Carson v. USA
Plaintiff: Mark Carson and Mark H. Carson
Defendant: United States and USA
Case Number: 1:2021cv01596
Filed: June 11, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Scott T Varholak
Nature of Suit: Tax Suits
Cause of Action: 05 U.S.C. ยง 551
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 28, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER Setting Scheduling Conference for 9/23/2021 09:30 AM in Courtroom A 402 before Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak. Consent Form due by 9/9/2021. Proposed Scheduling Order due 9/16/2021, by Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak on 6/28/2021. (jgonz, )
June 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #6 Motion for Leave to Restrict. The Clerk of Court shall maintain Dkt. Nos. 1-1, 1-2, 1-3, 1-5, and 1-6 under Restriction Level 1. SO ORDERED, by Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak on 6/28/2021. Text Only Entry(stvlc1, )
June 24, 2021 Filing 6 MOTION for Leave to Restrict by Plaintiff Mark H. Carson. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only) Granting Motion to Restrict)(Bernstein, Howard)
June 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER OF REASSIGNMENT by Judge Marcia S. Krieger on 6/23/2021. ORDERED that the clerk of the court shall assign this case to a judge for resolution on the merits under the random assignment procedure of D.C.COLO.LCiv.R 40.1. This case is randomly reassigned to Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak for all further proceedings. All future pleadings should be designated as 21-cv-01596-STV. (sphil, )
June 14, 2021 Filing 4 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c). NO SUMMONS ISSUED. (jsalz, )
June 14, 2021 Filing 3 Case assigned to Judge Marcia S. Krieger. Text Only Entry. (jsalz, )
June 11, 2021 Filing 2 Administrative Notice: Duplicate filing fee received. Financial notified and a refund is pending. (Text Only Entry) (trvo, )
June 11, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against United States (Filing fee $ 402,Receipt Number 1082-7911974)Attorney Howard Owen Bernstein added to party Mark Carson(pty:pla), filed by Mark Carson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F)(Bernstein, Howard) Modified on 6/23/2021 to restrict exhibits per phone call from attorney. (sphil, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Carson v. USA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: USA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark Carson
Represented By: Howard Owen Bernstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark H. Carson
Represented By: Howard Owen Bernstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?