Ciccotelli v. Domtar Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Alex Ciccotelli
Defendant: Domtar Corporation, Brian M. Levitt, David G. Maffucci, Robert E. Apple, Giannella Alvarez, Pamela B. Strobel, David J. Illingworth, Denis A. Turcotte, Mary A. Winston and John D. Williams
Case Number: 1:2021cv01682
Filed: June 18, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Michael E Hegarty
Nature of Suit: Securities, Commodities, Exchange
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 78
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 3, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Minute ORDER by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 3 August 2021. Due to a conflict in the Court's calendar, the Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b) Scheduling Conference currently set for September 13, 2021 is reset to September 21, 2021 at 1:45 p.m. in Courtroom A-501, on the fifth floor of the Alfred A. Arraj United States Courthouse located at 901 19th Street, Denver, Colorado (cmadr, )
July 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Minute ORDER by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 6 July 2021. Due to a conflict in the Court's calendar, the Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b) Scheduling Conference currently set for September 8, 2021 in Courtroom A-501, on the fifth floor of the Alfred A. Arraj United States Courthouse located at 901 19th Street, Denver, Colorado, is reset to September 13, 2021 at 11:00 a.m. Proposed Scheduling Order due 9/6/2021. Litigants and counsel whose offices are located outside the Denver metropolitan area or who cannot reasonably make a personal appearance may appear by telephone. Please contact Chambers at (303) 844-4507 two businesses days before the Scheduling Conference to arrange a telephonic appearance. (cmadr, )
June 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Minute ORDER by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 21 June 2021. Consent Form due by 8/26/2021. Proposed Scheduling Order due 9/1/2021. Scheduling Conference set for 9/8/2021 10:00 AM in Courtroom A 501 before Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. Litigants and counsel whose offices are located outside the Denver metropolitan area or who cannot reasonably make a personal appearance may appear by telephone. Please contact Chambers at (303) 844-4507 five businesses days before the Scheduling Conference to arrange a telephonic appearance. (cmadr, )
June 18, 2021 Filing 4 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1, direct assignment of civil actions to full time magistrate judges. No summons issued. (jtorr, )
June 18, 2021 Filing 3 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. Text Only Entry. (jtorr, )
June 18, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE OF CASE ASSOCIATION by Gina Marie Serra on behalf of Alex Ciccotelli (Serra, Gina)
June 18, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Giannella Alvarez, Robert E. Apple, Domtar Corporation, David J. Illingworth, Brian M. Levitt, David G. Maffucci, Pamela B. Strobel, Denis A. Turcotte, John D. Williams, Mary A. Winston (Filing fee $ 402,Receipt Number 1082-7921426)Attorney Gina Marie Serra added to party Alex Ciccotelli(pty:pla), filed by Alex Ciccotelli. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Serra, Gina)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ciccotelli v. Domtar Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Domtar Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian M. Levitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David G. Maffucci
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert E. Apple
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Giannella Alvarez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pamela B. Strobel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David J. Illingworth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Denis A. Turcotte
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mary A. Winston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John D. Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alex Ciccotelli
Represented By: Gina Marie Serra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?