pla), Attorney Joshua J. Lee added to party Millennium Media, Inc.(pty:pla), Attorney Joshua J. Lee added to party Millennium SPVH, Inc.(pty:pla), Attorney Joshua J. Lee added to party RAMBO V PRODUCTIONS, INC.(pty:pla), Attorney Joshua J. Lee added to party SF FILMS, LLC(pty:pla), Attorney Joshua J. Lee added to party Venice PI, LLC.(pty:pla), Attorney Joshua J. Lee added to party Voltage Holdings, LLC.(pty:pla), filed by Millennium IP, Inc., HUNTER KILLER PRODUCTIONS, INC., Venice PI, LLC., 211 Productions, Inc., Millennium Funding, Inc., Voltage Holdings, LLC., SF FILMS, LLC, Millennium SPVH, Inc., FAMILY OF THE YEAR PRODUCTIONS, LLC, Bedeviled, LLC, Killing Link Distribution, LLC, Millennium Media, Inc., MON, LLC, RAMBO V PRODUCTIONS, INC., I am Wrath Production, Inc., Bodyguard Productions, Inc, LHF Productions, Inc., Day of the Dead Productions, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Affidavit, #5 Summons, #6 Summons, #7 Civil Cover Sheet)(Lee, Joshua)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Millennium Funding, Inc. et al v. Micfo, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MON, LLC
Represented By: Kerry Steven Culpepper
Represented By: Joshua J. Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Voltage Holdings, LLC.
Represented By: Kerry Steven Culpepper
Represented By: Joshua J. Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Millennium Funding, Inc.
Represented By: Kerry Steven Culpepper
Represented By: Joshua J. Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: FAMILY OF THE YEAR PRODUCTIONS, LLC
Represented By: Kerry Steven Culpepper
Represented By: Joshua J. Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LHF Productions, Inc.
Represented By: Kerry Steven Culpepper
Represented By: Joshua J. Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SF FILMS, LLC
Represented By: Kerry Steven Culpepper
Represented By: Joshua J. Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Killing Link Distribution, LLC
Represented By: Kerry Steven Culpepper
Represented By: Joshua J. Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Millennium IP, Inc.
Represented By: Kerry Steven Culpepper
Represented By: Joshua J. Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HUNTER KILLER PRODUCTIONS, INC.
Represented By: Kerry Steven Culpepper
Represented By: Joshua J. Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: I am Wrath Production, Inc.
Represented By: Kerry Steven Culpepper
Represented By: Joshua J. Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Millennium SPVH, Inc.
Represented By: Kerry Steven Culpepper
Represented By: Joshua J. Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Millennium Media, Inc.
Represented By: Kerry Steven Culpepper
Represented By: Joshua J. Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bodyguard Productions, Inc
Represented By: Kerry Steven Culpepper
Represented By: Joshua J. Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Day of the Dead Productions, Inc.
Represented By: Kerry Steven Culpepper
Represented By: Joshua J. Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RAMBO V PRODUCTIONS, INC.
Represented By: Kerry Steven Culpepper
Represented By: Joshua J. Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: 211 Productions, Inc.
Represented By: Kerry Steven Culpepper
Represented By: Joshua J. Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Venice PI, LLC.
Represented By: Kerry Steven Culpepper
Represented By: Joshua J. Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bedeviled, LLC
Represented By: Kerry Steven Culpepper
Represented By: Joshua J. Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Family of the Year Productions LLC
Represented By: Kerry Steven Culpepper
Represented By: Joshua J. Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SF Films, LLC.
Represented By: Kerry Steven Culpepper
Represented By: Joshua J. Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Micfo, LLC
Represented By: James Bernard Hood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amir Golestan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?