Burke v. Smith et al
Plaintiff: Christian Burke
Defendant: Lockheed Martin Corporation, Jeffrey S Smith and Lockheed Martin Corporation doing business as Lockheed Martin Space
Case Number: 1:2021cv01675
Filed: June 17, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: R Brooke Jackson
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 31, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 12, 2021 Filing 21 Proposed Scheduling Order by Plaintiff Christian Burke. (Rezmovits, Jamie)
August 6, 2021 Filing 20 RESPONSE to #15 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Defendants Lockheed Martin Corporation, Jeffrey S Smith. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Affd of Dana Bennett, #2 Exhibit B - Colorado Sec of State and Maryland Sec of State Business Search, #3 Exhibit C - Order Denying Motion to Remand and Granting Motion to Dismiss)(Potraffke, Michael)
July 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 MINUTE ORDER: In light of the reassignment of this case to this Court the Scheduling Conference set 8/19/2021 before Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak is vacated. The Court requests that the parties confer and attempt to agree on a schedule and submit a proposed scheduling order by 8/12/2021 pointing out any areas of disagreement. Please email the proposed order to Jackson_Chambers@cod.uscourts.gov in Word format and efile into CM/ECF. Without holding a Scheduling Conference, the Court will review and enter the order making such rulings as are appropriate and will provide the parties with potential trial preparation conference and trial dates for you to choose from. If the parties prefer that the Court hold a Scheduling Conference, please notify Chambers via email by the date the proposed scheduling order is due and Court staff will provide you a date. The Court will only hold in-person conferences if all attendees have been fully vaccinated against Covid-19 for at least a two-week period prior to the conference. By Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 7/26/2021. Text Only Entry (rbjsec. )
July 26, 2021 Filing 18 CASE REASSIGNED pursuant to #17 Consent/Non-Consent to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge. All parties do not consent. This case is randomly reassigned to Judge R. Brooke Jackson. All future pleadings should be designated as 21-cv-01675-RBJ. (Text Only Entry) (jgonz, )
July 23, 2021 Filing 17 CONSENT to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge by Defendants Lockheed Martin Corporation, Jeffrey S Smith All parties do not consent.. (Malcolm, Susan)
July 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 MINUTE ORDER In light of #15 MOTION to Remand, the 8/5/2021 deadline to jointly file the form indicating consent/nonconsent to magistrate judge jurisdiction is VACATED and RESET for 7/23/2021. SO ORDERED, by Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak on 7/16/2021. Text Only Entry (stvlc2, )
July 16, 2021 Filing 15 MOTION to Remand to State Court by Plaintiff Christian Burke. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Ltr. from Defendant Smith, #2 Exhibit 2 - Lockheed Martin Corporation Overview, #3 Exhibit 3 - Office of Economic Development, Lockheed Martin, #4 Exhibit 4 - Press Releases, #5 Exhibit 5 - Gateway Center)(Rezmovits, Jamie)
June 24, 2021 Filing 14 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance of Frank Scheitler by Jamie H. Rezmovits on behalf of Christian Burke (Rezmovits, Jamie)
June 24, 2021 Filing 13 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance of Jamie Rezmovits by Jamie H. Rezmovits on behalf of Christian BurkeAttorney Jamie H. Rezmovits added to party Christian Burke(pty:pla) (Rezmovits, Jamie)
June 24, 2021 Filing 12 DEFENDANTS JEFFREY S. SMITH AND LOCKHEED MARTIN CORPORATION dba LOCKHEED MARTIN SPACE'S ANSWER to #3 Complaint and Jury Demand by Lockheed Martin Corporation, Jeffrey S Smith.(Potraffke, Michael)
June 22, 2021 Filing 11 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. (Potraffke, Michael)
June 18, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Susan E. Malcolm on behalf of Lockheed Martin Corporation, Jeffrey S SmithAttorney Susan E. Malcolm added to party Lockheed Martin Corporation(pty:dft), Attorney Susan E. Malcolm added to party Jeffrey S Smith(pty:dft) (Malcolm, Susan)
June 18, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Jason H. Klein on behalf of Lockheed Martin Corporation, Jeffrey S SmithAttorney Jason H. Klein added to party Lockheed Martin Corporation(pty:dft), Attorney Jason H. Klein added to party Jeffrey S Smith(pty:dft) (Klein, Jason)
June 18, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Michael Joseph Potraffke on behalf of Lockheed Martin Corporation, Jeffrey S Smith (Potraffke, Michael)
June 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER Setting Scheduling Conference for 8/19/2021 10:45 AM in Courtroom A 402 before Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak. Consent Form due by 8/5/2021. Proposed Scheduling Order due 8/12/2021, by Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak on 6/18/2021. (jgonz, )
June 17, 2021 Filing 6 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1, direct assignment of civil actions to full time magistrate judges. (jtorr, )
June 17, 2021 Filing 5 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak. Text Only Entry. (jtorr, )
June 17, 2021 Filing 4 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons, Complaint and Jury Demand, and District Court Civil Cover Sheet upon Lockheed Martin Corporation on 05/27/2021. (jtorr, )
June 17, 2021 Filing 3 COMPLAINT and Jury Demand against Lockheed Martin Corporation, Jeffrey S Smith, filed by Christian Burke.(jtorr, )
June 17, 2021 Filing 2 FIRST AND FINAL NOTICE TO ALL ATTORNEY(S) AND UNREPRESENTED PARTIES IN REMOVED, TRANSFERRED, OR OTHER CASES. To receive any further notice in a case removed or transferred to this court, or special matters including discovery disputes, bankruptcy appeals, or withdrawals of reference, Multi-district litigation (MDL), etc., all attorneys and unrepresented parties must enter an appearance under D.C.COLO.LAttyR 5(a). An attorney must be an active member of this court's bar and be in good standing in accordance with D.C.COLO.LAttyR 3. A waiver of the fee for bar admission may apply in limited situations. (Text Only Entry) (jtorr, )
June 17, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Lockheed Martin Corporation, Jeffrey S Smith from Denver District Court, Case Number 2021CV31023. (Filing fee $ 402, Receipt Number 1082-7920290), filed by Lockheed Martin Corporation, Jeffrey S Smith. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Complaint and Jury Demand, #2 Exhibit B - Civil Coversheet, #3 Exhibit C - Summons - Jeffrey S. Smith, #4 Exhibit D - Summons - Lockheed Martin Corporation, #5 Exhibit E - Waiver of Service - Jeffrey S Smith, #6 Exhibit F - Affidavit of Service - Lockheed Martin Corporation, #7 Exhibit G - Delay Reduction Order, #8 Exhibit H - State Court Docket Sheet, #9 Exhibit I - Employability Evaluation)(Potraffke, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Burke v. Smith et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lockheed Martin Corporation
Represented By: Michael Joseph Potraffke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeffrey S Smith
Represented By: Michael Joseph Potraffke
Represented By: Jason H. Klein
Represented By: Susan E. Malcolm
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lockheed Martin Corporation doing business as Lockheed Martin Space
Represented By: Jason H. Klein
Represented By: Susan E. Malcolm
Represented By: Michael Joseph Potraffke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christian Burke
Represented By: Jamie H. Rezmovits
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?