Messer v. Potter
Plaintiff: Jocelyn Bailey Messer
Defendant: Jeffrey Potter
Case Number: 1:2021cv01694
Filed: June 21, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: N Reid Neureiter
Nature of Suit: Assault Libel & Slander
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 t
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 17, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Minute ORDER by Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter on 17 August 2021. It is hereby ORDERED that Defendant's Unopposed Motion to Continue Scheduling/Planning Conference (Dkt. #8 ) is GRANTED as follows: The Scheduling Conference set on September 9, 2021 at 9:30 a.m. is VACATED and RESET on November 10, 2021 at 2:00 p.m. The parties shall submit the Proposed Scheduling Order on or before November 3, 2021. The Consent Deadline remains August 26, 2021. PLEASE READ ATTACHED MINUTE ORDER. (cmadr, )
August 17, 2021 Filing 8 Unopposed MOTION to Continue Scheduling/Planning Conference by Defendant Jeffrey Potter. (Carr, Christopher)
August 13, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Christopher Wenzel Carr on behalf of Jeffrey PotterAttorney Christopher Wenzel Carr added to party Jeffrey Potter(pty:dft) (Carr, Christopher)
August 11, 2021 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Jocelyn Bailey Messer. Jeffrey Potter waiver sent on 8/10/2021, answer due 10/9/2021. (Carminati, Maria-Vittoria)
July 15, 2021 Filing 5 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Jeffrey Potter, filed by Jocelyn Bailey Messer. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Summons)(Carminati, Maria-Vittoria)
June 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING/PLANNING CONFERENCE AND SETTING DEADLINE FOR FILING OF CONSENT/NON-CONSENT FORM by Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter on 22 June 2021. Consent Form due by 8/26/2021. Proposed Scheduling Order due 9/2/2021. Scheduling Conference set for 9/9/2021 09:30 AM in Courtroom C203 before Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter. (cmadr, )
June 22, 2021 Filing 3 SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (trvo, )
June 21, 2021 Filing 2 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter. Text Only Entry. (trvo, )
June 21, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Jeffrey Potter (Filing fee $ 402,Receipt Number 1082-7924312)Attorney Maria-Vittoria G. Carminati added to party Jocelyn Bailey Messer(pty:pla), filed by Jocelyn Bailey Messer. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Carminati, Maria-Vittoria)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Messer v. Potter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jocelyn Bailey Messer
Represented By: Maria-Vittoria G. Carminati
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeffrey Potter
Represented By: Christopher Wenzel Carr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?